Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:21-bk-41500

Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:22-ap-04030
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 27, 2022
Terminated:Jan 30, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ryan S. Finan
32 Meadowcreek Dr.
Melissa, TX 75454
Represented By
Ryan S. Finan
contact info
Plaintiff
Bradley Dallas Paddock, LLC
Represented By
Larry A. Levick
Singer & Levick, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, January 30, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/30 3:40 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-4030 Closed. (srb)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 28, 2023
15 15 court Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/28 11:26 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 01/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Agreed Judgment (srb)
Thursday, January 26, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Agreed Judgment Thu 01/26 3:28 PM
Agreed Judgment (srb)
Related: [-]
court POrder Note Thu 01/26 2:16 PM
Proposed Agreed Order or Judgment Submitted Prior to Hearing RE:1 Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
13 13 misc Certificate of Notice (Adversary) Tue 01/17 6:29 PM
Notice of Expert Disclosure Filed By Joyce W. Lindauer Filed by on behalf of Ryan S. Finan Related [+]. (Lindauer, Joyce) Modified on 1/18/2023 (srb)
Related: [-] 11 Scheduling Order Arising From Initial Management Conference. Discovery due by 3/3/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2023. (srb)
Thursday, November 03, 2022
12 12 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/03 11:32 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 11/03/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Scheduling Order Arising From Initial Management Conference. Discovery due by 3/3/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2023. (srb)
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/01 11:19 AM
Scheduling Order Arising From Initial Management Conference. Discovery due by 3/3/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2023. (srb)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 06, 2022
10 10 court Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/06 11:22 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice and Order Regarding Initial Pre-Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling of Telephonic Management Conference. (RE: related document(s)1 COMPLAINT: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): filed by Plaintiff Bradley Dallas Paddock, LLC). Telephonic Management Conference scheduled for 11/1/2022. A precise time for this telephonic management conference will be assigned and transmitted to all parties at the time of their respective communications with the Courtroom Deputy (JD)
Thursday, August 04, 2022
9 9 3 pgs order Order and Notice of Hearing (Telephonic Management Conference) Thu 08/04 10:42 AM
Notice and Order Regarding Initial Pre-Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling of Telephonic Management Conference. Related [+]. Telephonic Management Conference scheduled for 11/1/2022. A precise time for this telephonic management conference will be assigned and transmitted to all parties at the time of their respective communications with the Courtroom Deputy (JD)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): filed by Plaintiff Bradley Dallas Paddock, LLC
Monday, August 01, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/01 4:50 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Ryan S. Finan (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 06/27 7:49 AM
Ryan S. Finan Answer Deadline Reset for 8/1/2022. (srb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
7 7 misc Certificate of Notice (Adversary) Fri 06/24 11:29 AM
Certificate of Notice Agreed Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Filed By Larry A. Levick Filed by on behalf of Bradley Dallas Paddock, LLC Related [+]. (Levick, Larry)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): filed by Larry A. Levick on behalf of Bradley Dallas Paddock, LLC against Ryan S. Finan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Default Judgment # 2 Adversary Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Bradley Dallas Paddock, LLC
Thursday, June 23, 2022
6 6 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/23 11:34 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Regarding Service Of Adversary Complaint Upon Defendant, Ryan S. Finan (JD)
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 06/21 4:38 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ryan S. Finan 5/31/2022 (Levick, Larry)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 06/21 11:02 AM
Order Regarding Service Of Adversary Complaint Upon Defendant, Ryan S. Finan (JD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
court POrder Note Wed 06/01 12:09 AM
Related: [-]
court POrder Note Wed 06/01 12:09 AM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 05/31 8:21 AM
Summons Issued on Ryan S. Finan Date Issued 5/31/2022, Answer Due 6/30/2022 and electronically transmitted back to the filer to be served upon the relevant party(s).. (JD)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
2 2 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/27 3:55 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons Related [+]. (Levick, Larry)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): filed by Larry A. Levick on behalf of Bradley Dallas Paddock, LLC against Ryan S. Finan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Default Judgment # 2 Adversary Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Bradley Dallas Paddock, LLC
1 1 cmp Complaint [COURT USE ONLY] Fri 05/27 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): filed by Larry A. Levick on behalf of Bradley Dallas Paddock, LLC against Ryan S. Finan. (Levick, Larry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Default Judgment
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet