New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:22-cv-04446
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 30, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Nov 26, 2022 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
David Smothermon
Represented By
Lloyd E Kelley
The Kelley Law Firm
contact info
Terry W. Yates
Yates And Associates
contact info
Daniel Jonathan O'Neill
Shapiro Arato Bach LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Trammo, Inc.
Represented By
Jessica Ann Masella
Dla Piper Us Llp (ny)
contact info


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
38 38 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Thu 12/05 9:11 AM
ORDER: The allegations against David Smothermon in this case are related to facts alleged in a criminal case against Smothermon that is currently pending before Judge Hellerstein, United States v. Smothermon, No. 19-cr-00382 (AKH). This case is hereby stayed pending the resolution of the criminal case. The parties are directed to notify the Court after the resolution of the criminal case. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/4/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
minutes Status Conference Fri 12/06 5:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Status Conference held on 12/3/2024. Plaintiff's and Defendant's counsel present. For the reasons stated on the record, the case is stayed pending the resolution of the criminal case, 19-cr-382-AKH. (jar)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 11/25 3:28 PM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE: The telephonic status conference presently scheduled for December 3, 2024, at 4:00 p.m. is rescheduled for 3:00 p.m. on December 3, 2024 . Please note that the conference call dial-in formation has since changed, and the parties are instructed to call (855) 244-8681 and enter access code 2301 087 7354# when prompted . (jar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
37 37 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 10/17 1:45 PM
ORDER granting36 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The telephonic status conference is adjourned to December 3, 2024, at 04:00 p.m. The parties are instructed to call (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
36 36 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 10/16 10:37 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for October 18, 2024 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel J. O'Neill dated Oct. 16, 2024. Document filed by David Smothermon..(O'Neill, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
35 35 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Tue 06/04 3:28 PM
ORDER granting34 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The June 6, 2024 telephonic status conference is adjourned to October 18, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. The parties are instructed to call (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
34 34 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 06/03 12:35 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for June 6, 2024 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel J. O'Neill dated June 3, 2024. Document filed by David Smothermon..(O'Neill, Daniel)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 06/03 10:50 AM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE: The telephonic status conference previously scheduled for June 6, 2024, at 11:30 a.m. is rescheduled for 12:00 p.m. on June 6 . The parties are reminded to call (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. (jar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
33 33 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 04/10 11:09 AM
ORDER granting32 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The April 10 status conference is adjourned to June 6, 2024, at 11:30 AM. The parties are reminded to dial 877-411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 07, 2024
32 32 motion Adjourn Conference Sun 04/07 4:14 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for April 10, 2024 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel J. O'Neill dated April 7, 2024. Document filed by David Smothermon..(O'Neill, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
31 31 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 02/14 4:04 PM
ORDER granting30 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The telephonic status conference is adjourned to April 10, 2024, at 10:30 AM. The parties are reminded to dial 877-411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
30 30 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 02/12 9:46 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for February 15, 2024 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel J. O'Neill dated February 12, 2024. Document filed by David Smothermon..(O'Neill, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
29 29 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 12/11 3:51 PM
ORDER granting28 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The telephonic status conference is adjourned to February 15, 2024, at 10:30 AM. The parties are reminded to dial 877-411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 10, 2023
28 28 motion Adjourn Conference Sun 12/10 10:27 AM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for December 12, 2023 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel J. O'Neill dated Dec. 10, 2023. Document filed by David Smothermon..(O'Neill, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 11/29 11:07 AM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE: The telephone conference previously scheduled for December 8, 2023, is hereby rescheduled for December 12, 2023, at 11:00 AM. The parties are reminded to dial 877-411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. (jar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
27 27 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 11/01 10:20 AM
ORDER granting26 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The telephonic status conference is adjourned to December 8, 2023 at 11:00 AM. The parties are reminded to dial 877-411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
26 26 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 10/30 3:13 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for Nov. 3, 2023 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel J. O'Neill dated October 30, 2023. Document filed by David Smothermon..(O'Neill, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
25 25 order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 09/11 4:46 PM
ORDER: granting24 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to November 3, 2023 at 11 a.m. The parties are reminded to dial 877-411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. SO ORDERED. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/3/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/11/2023) (ama)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
24 24 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 09/08 7:49 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for Sept. 13, 2023 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Daniel J. O'Neill dated Sept. 8, 2023. Document filed by David Smothermon..(O'Neill, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
order Order on Motion for Conference Fri 06/02 2:53 PM
ORDER granting22 Letter Motion for Conference re:22 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference re:19 Order Staying Case. A status conference will be held on September 13, 2023 at 10:00 AM by telephone. The parties are instructed to call (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
22 22 motion Conference Wed 05/31 2:30 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference re:19 Order Staying Case,, Status Report, and Request to Extend Stay addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jessica Masella dated May 31, 2023. Document filed by Trammo, Inc...(Masella, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/03 10:24 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Lloyd E. Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/03 10:28 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Terry W. Yates to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 09/21 10:20 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 18 MOTION for Terry W. Yates to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26706788. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order Staying Case Tue 09/20 5:40 PM
ORDER: Trammo, Inc. filed the Complaint on May 30, 2022. Doc. 1. David Smothermon requested a pre-motion conference for his anticipated motion to dismiss the Complaint on September 2, 2022. Doc. 13. The Court held the pre-motion conference on September 20, 2022. For the reasons set forth on the record, the matter is stayed. The parties are directed to submit a joint status report within 48 hours of the Supreme Court's decision in Ciminelli v. United States, No. 21-1170 SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/20/2022) (ama)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/20 2:59 PM
MOTION for Terry W. Yates to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26706788. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Smothermon..(Yates, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Terry W. Yates,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 09/20 12:34 PM
RESCHEDULING NOTICE: The telephonic pre-motion conference scheduled for September 20, 2022 at 4 p.m. is rescheduled for 4:30 p.m. September 20. The parties are reminded to call (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. (jar)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Tue 09/20 5:41 PM
Case Stayed (ama)
Related: [-]
minutes Pre-Motion Conference Tue 09/20 5:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 9/20/2022 by telephone. For the reasons stated on the record, the case is stayed. (jar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Thu 09/15 10:57 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Scheduling Notice - The telephonic pre-motion conference is scheduled for September 20, 2022 at 4:00 p.m. The parties are reminded to call (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted (jar)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 09/13 7:59 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Jessica A. Masella dated 9/13/2022 re:13 LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Terry Yates dated 09/02/2022. . Document filed by Trammo, Inc...(Masella, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Criminal Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Indictment,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - CFTC Complaint
Thursday, September 08, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/08 2:21 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Jonathan O'Neill on behalf of David Smothermon..(O'Neill, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 09/07 10:41 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 15 MOTION for Lloyd E. Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/06 4:57 PM
MOTION for Lloyd E. Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Smothermon..(Kelley, Lloyd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Lloyd E. Kelley,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/06 4:22 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 12 AMENDED MOTION for Lloyd E. Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas; Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Conference Tue 09/06 4:48 PM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on August 20, 2022 at 4:00 p.m by telephone. Plaintiff is directed to submit a response not longer than 3 pages by September 13, 2022. The parties are instructed to call (877) 411-9748 and enter access code 3029857# when prompted. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
13 13 motion Conference Fri 09/02 10:57 AM
LETTER MOTION for Conference re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Terry Yates dated 09/02/2022. Document filed by David Smothermon..(Kelley, Lloyd)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/02 10:20 AM
AMENDED MOTION for Lloyd E. Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Smothermon..(Kelley, Lloyd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Lloyd E. Kelley,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, September 01, 2022
misc Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/01 9:14 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 11 MOTION for Lloyd E. Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26618885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas; Affidavit Not Notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (sgz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/31 12:57 PM
MOTION for Lloyd E. Kelley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-26618885. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Smothermon..(Kelley, Lloyd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Lloyd E. Kelley,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Transfer Case Order on Motion for More Definite Statement Wed 08/24 12:37 PM
ORDER: dismissing without prejudice8 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing without prejudice8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; dismissing without prejudice8 Motion to Transfer Case; dismissing without prejudice8 Motion for More Definite Statement. On May 30, 2022, Trammo, Inc. filed the instant action against David Smothermon. Doc 1. On August 23, 2022, Smothermon filed a motion to dismiss the complaint. Doc. 8. The Court dismisses Smothermon's motion without prejudice for failure to file a letter requesting a pre-motion conference, pursuant to Rule 2(A)(ii) of Judge Ramos' Individual Practices, which can be found at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-edgardo-ramos. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Smothermon' motion, Doc. 8. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/24/2022) (ama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
9 9 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 08/23 5:10 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . MOTION to Transfer Case . MOTION for More Definite Statement . . Document filed by David Smothermon..(Yates, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Smothermon
8 8 motion Dismiss Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Transfer Case More Definite Statement Tue 08/23 5:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim .( Responses due by 9/13/2022), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction .( Responses due by 9/13/2022), MOTION to Transfer Case ., MOTION for More Definite Statement .( Responses due by 9/13/2022) Document filed by David Smothermon..(Yates, Terry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/02 5:48 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. David Smothermon served on 7/28/2022, answer due 8/18/2022. Service was accepted by David Smothermon. Document filed by Trammo, Inc...(Masella, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 07/27 12:36 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Smothermon..(lal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 07/26 4:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Smothermon, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Trammo, Inc...(Masella, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
utility Case Declined as Not Related Thu 06/16 10:42 AM
CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 19-cv-04185-GBD and declined by Judge George B. Daniels and returned to wheel for assignment. (aea)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 06/16 10:49 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 06/16 10:49 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (aea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/31 4:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Masella, Jessica)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 05/31 10:30 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jessica Ann Masella. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $300,000,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/31 10:31 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jessica Ann Masella to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF.. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 05/31 10:42 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 05/31 10:43 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Tue 05/31 10:44 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 19cv4185 (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 30, 2022
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Mon 05/30 8:24 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 2:19-cv-4185. Document filed by Trammo, Inc...(Masella, Jessica)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/30 8:19 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trammo, Inc...(Masella, Jessica)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/30 8:03 PM
COMPLAINT against David Smothermon. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26211876)Document filed by Trammo, Inc...(Masella, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet