New York Southern District Court
Judge:Philip M Halpern
Case #: 7:22-cv-04459
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:May 31, 2022
Terminated:Oct 04, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Nov 27, 2022 4:14 AM EST
Defendant
S&L Plumbing and Heating Corp.
56 Lafayette Avenue Suite 380
White Plains, NY 10603
Plaintiff
Trustees Of Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 21 Benefit Funds
1024 McKinley Street
Peekskill, NY 10566
Represented By
Danielle Marlene Carney
Barnes, Iaccarino, Virginia, Ambinder & Shepherd, Pllc (li)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, October 03, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/03 11:00 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) S&L Plumbing and Heating Corp.. Document filed by Trustees Of Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 21 Benefit Funds. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Carney, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 07/28 10:19 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. S&L Plumbing and Heating Corp. served on 7/26/2022, answer due 8/16/2022. Service was accepted by Joe Vallone. Document filed by Trustees Of Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 21 Benefit Funds..(Carney, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 06/02 1:02 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to S&L Plumbing and Heating Corp. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 06/01 2:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to S & L Plumbing & Heating Corp., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Trustees Of Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 21 Benefit Funds..(Carney, Danielle)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 06/01 7:40 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Carney, Danielle)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 06/01 2:33 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Danielle Marlene Carney. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $195,632,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $196,000. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 06/01 2:34 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Danielle Marlene Carney to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the offical A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 06/01 2:39 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 06/01 2:41 PM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 06/01 2:42 PM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/31 1:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to S & L Plumbing and Heating, Corp., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Trustees Of Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 21 Benefit Funds..(Carney, Danielle)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/31 12:17 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trustees Of Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 21 Benefit Funds..(Carney, Danielle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement 7.1 Defendant
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/31 11:59 AM
COMPLAINT against S&L Plumbing and Heating Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26213722)Document filed by Trustees Of Plumbers & Steamfitters Local 21 Benefit Funds..(Carney, Danielle)
Related: [-]