California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Case #: 3:22-cv-03177
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 31, 2022
Case in other court:Alameda County Superior Court, 22CV010315
Last checked: Sunday Nov 27, 2022 1:24 AM PST
Defendant
Tesla, Inc.
Represented By
Kiran Singh Lopez
Tesla, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Raina Pierce
Represented By
Natalia Ramirez Lee
Hunter Pyle Law
contact info
Hunter Pyle
Hunter Pyle Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/23 11:07 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings re: ECF No. 58 : Further Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 19, 2025
58 58 order Order Sat 04/19 6:23 AM
ORDER 57 The parities notified the Court that they have reached an agreement in principle to resolve Plaintiffs claims against Defendant. Plaintiff anticipates filing a Stipulation of Dismissal within the next 45 days. The case management conference scheduled for April 24, 2025, is vacated and re-set for June 12, 2025. Upon receipt of a Request for Dismissal, all future dates will be vacated. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on April 18, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Thompson, Trina)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
57 57 adr Notice of Settlement of ADA Access Case - ADA Access Cases Only Fri 04/18 4:52 PM
Notice of Settlement of ADA Access Case by Ryan C. Finn (Finn, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
56 56 misc Joint Case Management Statement Thu 04/17 12:37 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Raina Pierce. (Nunez, Andrea)
Related: [-]