New York Southern District Court
Judge:Margaret M Garnett
Case #: 1:22-cv-03739
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:May 09, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Nov 05, 2022 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Shenzhenshihaoshengzhekejiyouxiangongsi
Defendant
Xinyu Maoxin Technology
Defendant
Xuchang Hengkang Trading Company
Defendant
Yi Wu Shi Ou Xing Dianzi Shang Wu Youxian Gongsi
Defendant
Zaozhuang Boqin Trading Company
Defendant
Shenzhen Dongrenhao Trading
Defendant
Chengde Jiubo Electronic Commerce
Defendant
Dalian Jiaxu Trading
Defendant
Dongguan Dezhuosheng Business & Trading
Defendant
Dongguan Tingqiwan Trading
Defendant
Guangzhou Domineering Point Trading
Defendant
Quanzhou Dengku Electronic Technology
Plaintiff
Kelly Toys Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Ashly Erin Sands
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Gabriela N. Nastasi
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Yifei Deng
Yk Law LLP
contact info
Danielle S. Futterman
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Jason M. Drangel
Epstein Drangel LLP
contact info
Karena Katherine Ioannou
Epstein Drangel, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Shenzhen Guichen Technology
Terminated: 10/05/2022
Defendant
Shenzhen Haiweisi Technology
Terminated: 07/27/2022
Defendant
Shenzhen Huafei Trading
Terminated: 07/27/2022
Defendant
Shenzhen Jienuoyi Trading
Terminated: 07/27/2022
Defendant
Shenzhen Lebanghui Trading
Terminated: 07/27/2022
Defendant
Shenzhen Naierjin Technology
Terminated: 07/27/2022
Defendant
Shenzhen Shi Junge Trading
Terminated: 11/01/2022
Defendant
Shenzhen Tianying E-commerce
Terminated: 08/03/2022
Defendant
Shenzhen Xinyichuang Technology
Terminated: 06/27/2022
Defendant
Shenzhenshi Baoanqu Bishun Shangmaohang
Terminated: 07/27/2022
Defendant
Shenzhenshi Maisitong Keji Youxiangongsi
Terminated: 08/11/2022
Defendant
Shenzhenshi Mitang Fangzhipin Youxiangongsi
Terminated: 07/14/2022
Defendant
Shenzhenshi Nuoshilan Dianzi Youxian Gongsi
Terminated: 06/27/2022
Defendant
Shenzhenshiaiyankejiyouxiangongsi
Terminated: 07/27/2022
Defendant
Chang Sha Zhuo Qian Dian Zi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si
Terminated: 07/25/2022
Defendant
Shenzhenshihuayuyangmaoyiyouxiangongsi
Terminated: 08/11/2022
Defendant
Shenzhenshisitaboruikejiyouxiangongsi
Terminated: 07/14/2022
Defendant
TaiZhouShiYaGeSuYeYouXianGongSi
Terminated: 07/27/2022
Defendant
Weifang Yujin Trading
Terminated: 07/25/2022
Defendant
Weihai Leka Technology
Terminated: 07/06/2022
Defendant
Wuhuashuizhaizhenrunlindichanzhongjie
Terminated: 09/27/2022
Defendant
Xinxiang Yali Network
Terminated: 06/27/2022
Defendant
Yiweisai (Shenzhen) Electronic
Terminated: 07/25/2022
Defendant
Weihai Xusheng Technology
Terminated: 07/06/2022
Defendant
Chang Zhou Wan Kai Wen Hua Yong Pin You Xian Gong Si
Terminated: 06/27/2022
Defendant
DEF
Terminated: 05/31/2022
Represented By
Yifei Deng
Yk Law LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dong Guan Shi Hai Qi Mao Yi Youxiangongsi
Terminated: 07/05/2022
Defendant
Fudingshixiaoqiriyongbaihuojingyingbu
Terminated: 08/11/2022
Defendant
Guang Zhou Shi Ai Ni Mao Yi You Xian Gong Si
Terminated: 07/27/2022
Defendant
Guangzhou Jiwei Information Technology
Terminated: 06/27/2022
Defendant
Guangzhou Linghe Dianzi Kejiyouxiangongsi
Terminated: 07/27/2022
Defendant
Guangzhou Shuzishandong Keji Youxian Gongsi
Terminated: 07/27/2022
Defendant
Guangzhoufuhanjiajuyongpinyouxiangongsi
Terminated: 11/01/2022
Defendant
Shenzhen Fengbo Trading
Terminated: 06/27/2022
Defendant
Shen Zhen Shi Po Fu Shang Mao You Xian Gong Si
Terminated: 06/27/2022
Defendant
Shen Zhen Shi Le Ka Mao Yi You Xian Gong Si
Terminated: 07/06/2022
Defendant
Nantongwuniufangzhipinyouxiangongsi
Terminated: 07/25/2022
Defendant
Nanfangyu (Shenzhen) Guojimaoyiyouxiangongsi
Terminated: 06/27/2022
Defendant
Huizhou Ruichangda Technology
Terminated: 09/29/2022
Defendant
Huida Cross-border Logistics (Shenzhen)
Terminated: 06/29/2022
Defendant
Hangzhouhanfeimaoyiyouxiangongsi
Terminated: 09/27/2022
Defendant
Hangzhou Mingxu Jinchukou Youxiangongsi
Terminated: 06/27/2022
Defendant
Hailunshihuitengshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Terminated: 07/29/2022
Defendant
Guangzhou Taopai Department Store Center
Terminated: 06/27/2022
Plaintiff
ABC
Terminated: 05/31/2022


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
76 76 order Judgment - Default ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 05/15 2:13 PM
FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER: Judgment is granted in favor of Plaintiff on all claims properly pled against Defaulting Defendants in the Complaint; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that because it would serve both the compensatory and punitive purposes of the Lanham Act's prohibitions on willful infringement, and because Plaintiff has sufficiently set forth the basis for the statutory damages award requested in its Motion for Default Judgment, the Court finds such an award to be reasonable and Plaintiff is awarded Fifty Thousand U.S. Dollars ($50,000.00) in statutory damages ("Individual Damages Award") against each of five (5) Defaulting Defendants pursuant to Section 15 U.S.C. § 1117(c) of the Lanham Act, plus post-judgment interest. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, as sufficient cause has been shown, the 30 day automatic stay on enforcing Plaintiff's judgment, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 62(a) is hereby dissolved. Any failure by Defaulting Defendants to comply with the terms of this Order shall be deemed contempt of Court, subjecting Defaulting Defendants to contempt remedies to be determined by the Court, including fines and seizure of property; 3) The Court releases the One Thousand U.S. Dollar ($1,000.00) security bond that Plaintiff submitted in connection with this action to counsel for Plaintiff, Epstein Drangel, LLP, 60 East 42nd Street, Suite 1250, New York, NY 10165; and 4) This Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter and the parties in order to construe and enforce this Order. SO ORDERED. Shenzhenshihaoshengzhekejiyouxiangongsi, Xuchang Hengkang Trading Company, Yi Wu Shi Ou Xing Dianzi Shang Wu Youxian Gongsi, Zaozhuang Boqin Trading Company, Dongguan Dezhuosheng Business & Trading and Quanzhou Dengku Electronic Technology terminated. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 5/14/2024) (mml) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
minutes Show Cause Hearing Tue 05/14 2:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Margaret M. Garnett: Show Cause Hearing held on 5/14/2024. Counsel Danielle S. Futterman and Gabriela N. Nastasi present for Plaintiff. Defendants not present. (Court Reporter Eve Giniger) (kv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
75 75 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Wed 05/08 12:57 PM
ORDER granting74 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The default judgment hearing is hereby ADJOURNED to May 14, 2024 at 2:00p.m. SO ORDERED. Default Hearing set for 5/14/2024 at 02:00 PM before Judge Margaret M. Garnett. (Signed by Judge Margaret M. Garnett on 5/8/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]