PAWESOME PET PRODUCTS LLC et al v. COLORFLOWERS et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Mark R Hornak |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00629 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Apr 28, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 25, 2022 5:40 AM EDT |
Counter Claimant
SLICKZTHINGS4U
|
|
Counter Defendant
PAWESOME PET PRODUCTS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
A INC
|
|
Defendant
ALIEXPRESS GOOD KITCHEN ASSISTANT STORE
|
|
Defendant
ALITTLETHINGS-XUMU
|
|
Defendant
AMVEEDI
|
|
Defendant
ANGELA_HFF78
|
|
Defendant
ANIMALHOUSE STORE
|
|
Defendant
ANIYA LIFE STORE
|
|
Defendant
ANMEL-9921
|
|
Defendant
ARELYANGELLAURENT
|
|
Defendant
ARESTLE HOUSEWARES
|
|
Defendant
AVERHAYE-0
|
|
Defendant
AYKEWA0
|
|
Defendant
BEAUTY.BOX
|
|
Defendant
BESHIL
|
|
Defendant
BESTZYKJ
|
|
Defendant
BETOCORONA37
|
|
Defendant
BOUTIQUE LIFE STORE
|
|
Defendant
CHA_G2GYVK
|
|
Defendant
CHOUYUN
|
|
Defendant
CHPODOO
|
|
Defendant
CHUN_8594
|
|
Defendant
CITRU_5625
|
|
Defendant
COZY STYLE STORE
|
|
Defendant
CUDDLY STORE
|
|
Defendant
DAI DEPARTMENT STORE
|
|
Defendant
DANTRESS
|
|
Defendant
DAYON_60
|
|
Defendant
DEDAGIRL
|
|
Defendant
DETIAN STORE
|
|
Defendant
DMG30
|
|
Defendant
DOGGIEFUN STORE
|
|
Defendant
DOGI PET SUPPLIES STORE
|
|
Defendant
DONGGUAN SHI SHENGKE TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD
|
|
Defendant
DTMGOODS
|
|
Defendant
DULANJANA87
|
|
Defendant
DZOMNOK STORE
|
|
Defendant
EDINESSBOSS
|
|
Defendant
EMILY154
|
|
Defendant
ENRIKASTORE
|
|
Defendant
ERUZARAY LIVING STORE
|
|
Defendant
EVERCHIC SUCH-LIFE STORE
|
|
Defendant
FABLAB
|
|
Defendant
FAGU7386
|
|
Defendant
FAIRYCITY
|
|
Defendant
FCXDG PETSLIFE STORE
|
|
Defendant
FIRRY LIVING STORE
|
|
Defendant
FLOSIK TOYS
|
|
Defendant
FOCUS-PARTS
|
|
Defendant
FOREVERYOUNG377
|
|
Defendant
FUTUSHIJIE STORE
|
|
Defendant
GITTERM123
|
|
Defendant
GOODEDEALSNOGALES
|
|
Defendant
GXBDYXGS
|
|
Defendant
HAPPINESS SUPERMARKET STORE
|
|
Defendant
HJKL PETSLIFE STORE
|
|
Defendant
HONGGANG2019-1
|
|
Defendant
HOW-1514
|
|
Defendant
HOWARDHOME STORE
|
|
Defendant
HSHEN
|
|
Defendant
HYXFLY HOUSE STORE
|
|
Defendant
IDYDZ_ACCESSORIES
|
|
Defendant
IPGY STORE
|
|
Defendant
IRONT7624
|
|
Defendant
IT AND ME PET STORE
|
|
Defendant
JAFVN FASHION
|
|
Defendant
JENNLYNNE2
|
|
Defendant
JIAYONGJINGMAOYOUZIANGONGSI
|
|
Defendant
JMSHOP STORE
|
|
Defendant
JRTE-2662
|
|
Defendant
JSQQ STORE
|
|
Defendant
KCLU_30
|
|
Defendant
KEITHBATES2012
|
|
Defendant
KIDON2014
|
|
Defendant
KINGWORAUS
|
|
Defendant
LEADING-WIRELESS
|
|
Defendant
LEM_5142
|
|
Defendant
LIUMING79
|
|
Defendant
MAN RUI DEPARTMENT STORE
|
|
Defendant
MART-2216
|
|
Defendant
MATSOFAMIC PET OFFICIAL STORE
|
|
Defendant
MHORLX STORE
|
|
Defendant
MIXX LABORATORY
|
|
Defendant
MS HLHW01 STORE
|
|
Defendant
MS HLHW02 STORE
|
|
Defendant
MS HLHW03 STORE
|
|
Defendant
MUCERIO7788
|
|
Defendant
MUJOUTDAY
|
|
Defendant
MUSTANG692010
|
|
Defendant
NEW LIFE PRODUCTS STORE
|
|
Defendant
NFDDIZAYN
|
|
Defendant
NICS_NAXX
|
|
Defendant
NORTHERNCOMM_33
|
|
Defendant
PAWFECTDEPOT
|
|
Defendant
PETFITT
|
|
Defendant
PETHOBBY RJ-SHOP
|
|
Defendant
PETITPET STORE
|
|
Defendant
PHKASI0
|
|
Defendant
PICK PET OFFICIAL STORE
|
|
Defendant
PURS_81
|
|
Defendant
QIREN32
|
|
Defendant
RAYSHOP90
|
|
Defendant
ROHAN_E_MART
|
|
Defendant
RSCHLAPP
|
|
Defendant
RUIDAXINXI
|
|
Defendant
SANDYS_PLACE_10
|
|
Defendant
SAVAGLO-15
|
|
Defendant
SHANGKEXINRIYONG
|
|
Defendant
SHENZHENDAYANGHUIXINKEJIYOUGONGSI
|
|
Defendant
SHOP 5431295 STORE
|
|
Defendant
SHOP-MIDA
|
|
Defendant
SHOP110006051
|
|
Defendant
SHOP1100178032 STORE
|
|
Defendant
SHOP4233035 STORE
|
|
Defendant
SIGOLY
|
|
Defendant
SILVA SHOP
|
|
Defendant
SITUO
|
|
Defendant
SLICKZTHINGS4U
|
|
Defendant
SMARTBUYSTORE_01
|
|
Defendant
STAO STORE
|
|
Defendant
STEVENATIN-0
|
|
Defendant
SUAZNAVARSHOP2
|
|
Defendant
SUNNELI
|
|
Defendant
TA-558789
|
|
Defendant
TANGNERT
|
|
Defendant
TAOTAOPET STORE
|
|
Defendant
TASTYBONE STORE
|
|
Defendant
TEENWAY
|
|
Defendant
TEXMEDUSA
|
|
Defendant
THE NEIGHBOR'S STORE
|
|
Defendant
TWO L STORE
|
|
Defendant
UNEPART
|
|
Defendant
VICKIE7772
|
|
Defendant
WA321849
|
|
Defendant
WANEN
|
|
Defendant
WANTED2017
|
|
Defendant
WGGH
|
|
Defendant
WGSYOUTH0410
|
|
Defendant
WNWZZ
|
|
Defendant
WONIUNIU
|
|
Defendant
WUHANCHAOYOUKUAJINGDIANZISHANGWUYOUXIANGONGSI
|
|
Defendant
XIAZIMEIZHUANG
|
|
Defendant
XINHAO34
|
|
Defendant
YANG168 STORE
|
|
Defendant
YIWU LINGCHONG PETS STORE
|
|
Defendant
YOKEE PET STORE
|
|
Defendant
Z-GROBAL
|
|
Defendant
ZH5682
|
|
Interested Party
Frank Dichazi, III
6210 Wiles rd Ste 203
Coral Springs, FL 33067 |
|
Plaintiff
CINDY GHUKASYAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PAWESOME PET PRODUCTS LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
4ONTHERUN
Terminated: 07/11/2022
|
|
Defendant
AIMDOME
Terminated: 06/17/2022
|
|
Defendant
ALI CEILING STORE
Terminated: 06/27/2022
|
|
Defendant
APPRETZMEDIA
Terminated: 06/27/2022
|
|
Defendant
BELLAS_PAWTIQUE
Terminated: 09/09/2022
|
|
Defendant
BESTONLINESHOPS
Terminated: 06/13/2022
|
|
Defendant
CAMGAMESALES
Terminated: 08/19/2022
|
|
Defendant
COLORFLOWERS
Terminated: 06/13/2022
|
|
Defendant
DAILYITEMSS, INC
Terminated: 07/28/2022
|
|
Defendant
DAYTON_OHIO
Terminated: 06/21/2022
|
|
Defendant
DBZON
Terminated: 06/21/2022
|
|
Defendant
DJPETSTORE
Terminated: 05/31/2022
|
|
Defendant
DPLIGHT
Terminated: 07/06/2022
|
|
Defendant
EPICESOLUTIONS
Terminated: 06/08/2022
|
|
Defendant
EUPHORIAHM
Terminated: 07/18/2022
|
|
Defendant
GNDEALZ
Terminated: 07/11/2022
|
|
Defendant
HAPPLYONEDAY
Terminated: 05/31/2022
|
|
Defendant
HAPPYDEAL-MALL
Terminated: 06/13/2022
|
|
Defendant
IIIX_TREAM
Terminated: 06/17/2022
|
|
Defendant
ILUZION69
Terminated: 06/08/2022
|
|
Defendant
ISENVO
Terminated: 08/23/2022
|
|
Defendant
JACBO_9711
Terminated: 06/08/2022
|
|
Defendant
JB2010-2012
Terminated: 06/13/2022
|
|
Defendant
JOSHBOYSGAMING
Terminated: 07/11/2022
|
|
Defendant
JOYOFRELAX
Terminated: 08/29/2022
|
|
Defendant
JSGM17
Terminated: 06/21/2022
|
|
Defendant
JTAYLOR3344
Terminated: 06/03/2022
|
|
Defendant
KATJUUS
Terminated: 06/08/2022
|
|
Defendant
LICRAFT US
Terminated: 06/21/2022
|
|
Defendant
LOVFU
Terminated: 07/18/2022
|
|
Defendant
MANSWILL
Terminated: 07/08/2022
|
|
Defendant
MEBR007
Terminated: 06/17/2022
|
|
Defendant
MIAMI98
Terminated: 06/21/2022
|
|
Defendant
MINAUDAS
Terminated: 07/21/2022
|
|
Defendant
NALINDSILV_0
Terminated: 06/08/2022
|
|
Defendant
NANDAFER
Terminated: 06/08/2022
|
|
Defendant
NIGHACOLLECTION
Terminated: 07/08/2022
|
|
Defendant
NOTW92345
Terminated: 06/03/2022
|
|
Defendant
PALPLAZA
Terminated: 07/07/2022
|
|
Defendant
PEACEFUL62
Terminated: 06/13/2022
|
|
Defendant
PRIMETIMEDISTRIBUTION94
Terminated: 05/26/2022
|
|
Defendant
PRIMETIME_DISTRIBUTION
Terminated: 06/03/2022
|
|
Defendant
PRINCESSX4
Terminated: 08/03/2022
|
|
Defendant
PROGUNZXZ
Terminated: 06/08/2022
|
|
Defendant
PUSHMYCART
Terminated: 07/11/2022
|
|
Defendant
SANKARAGI-ONE
Terminated: 07/20/2022
|
|
Defendant
SCRAGGY99
Terminated: 07/07/2022
|
|
Defendant
SHELLBEAL
Terminated: 07/11/2022
|
|
Defendant
SMARTGOALS
Terminated: 05/31/2022
|
|
Defendant
SOLETGO
Terminated: 05/31/2022
|
|
Defendant
SONGWAY PET
Terminated: 07/15/2022
|
|
Defendant
TOBE-UNIQUE
Terminated: 06/17/2022
|
|
Defendant
TWELVE*29
Terminated: 07/18/2022
|
|
Defendant
UNIVERSEABC
Terminated: 07/18/2022
|
|
Defendant
YCLOUD PET STORE
Terminated: 07/22/2022
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, January 12, 2024 | ||
186 | 186
order
Order
Fri 01/12 8:36 AM
ORDER APPROVING185 Praecipe to Settle and Discontinue as to Mustang692020. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/12/24. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2024 | ||
185 | 185
![]() Praecipe to Settle and Discontinue as to defendant MUSTANG692010 by CINDY GHUKASYAN, PAWESOME PET PRODUCTS LLC. (Malkin, Brian) |