California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:22-cv-03713
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:May 31, 2022
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 22STCV07221
Last checked: Sunday Nov 27, 2022 1:28 AM PST
Defendant
Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC
Represented By
Linda Claxton
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Yeva Mikaelyan
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Interstate-Rim Management Company, LLC
Represented By
Linda Claxton
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Yeva Mikaelyan
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Does
Represented By
Linda Claxton
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Defendant
Interstate Hotels and Resorts, Inc.
Represented By
Linda Claxton
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Yeva Mikaelyan
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Yurevich, Jr.
Represented By
Michael J S Calvo
James Hawkins Aplc
contact info
Lauren Ashley Falk
James Hawkins Aplc
contact info
James R Hawkins
James Hawkins Aplc
contact info
Ava Issary
James Hawkins Aplc
contact info
Gregory E. Mauro
James Hawkins Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, July 20, 2023
24 24 stip Dismiss Case Thu 07/20 10:40 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Pursuant to Fed R. CIV. P. 41(a)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff David Yurevich, Jr.(Mauro, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
23 23 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Tue 03/21 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Amy Semmel has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Tue 12/20 2:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE [ECF NO. 21] by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, re Stipulation21 : The Court, having considered the Parties' Joint Stipulation and finding good cause therefor, hereby ORDERS as follows: 1) The Class Discovery cut-off is extended to April 18, 2023; 2) The deadline to file a Motion for Class Certification is extended to June 21, 2023; 3) The deadline to file an Opposition to the Motion for Class Certification is extended to August 28, 2023; 4) The deadline to file a Reply in support of Class Certification is extended to September 29, 2023; and 5) The hearing on the Motion for Class Certification will be held on October 26, 2023. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
21 21 stip Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date Fri 11/18 12:01 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to Multiple filed by Plaintiff David Yurevich, Jr.(Mauro, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
20 20 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 11/08 4:40 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed orders SHALL NOT have counsels name, address, and phone number in the upper left corner. Other error(s) with document(s): Please refer to the Judges Procedure page at http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-maame-ewusi-mensah-frimpong for counsel to review the Proposed Order Sample. A new proposed order must be re-submitted in accordance with the Judge's procedures and posted sample. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
19 19 stip Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date Fri 11/04 12:17 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to Multiple filed by Plaintiff David Yurevich, Jr.(Mauro, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, October 03, 2022
18 18 18 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/03 11:08 AM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Order governing this action is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart below. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2024 at 9:00 AM. The Jury Trial is set for 9/3/2024 at 8:30 AM. The last date to conduct settlement conference is 6/6/2024. Motions are due by 5/24/2024. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
17 17 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 09/28 5:11 PM
JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES WORKSHEET filed by Defendants Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC, Interstate Hotels and Resorts, Inc., Interstate-Rim Management Company, LLC(Mikaelyan, Yeva)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Proposed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet
16 16 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 09/28 5:06 PM
JOINT PROPOSED CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE filed by Defendants Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC, Interstate Hotels and Resorts, Inc., Interstate-Rim Management Company, LLC re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only9 (Mikaelyan, Yeva)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 09/19 9:51 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Initial Scheduling Conference, currently set for October 3, 2022, is continued to October 6, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. The parties are also ORDERED to submit a current copy of the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet attached to the Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference no later than September 28, 2022. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference is available on Judge Frimpong's website. Counsel shall take notice of this new hearing date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
14 14 2 pgs order Order Fri 08/26 6:23 PM
ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Initial Scheduling Conference, currently set for September 1, 2022, is continued to October 3, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. The parties are also ORDERED to submit a current copy of the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet attached to the Court's Order Setting Scheduling Conference no later than September 22, 2022. The Order Setting Scheduling Conference is available on Judge Frimpong's website. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
13 13 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Thu 08/18 4:32 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Defendants Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC, Does, Interstate Hotels and Resorts, Inc., Interstate-Rim Management Company, LLC.. (Claxton, Linda)
Related: [-]
12 12 stip Continue Thu 08/18 4:23 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from September 1, 2022 to October 3, 2022 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only9 filed by Defendants Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC, Does, Interstate Hotels and Resorts, Inc., Interstate-Rim Management Company, LLC.(Attorney Linda Claxton added to party Does(pty:dft))(Claxton, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 06/07 3:26 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd)
Related: [-]
order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 06/07 2:58 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
9 9 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 06/02 11:35 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
8 8 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 06/01 4:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC, Interstate Hotels and Resorts, Inc., Interstate-Rim Management Company, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on June 1, 2022. (Claxton, Linda)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 06/01 10:54 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 06/01 10:53 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 06/01 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/31 10:08 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC, Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Interstate-Rim Management Company, LLC (Claxton, Linda)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Related Case(s) Tue 05/31 10:07 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC, DOES 1-50, Inclusive,, Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Interstate-Rim Management Company, LLC. (Claxton, Linda)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 05/31 10:06 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC, DOES 1-50, Inclusive,, Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Interstate-Rim Management Company, LLC. (Claxton, Linda)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 05/31 10:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV07221 Receipt No: ACACDC-33390429 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC, Interstate Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Interstate-Rim Management Company, LLC, DOES 1-50, Inclusive,.(Claxton, Linda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Linda Claxton,
Att: 2 186 pgs Exhibit A to Declaration of Linda Claxton,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Linda Claxton,
Att: 4 Declaration Of Christine Nilluka
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 06/01 10:58 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC, Does 1-50, inclusive, Interstate Hotels and Resorts, Inc., Interstate-Rim Management Company, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff David Yurevich, Jr. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A,p.6) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 06/01 11:00 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Aimbridge Hospitality, LLC, Interstate Hotels and Resorts, Inc., Interstate-Rim Management Company, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/27/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, p.189)(ghap)
Related: [-]