Original Case: 2:13-cv-01683

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv.pr-01903
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2014
Terminated:Dec 22, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Sep 03, 2015 12:50 PM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
DR. JAMES H. TOLLEY
Represented By
Russell Grainger Hines
YOUNG CLEMENT RIVERS, LLP
contact info
Stephen Lynwood Brown
YOUNG CLEMENT RIVERS, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NURSE SUSAN ZAYAC
Represented By
Russell Grainger Hines
YOUNG CLEMENT RIVERS, LLP
contact info
Stephen Lynwood Brown
YOUNG CLEMENT RIVERS, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MEDICAL UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH CAROLINA
Represented By
Russell Grainger Hines
YOUNG CLEMENT RIVERS, LLP
contact info
Stephen Lynwood Brown
YOUNG CLEMENT RIVERS, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BERYL MING YU YOU
Represented By
Beryl Ming Yu You
contact info

GPO Dec 22 2014
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Originating case number: 2:13-cv-01683-DCN. Copies to all parties and the district court. [999498162]. [14-1903]

Docket last updated: 09/03/2015 12:31 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 03, 2014
1 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:13-cv-01683-DCN. Case manager: ACarlheim. 14-1903 (ALC)
Related: [-]
2 2 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 2:13-cv-01683-DCN. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. 14-1903 (ALC)
Related: [-]
3 3 INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Appellant and attorneys Perry Buckner & James Scott. Informal Opening Brief due 09/29/2014. Informal response brief, if any: 17 days after informal opening brief filed. 14-1903 (ALC)
Related: [-]