Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 2:22-cv-00019
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:May 31, 2022
Terminated:Sep 08, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Nov 27, 2022 2:31 AM CST
Defendant
Evolve 11 Inc.
Represented By
Phillis H. Rambsy
Spiggle Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Evolve 7 Inc.
Represented By
Phillis H. Rambsy
Spiggle Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Dhruv "Drew" Patel
Represented By
Phillis H. Rambsy
Spiggle Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Jigar "Jay" Patel
Represented By
Phillis H. Rambsy
Spiggle Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Nirav "Nick" B. Patel
Represented By
Phillis H. Rambsy
Spiggle Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
TJ Patel
Represented By
Phillis H. Rambsy
Spiggle Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Samuel Brady Andrews
Represented By
Michael R. Giaimo
Crabtree & Patterson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, September 08, 2022
20 20 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 09/08 1:53 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Joint Motion for Court Approval of Settlement ("Settlement") (Doc. No.16 ) is GRANTED. The Court finds the Settlement is proper because: 1. This case arises from allegations of failure to pay overtime and alleged retaliation arising from Plaintiff's complaint of same. 2. The parties engaged in arm's length negotiations that included multiple offers over multiple days of negotiations. 3. The Settlement terms are fair, reasonable, and appropriate and provides for reasonable compensation, attorneys fees and costs. The Settlement is approved. This is a final order and this file is closed. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/8/2022. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal Tue 09/06 5:02 PM
ORDER: The parties Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal (Doc. No.17 ) is DENIED for lack of good cause. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/6/2022. (mg) Modified on 9/6/2022 (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
18 18 misc Sealed Document Thu 09/01 12:04 PM
Sealed Document (Filed Jointly) filed by Samuel Brady Andrews.(Giaimo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Declaration of Counsel in Support of Settlement Agreement and Fees
17 17 motion Leave to File Document under Seal Thu 09/01 12:02 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal (Unopposed--Filed Jointly) by Samuel Brady Andrews. (Giaimo, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/01 11:59 AM
First MOTION Court Approval of Settlement Agreement (Unopposed--Filed Jointly) by Samuel Brady Andrews.(Giaimo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Redacted Proposed Settlement Agreement
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 08/30 10:02 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Phillis H. Rambsy admitted to this court . (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/29 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Phillis H. Rambsy on behalf of All Defendants (Rambsy, Phillis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 07/19 3:05 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff Samuel Andrews has moved to continue the initial case management conference set on July 28, 2022, and for a ninety-day extension of the time in which to serve the defendants in this action. (Doc. No.13 .) The motion is GRANTED. The initial case management conference is reset to October 28, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for each party shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. The service period is extended by ninety days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/19/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Tue 07/19 3:07 PM
Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is reset for 10/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
13 13 motion Continue Mon 07/18 10:02 AM
First MOTION to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference and for an Extension of Time in which to Serve the Defendants (if necessary) by Samuel Brady Andrews. (Giaimo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
12 12 service Request for Waiver of Service Fri 07/01 10:38 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to TJ Patel on 06/30/2022 by Samuel Brady Andrews. (Giaimo, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Request for Waiver of Service Fri 07/01 10:36 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Evolve 7, Inc. (Nick Patel) on 06/30/2022 by Samuel Brady Andrews. (Giaimo, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Request for Waiver of Service Fri 07/01 9:41 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Nirav B. "Nick" Patel on 06/30/2022 by Samuel Brady Andrews. (Giaimo, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Waiver of Service Fri 07/01 9:40 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jigar "Jay" Patel on 06/30/2022 by Samuel Brady Andrews. (Giaimo, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Waiver of Service Fri 07/01 9:39 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Evolve 11, Inc. (Gayatriben Patel) on 06/30/2022 by Samuel Brady Andrews. (Giaimo, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Waiver of Service Fri 07/01 9:37 AM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dhruv "Drew" Patel on 06/30/2022 by Samuel Brady Andrews. (Giaimo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order Wed 06/01 1:10 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 6/1/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (bs)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Wed 06/01 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/28/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (ln)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 06/01 10:46 AM
Summons issued as to Evolve 11 Inc., Evolve 7 Inc., Dhruv "Drew" Patel, Jigar "Jay" Patel, Nirav "Nick" B. Patel, TJ Patel. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Wed 06/01 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Wed 06/01 10:29 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 06/01 10:30 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Michael R. Giaimo admitted to this court . (ln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/01 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT against Evolve 11 Inc., Evolve 7 Inc., Dhruv "Drew" Patel, Jigar "Jay" Patel, Nirav "Nick" B. Patel, TJ Patel (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3603951) filed by Samuel Brady Andrews.(ln)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet