Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Marc T Treadwell
Referred: Stephen Hyles
Case #: 5:22-cv-00198
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2022
Terminated:Dec 16, 2022
Petitioner
STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL
Respondent
ANNETTIA TOBY

GPO Nov 22 2022
ORDER The Court takes judicial notice of the court dockets in McDaniels state habeas proceedings. Specifically, the Court takes judicial notice of the date McDaniels motion for reconsideration (November 12, 2020) and motion to stay the remittitur (December 18, 2020) were filed with the Georgia Supreme Court 1 and the date the Richmond County Superior Court received the notice of remittitur (January 7, 2021). The parties have FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this order to object to these judicially noticed facts. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 11/22/2022. (Attachments: # (1) Richmond County Court Docket, # (2) Georgia Supreme Court Docket)(ggs)
GPO Nov 22 2022
ORDER The Court takes judicial notice of the court dockets in McDaniels state habeas proceedings. Specifically, the Court takes judicial notice of the date McDaniels motion for reconsideration (November 12, 2020) and motion to stay the remittitur (December 18, 2020) were filed with the Georgia Supreme Court 1 and the date the Richmond County Superior Court received the notice of remittitur (January 7, 2021). The parties have FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this order to object to these judicially noticed facts. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 11/22/2022. (Attachments: # (1) Richmond County Court Docket, # (2) Georgia Supreme Court Docket)(ggs)
GPO Dec 15 2022
ORDER ADOPTING 19 Report and Recommendations; GRANTING 9 Motion to Dismiss. McDaniel's habeas action is DISMISSED. As recommended by the Magistrate Judge, a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 12/15/2022. (kat)
GPO Jan 20 2023
ORDER DENYING 30 Motion for Reconsideration re 29 Judgment, 28 Order filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 1/20/2023. (kat)

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, June 09, 2023
35 35 appeal USCA Order/Opinion NOT MANDATE Fri 06/09 4:30 PM
USCA Order as to31 Notice of Appeal filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL(elp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
appeal Electronic Availability of ROA Tue 03/21 2:41 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P 11(c) the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:31 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (elp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Fri 01/20 8:52 AM
ORDER DENYING30 Motion for Reconsideration re29 Judgment,28 Order filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 1/20/2023. (kat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
33 33 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 01/17 4:59 PM
USCA Case Number 23-10148 C re31 Notice of Appeal filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL. (ggs)
Related: [-]
32 32 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 01/17 3:40 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:29 Judgment,28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Report and Recommendations,19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re9 MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely filed by ANNETTIA TOBY,31 Notice of Appeal Judge Appealed: Marc T. Treadwell. Court Reporter: NONE. Fee: NOT PAID. (ggs)
Related: [-]
31 31 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 01/17 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to29 Judgment,28 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations, by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
30 30 motion Reconsideration Wed 01/04 3:32 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re29 Judgment,28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Report and Recommendations, Filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, December 16, 2022
29 29 order Judgment Fri 12/16 10:45 AM
JUDGMENT (vs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
28 28 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendations Thu 12/15 2:39 PM
ORDER ADOPTING19 Report and Recommendations; GRANTING9 Motion to Dismiss. McDaniel's habeas action is DISMISSED. As recommended by the Magistrate Judge, a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 12/15/2022. (kat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
27 27 respoth Response to Court Order Wed 12/07 10:42 AM
RESPONSE to Court Order filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL re26 Order.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
26 26 2 pgs order Order Tue 11/22 2:48 PM
ORDER The Court takes judicial notice of the court dockets in McDaniels state habeas proceedings. Specifically, the Court takes judicial notice of the date McDaniels motion for reconsideration (November 12, 2020) and motion to stay the remittitur (December 18, 2020) were filed with the Georgia Supreme Court 1 and the date the Richmond County Superior Court received the notice of remittitur (January 7, 2021). The parties have FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this order to object to these judicially noticed facts. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 11/22/2022.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Richmond County Court Docket,
Att: 2 Georgia Supreme Court Docket
Friday, November 04, 2022
25 25 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Fri 11/04 11:17 AM
OBJECTION to19 Report and Recommendations filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/26 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL re22 Objection to Report and Recommendations(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Statement by Officer Dixon re legal mail logbook (10-21-22),
Att: 2 Copy of enevlope from Supreme Court of GA to Stephen Mark McDaniel,
Att: 3 Logbook entries,
Att: 4 Envelope
Friday, October 21, 2022
22 22 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Fri 10/21 12:43 PM
INITIAL OBJECTION to19 Report and Recommendations filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection Fri 10/21 12:42 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File OBJECTION as to19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re9 MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely filed by ANNETTIA TOBY Filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 10/21 1:35 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting21 Motion for Extension of Time to File OBJECTION. Petitioner shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to file supplemental objections. However, in light of the eight (8) pages taken up in the initial objections, any further objections are limited to twelve pages, front side only. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-21-22. (jdl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
20 20 respm Surreply Related to Motion Tue 10/11 11:59 AM
SURREPLY filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL re9 MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely(ggs) NOTE: Plaintiff does not have permission to file a surreply. Modified on 10/11/2022 to add note. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, October 06, 2022
19 19 motion Report and Recommendation Thu 10/06 1:59 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re9 MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely filed by ANNETTIA TOBY. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 10-6-21. (jdl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/29 10:32 AM
NOTICE (Supplemental Notice of Filing) by ANNETTIA TOBY re 17 Order,(HILL, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 9 a copy of the remittitur from the Georgia Supreme Courts denial of Petitioners certificate of probable cause to appeal, issued on January 7, 2021.
Monday, September 26, 2022
order Order Mon 09/26 10:41 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER . Respondent is directed to file a copy of the Georgia Supreme Court remittitur in Case No. S20H0313 within ten (10) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9-26-22. (jdl)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 09/23 6:17 AM
REPLY to Response filed by ANNETTIA TOBY re9 MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely (HILL, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
14 14 respm Response to Motion Fri 09/09 11:45 AM
RESPONSE filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL re9 MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
order Order for Response Fri 09/09 12:07 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER for Reply to14 Response to9 Motion to Dismiss. Respondent shall have through and including September 23, 2022, to file a reply brief. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9-9-22. (jdl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
13 13 respm Response to Motion Fri 08/26 11:27 AM
RESPONSE filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL re9 MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, August 15, 2022
12 12 misc Brief (Not Related to Motion) Mon 08/15 2:03 PM
BRIEF in Support, filed by Stephen Mark McDaniel re7 Amended Petition.(ggs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
11 11 2 pgs order Order for Response to Motion Tue 08/09 10:20 AM
ORDER for Response to9 MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely filed by ANNETTIA TOBY. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 8-9-22. (jdl)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/09 9:51 AM
NOTICE of filing by ANNETTIA TOBY(HILL, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 a copy of the indictment in Petitioners Bibb County criminal case.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 a copy of the April 21, 2014, final disposition from Petitioners Bibb County guilty plea.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 3 a copy of Petitioners state habeas corpus petition filed in Richmond County on February 20, 2018.,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex 4 a copy of the state habeas courts final order denying relief, filed on September 9, 2019.,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex 5 a copy of the Georgia Supreme Courts order denying Petitioners application for a certificate of probable cause to appeal on November 2, 2020.,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex 6 a copy of the Georgia Supreme Courts order denying Petitioners motion for reconsideration.,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex 7 a copy of the United States Supreme Court order, denying petition for certiorari on October 4, 2021.,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex 8 a copy of the United States Supreme Court denial of the petition for rehearing.
9 9 motion Dismiss Tue 08/09 9:45 AM
MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely by ANNETTIA TOBY filed by MEGHAN H HILL.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(HILL, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Brief in support of motion to dismiss petition as untimely
8 8 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Response to Habeas Petition Tue 08/09 9:42 AM
ANSWER to7 Amended Complaint/Petition,,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, RESPONSE to7 Amended Complaint/Petition,,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by ANNETTIA TOBY.(HILL, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint/Petition Fri 07/15 11:57 AM
AMENDED1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against ANNETTIA TOBY by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL(tam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A- 8/17/2018 State Habeas Transcript Page 99,
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Legal Information Request,
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Email from Russell Nelston to D.A. Greg Winters,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- 8/17/2018 State Habeas Transcript Page 915,
Att: 5 Exhibit E- 8/17/2018 State Habeas Transcript Page 949,
Att: 6 Exhibit F- 9-1-1 Call Center Report from June 30, 2011,
Att: 7 Exhibit G- 11/30/2018 State Habeas Transcript Page 181,
Att: 8 Exhibit H- 11/30/2018 State Habeas Transcript Page 117,
Att: 9 Envelope
Thursday, June 16, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 06/16 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAULA K SMITH on behalf of ANNETTIA TOBY Attorney PAULA K SMITH added to party ANNETTIA TOBY(pty:res)(SMITH, PAULA)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 06/16 8:51 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MEGHAN H HILL on behalf of ANNETTIA TOBY Attorney MEGHAN H HILL added to party ANNETTIA TOBY(pty:res)(HILL, MEGHAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
4 4 2 pgs order Order Order for Response (Habeas Petition) Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 06/13 4:43 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDER to Amend Petition. ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 6-13-22. (jdl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
3 3 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 06/01 11:26 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 06/01 11:25 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(tam) (tam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/1/2022) Envelope
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 06/01 11:24 AM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS , filed by STEPHEN MARK MCDANIEL.(tam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope