Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-07114
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2022
Terminated:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Monday Nov 28, 2022 3:25 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
ROBERT BURDETTE BRILL
Represented By
NICOLE CORINNE BERG
Keller Postman Llc - Chicago Il
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, July 28, 2022
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 08/03 12:11 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a Court order. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets, and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 06/01 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM - MINNESOTA by ROBERT BURDETTE BRILL (BERG, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 06/01 12:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BERG, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/01 12:10 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC, AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC, AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7137549.), filed by ROBERT BURDETTE BRILL. (BERG, NICOLE)
Related: [-]