Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-80230

Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Clifton R Jessup Jr
Case #: 8:22-ap-80213
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 31, 2022
Terminated:Dec 20, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Grain Technology, Inc.
505 14th Street
Oakland, CA 94612
Represented By
Grain Technology, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jon Shelton
21958 Hickory Hill Ln.
Athens, AL 35613
Represented By
John C. Larsen
Larsen Law, P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Michele T. Hatcher
Chapter 13 Trustee P.O. Box 2388
Decatur, AL 35602


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/20 11:11 AM
Adversary Case 8:22-ap-80213 Closed (ksv)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 05, 2022
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 11/05 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 11/05/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Application for Compensation
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 11/05 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 11/05/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement
Thursday, November 03, 2022
16 16 order Compensation Thu 11/03 10:53 AM
Order Approving Application For Compensation Related [+] for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: to , Fees awarded: $5200.00, Expenses awarded: $0.00; Awarded on 11/3/2022 Signed on 11/3/2022. (ksv)
Related: [-] #10
15 15 order Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Thu 11/03 10:51 AM
Order Approving Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Related [+] Signed on 11/3/2022. (ksv)
Related: [-] #9
Friday, October 14, 2022
13 13 trustee Bankruptcy Administrator Statement of Review Regarding Application for Comp & Reimburse Fri 10/14 12:52 PM
Bankruptcy Administrator's Statement of Review Regarding Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Filed by Bankruptcy Administrator Richard M Blythe Related [+]. (Blythe, Richard)
Related: [-] 10 Application for Compensation of Attorney's Fee for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 5/31/2022 to 10/5/2022, Fee: $5,200.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney John C. Larsen filed by Plaintiff Jon Shelton
Thursday, September 15, 2022
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 09/15 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 09/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Hearing
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
11 11 court Notice of Hearing-Van200 Tue 09/13 8:59 AM
Notice of Hearing on Related [+] Hearing scheduled 10/26/2022 at 10:00 AM at Huntsville Federal Building (CRJ). (ksv)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement filed by Plaintiff Jon Shelton,10 Application for Compensation filed by Plaintiff Jon Shelton
Monday, September 12, 2022
10 10 motion Compensation Mon 09/12 4:18 PM
Application for Compensation of Attorney's Fee for John C. Larsen, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 5/31/2022 to 10/5/2022, Fee: $5,200.00, Expenses: $. Filed by Attorney John C. Larsen (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Approve Compromise and/or Settlement - Motion Mon 09/12 4:11 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise and/or Settlement Regarding Alleged Stay Violation Under Rule 9019 and Approval of Attorney's Fee Filed by Plaintiff Jon Shelton (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 07/15 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 07/15/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order (Generic-no hearing) Wed 07/13 9:48 AM
Order Vacating Deadlines Signed on 7/13/2022 Related [+]. (ksv)
Related: [-] 5 Report to Court filed by Plaintiff Jon Shelton
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 07/12 8:15 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Daniel D Sparks Filed by Defendant Grain Technology, Inc.. (Sparks, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
5 5 misc Report to Court Mon 07/11 3:26 PM
Report to Court Notice of Settlement Filed by Plaintiff Jon Shelton. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 06/24 11:42 AM
Amended Complaint by Jon Shelton against Grain Technology, Inc.. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - BNC Certificates of Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Grain Email 5-27-22
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Post-AP Grain Email 6-11-22
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Grain Statement
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Wed 06/08 11:35 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued (ksv)
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Wed 06/01 9:17 AM
Summons Issued (ksv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/31 6:02 PM
Adversary case 22-80213 14 Related [+]) Complaint by Jon Shelton against Grain Technology, Inc.. Receipt Number N/A, Fee Amount $350 (Larsen, John)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - BNC Certificates of Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Grain Email 5-27-22