Idaho District Court
Judge:B Lynn Winmill
Case #: 4:22-cv-00235
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 29, 2022 2:11 AM MST
Counter Claimant
Vikk D Nicoll
Represented By
Nathan M Olsen
Olsen Taggart PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Paula L Gordon
Represented By
Jeffery Wayne Banks
Banks Gaffney Mcnally, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Vikk D Nicoll
Represented By
Nathan M Olsen
Olsen Taggart PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paula L Gordon
Represented By
Jeffery Wayne Banks
Banks Gaffney Mcnally, PLLC
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Specialty Corporation
Represented By
Jeffery Wayne Banks
Banks Gaffney Mcnally, PLLC
contact info

GPO Dec 01 2022
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (Dkt. 3) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal following the close of jurisdictional discovery. The parties are granted leave to conduct limited jurisdictional discovery for the purpose of establishing Defendants citizenship at the time the case was filed and removed. The deadline for this limited discovery is February 1, 2023. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
GPO Oct 04 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Dkt. 14) is GRANTED. Defendant is further ordered to provide adequate discovery responses to the challenged interrogatories and requests for production within 14 days from this Order. Defendant's Motion to Extend (Dkt. 15) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
GPO Jun 11 2024
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Dkt. 21) is GRANTED. This action shall be remanded to the Seventh Judicial District of the State of Idaho, in and for the County of Butte, and the Clerk is directed to take the steps necessary to effectuate that remand. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
24 24 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Tue 06/11 5:19 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Dkt.21 ) is GRANTED. This action shall be remanded to the Seventh Judicial District of the State of Idaho, in and for the County of Butte, and the Clerk is directed to take the steps necessary to effectuate that remand. Signed by Senior Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/09 5:19 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Paula L Gordon.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/10/2024.(Banks, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
22 22 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/26 2:21 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response in Opposition to Renewed Motion to Remand filed by Vikk D Nicoll. Replies due by 4/9/2024.(Olsen, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Nathan M. Olsen,
Att: 2 Declaration of Vikk D. Nicoll
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
21 21 motion Remand to State Court Tue 03/05 6:00 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court Jeffery Wayne Banks appearing for Plaintiff Paula L Gordon, Counter Defendant Paula L Gordon, ThirdParty Defendant Specialty Corporation. Responses due by 3/26/2024(Banks, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Renewed Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffery W. Banks in Support of Renewed Motion to Remand,
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Paula L. Gordon in Support of Renewed Motion to Remand
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
20 20 misc Certificate of Compliance Wed 11/15 1:34 PM
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Counter Claimant Vikk D Nicoll, Defendant Vikk D Nicoll . (Olsen, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 10/23 10:00 AM
ORDER ON EXPARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY- IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendant's Motion to Extend Time (Dkt.18 ) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall provide adequate discovery responses to the interrogatories and requests for production, as previously ordered at Dkt.17 , on or before November 15, 2023. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 10/18 3:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery Nathan M Olsen appearing for Counter Claimant Vikk D Nicoll, Defendant Vikk D Nicoll. Responses due by 11/8/2023(Olsen, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Nathan Olsen
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
17 17 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/04 4:31 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Dkt.14 ) is GRANTED. Defendant is further ordered to provide adequate discovery responses to the challenged interrogatories and requests for production within 14 days from this Order. Defendant's Motion to Extend (Dkt.15 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ac)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 10/04 4:35 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 10/18/2023 per dkt.17 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER.(ac)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
16 16 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Fri 07/28 12:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support by Paula Gordon re15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Compel filed by Paula L Gordon.(Banks, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/11 1:36 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 MOTION to Compel Nathan M Olsen appearing for Counter Claimant Vikk D Nicoll, Defendant Vikk D Nicoll. Responses due by 8/1/2023(Olsen, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Nathan M. Olsen In Support of Motion to Extend Time
Monday, June 12, 2023
14 14 motion Compel Mon 06/12 4:33 PM
MOTION to Compel Jeffery Wayne Banks appearing for Plaintiff Paula L Gordon. Responses due by 7/3/2023(Banks, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
13 13 misc Withdrawal of a document Wed 05/10 10:25 AM
WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re:12 Notice (Other) filed by Paula L Gordon, Corrective Entry,11 MOTION to Compel filed by Paula L Gordon. (Banks, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
misc Corrective Entry Wed 05/10 10:14 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 12 Notice (Other) filed by Paula L Gordon was filed incorrectly in this case. The filing party shall re-submit their filing using the ECF event "Withdrawal of a document". (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/09 3:01 PM
NOTICE by Paula L Gordon (Banks, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
11 11 motion Compel Tue 04/18 12:03 PM
MOTION to Compel Jeffery Wayne Banks appearing for Plaintiff Paula L Gordon. Responses due by 5/9/2023(Banks, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Monday, January 30, 2023
10 10 misc Certificate of Compliance Mon 01/30 4:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Counter Claimant Vikk D Nicoll, Defendant Vikk D Nicoll . (Olsen, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
9 9 8 pgs order Memorandum Decision ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 12/01 4:19 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (Dkt.3 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal following the close of jurisdictional discovery. The parties are granted leave to conduct limited jurisdictional discovery for the purpose of establishing Defendants citizenship at the time the case was filed and removed. The deadline for this limited discovery is February 1, 2023. Signed by Judge B Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
utility Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents Thu 08/04 10:29 AM
The 60 day deadline has expired. Case has been reassigned to a District Judge. No more notice of availability or assignment will be sent out. Consent deadline(s) termed. (jd)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Number Change Thu 08/04 10:37 AM
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge B Lynn Winmill for all further proceedings. Judge Raymond Edward Patricco, Jr no longer assigned to case. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 4:22-cv-00235-BLW. (jd)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/29 2:59 PM
Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed.(km). Modified on 7/29/2022 (km)
Related: [-]
misc Corrective Entry Fri 07/29 3:17 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 7 . Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1, consents should not be filed on the docket. The Clerk will remove the document and correct the docket entry. No further action from the filing party is required. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
6 6 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 07/21 5:34 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re3 MOTION to Remand filed by Paula L Gordon.Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/22/2022.(Banks, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
5 5 respm Response to Motion Thu 07/07 3:08 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re3 MOTION to Remand OBJECTION filed by Vikk D Nicoll. Replies due by 7/21/2022.(Olsen, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/14 9:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Specialty Corporation. (Banks, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Remand Tue 06/14 9:32 AM
MOTION to Remand Jeffery Wayne Banks appearing for Plaintiff Paula L Gordon, Counter Defendant Paula L Gordon, ThirdParty Defendant Specialty Corporation. Responses due by 7/5/2022(Banks, Jeffery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand
Friday, June 03, 2022
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline Fri 06/03 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Paula L Gordon, Vikk D Nicoll, Specialty Corporation re1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 8/2/2022. (jd)
Related: [-]
service Return of Service/Process Assumed Fri 06/03 4:23 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - Vikk D Nicoll served on 6/2/2022. (service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/03 4:27 PM
NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 06/02 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vikk D Nicoll from Seventh Judicial District Court of the State of Idaho, Butte County, case number CV12 22-0006 (Filing fee $402 receipt numberAIDDC-2402993.), filed by Vikk D Nicoll.(Olsen, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 State Court Complaint Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Summons Another Summons,
Att: 4 Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim,
Att: 5 Reply to Counterclaim,
Att: 6 Court Minutes,
Att: 7 State Court Docket Sheet