Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ada Brown
Case #: 3:22-cv-01202
Nature of Suit196 Contract - Franchise
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2022
Terminated:Nov 14, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 29, 2022 2:36 AM CST
Counter Claimant
Babette L Fogle
Represented By
Jacob Sparks
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Sean M Whyte
contact info
Counter Claimant
Nolan B Fogle
Represented By
Jacob Sparks
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Sean M Whyte
contact info
Counter Claimant
Fogle Enterprises Inc
Represented By
Jacob Sparks
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Sean M Whyte
contact info
Counter Defendant
Cici Enterprises LP
Represented By
J David Apple
Apple & Fink LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Yes Caps LLC
Represented By
J David Apple
Apple & Fink LLP
contact info
Defendant
Babette L Fogle
Represented By
Jacob Sparks
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Sean M Whyte
contact info
Defendant
Nolan B Fogle
Represented By
Jacob Sparks
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Sean M Whyte
contact info
Defendant
Fogle Enterprises Inc
Represented By
Jacob Sparks
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Sean M Whyte
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Royal Ferguson
Ferguson Malouf Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cici Enterprises LP
Represented By
J David Apple
Apple & Fink LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Yes Caps LLC
Represented By
J David Apple
Apple & Fink LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 30 2023
Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes that Plaintiffs have established all four requirements for a preliminary injunction relating to its Lanham Act claims and its breach of contract claim relating to the post-termination non-competition covenant. Accordingly, the Court hereby GRANTS IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion with respect to the request for preliminary injunction. Because the Court is issuing the preliminary injunction, it FINDS AS MOOT the application for a temporary restraining order. Finally, the Court DENIES IN PART the Motion with respect to the request for attorneys' fees without prejudice to refiling. The Court will file a preliminary injunction by separate order today. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/30/2023) (ndt)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
40 40 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment Wed 11/15 8:45 AM
AGREED JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that plaintiffs Cicis and Yes Caps are entitled to and shall from Defendants, jointly and severally, damages in the amount of $112,200.66. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/14/2023) (oyh)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Wed 12/20 1:09 PM
Civil Case Terminated Per Judgment at Docket40 . (cea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
39 39 motion Judgment Thu 11/02 12:00 PM
Joint MOTION for Judgment filed by Cici Enterprises LP (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Agreed Judgment
Monday, June 05, 2023
38 38 order Order Mon 06/05 11:06 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court ORDERS the Parties in this proceeding to take notice that Judge Ada Brown shall adopt revised policies and procedures on July 1, 2023. The revised policies and procedures are posted on the Courts page on the Northern District of Texas Website.[LINK:RevisedJSR-Brown.pdf (uscourts.gov)] . If the Parties have any motion or response deadlines between now and July 1, 2023, which are affected by new briefing requirements, the Parties may proceed under the current policies and procedures. The Parties may further seek leave of Court for any filings due in July 2023 to comply with the Courts revised briefing requirements. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/5/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
37 37 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/03 3:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for jury trial on this Court's three-week docket beginning 2/20/2024 before Judge Ada Brown. Joinder of Parties due by 4/28/2023. Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2023. Motions due by 12/15/2023. Discovery due by 9/29/2023. Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2024. Pretrial Materials due by 1/22/2024. Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 4/3/2023) (ndt) Modified on 4/3/2023 (ndt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
36 36 misc Status Report Fri 03/31 3:26 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC. (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
35 35 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/30 4:50 PM
Preliminary Injunction. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/30/2023) (ndt)
Related: [-]
34 34 31 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Thu 03/30 4:47 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: For the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes that Plaintiffs have established all four requirements for a preliminary injunction relating to its Lanham Act claims and its breach of contract claim relating to the post-termination non-competition covenant. Accordingly, the Court hereby GRANTS IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion with respect to the request for preliminary injunction. Because the Court is issuing the preliminary injunction, it FINDS AS MOOT the application for a temporary restraining order. Finally, the Court DENIES IN PART the Motion with respect to the request for attorneys' fees without prejudice to refiling. The Court will file a preliminary injunction by separate order today. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/30/2023) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
33 33 5 pgs order Order Tue 03/14 3:59 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, lead counsel are directed to meet and confer for the purpose of submitting a Joint Status Report as follows. (Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order) (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/14/2023) (twd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
32 32 misc Status Report Thu 03/02 10:53 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Results of Mediation filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC. (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
31 31 order Status Report Order Mon 02/27 3:18 PM
ORDER REQUESTING JOINT STATUS REPORT: On 10/10/2022, this Court issued an Order Referring this Case to Mediation, (Doc. 27). That Order directed the Parties to attend and Judge Royal Furgeson, to be completed by 12/18/2022. The Court hereby orders the parties to confer and submit a joint status report (1) informing the Court whether the Parties completed mediation as ordered, and (2) updating the status of settlement negotiations. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 2/27/2023) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
utility Add and Terminate Judges (Public Entry) Mon 12/19 8:57 AM
Magistrate Judge David L. Horan assigned to this case pursuant to Special Order 3-346 for matters that may be referred. (cea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
30 30 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 12/07 9:44 AM
ANSWER to Counterclaim filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC. Related document:28 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
29 29 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 11/03 10:15 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fogle Enterprises Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Whyte, Sean)
Related: [-]
28 28 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 11/03 6:38 PM
Defendant Fogle Enterprises Inc.'s Original ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Nolan B Fogle, Fogle Enterprises Inc, Babette L Fogle. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Nolan B Fogle, Fogle Enterprises Inc, Babette L Fogle (Whyte, Sean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
27 27 1 pgs order Order For ADR Thu 10/20 4:24 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Royal Ferguson as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 60 days from the date this order was issued (12/18/2022). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/20/2022) (ndt)
Related: [-]
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 10/20 3:58 PM
ORDER denying10 Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/20/2022) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
25 25 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/14 6:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Jacob Sparks as Local Counsel in Compliance with Local Civil Rule 83.10(a) re:23 Order,,, filed by Babette L Fogle, Nolan B Fogle, Fogle Enterprises Inc (Whyte, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/11 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Ruling in Missouri Case filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC re:13 MOTION for Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order,10 MOTION to Dismiss. (Apple, J) Modified text and linkage on 10/11/2022 (axm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Monday, October 10, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order Tue 10/11 10:51 AM
ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside or maintain the attorney's principal office in this district. "Local counsel" means a member of the bar of this court who resides or maintains the attorney's principal office in this district and whose residence or principal office is located within 50 miles of the courthouse in the division in which the case is pending. Accordingly, within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, Defendant FOGLE ENTERPRISES INC et al. shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.10(a) or, pursuant to Local Rule 83.10(a), a motion for leave to proceed without local counsel. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/10/2022) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
22 22 respm Reply Thu 09/01 11:34 AM
REPLY filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC re:13 MOTION for Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
21 21 respm Appendix in Support Fri 08/19 5:56 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Babette L Fogle, Nolan B Fogle, Fogle Enterprises Inc re20 Response/Objection, (Whyte, Sean)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Response/Objection Fri 08/19 4:00 PM
RESPONSE filed by Babette L Fogle, Nolan B Fogle, Fogle Enterprises Inc re:13 MOTION for Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Whyte, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Monday, August 15, 2022
19 19 respm Reply Mon 08/15 10:19 PM
REPLY filed by Fogle Enterprises Inc re:10 MOTION to Dismiss (Whyte, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
18 18 misc Status Report Wed 08/03 11:47 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC. (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
17 17 respm Appendix in Support Mon 08/01 5:35 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC re16 Response/Objection to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Complaint (Missouri Lawsuit),
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Missouri Lawsuit)
16 16 respm Response/Objection Mon 08/01 5:33 PM
RESPONSE filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC re:10 MOTION to Dismiss (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Appendix in Support Mon 08/01 5:31 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC re13 MOTION for Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Jeff Hetsel
14 14 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Mon 08/01 5:29 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC re13 MOTION for Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Injunction Temporary Restraining Order Mon 08/01 4:39 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC (Apple, J). Added MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on 8/1/2022 (twd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
12 12 respm Appendix in Support Wed 07/13 5:59 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Babette L Fogle, Nolan B Fogle, Fogle Enterprises Inc re10 MOTION to Dismiss (Whyte, Sean)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Status Report Order Wed 07/13 10:20 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/13/2022) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
10 10 motion Dismiss Tue 07/12 11:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fogle Enterprises Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Whyte, Sean)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
9 9 order Order Wed 07/06 5:37 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court construes the parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Response to Complaint as Defendants' unopposed motion to extend the answer deadline. The Court grants the motion and extends Defendants' answer deadline to July 12, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/6/2022) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 07/05 4:36 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time for Response to Complaint by Fogle Enterprises Inc. (Whyte, Sean)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 06/06 8:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Babette L Fogle, Nolan B Fogle, Fogle Enterprises Inc. (oyh)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 06/06 8:38 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC. (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 06/06 8:37 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC. (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 06/06 8:36 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Cici Enterprises LP, Yes Caps LLC. (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
3 3 qcref Brown Fri 06/03 9:26 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 06/02 4:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CiCi Enterprises LP. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/02 4:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CiCi Enterprises LP. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12866748) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Apple, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet