Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Case #: 0:22-cv-61050
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2022
Terminated:Aug 04, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 29, 2022 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
CitiBank, N.A.
Represented By
Edward Maurice Mullins
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Ana Maria Barton
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth Olivia Hueber
Royal Bengal Logistics
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, August 04, 2022
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Thu 08/04 9:45 AM
Order of Dismissal/Closing Case (Without Prejudice) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 8/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Mon 08/01 1:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Without Prejudice by CitiBank, N.A. (Mullins, Edward)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 07/11 4:46 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document CitiBank, N.A.. Response/Answer due 8/1/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 7/11/2022. (agy)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 07/08 5:31 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by CitiBank, N.A..(Mullins, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
12 12 misc Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Wed 06/29 9:22 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc. re4 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc. (Hueber, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 06/27 1:48 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by CitiBank, N.A.. Attorney Ana Maria Barton added to party CitiBank, N.A.(pty:dft).(Barton, Ana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 06/27 1:26 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by CitiBank, N.A.. Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party CitiBank, N.A.(pty:dft).(Mullins, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 06/27 2:29 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document CitiBank, N.A.. Response/Answer due 7/11/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/27/2022. (agy)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 06/27 2:33 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion. Responses due by 7/11/2022 Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 6/27/2022. (agy)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 06/13 10:02 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re5 Certificate of Service. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#6]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
5 5 service Certificate of Service Fri 06/10 4:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc. re4 MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,1 Complaint (Hueber, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 06/13 10:00 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc.. CitiBank, N.A. served on 6/6/2022, response/answer due 6/27/2022. (ls)(See Image at DE #5 )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
4 4 motion Expedite Preliminary Injunction Fri 06/03 12:41 PM
MOTION to Expedite , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc..(Hueber, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Singh Declaration,
Att: 2 Affidavit Sejour Declaration
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 06/03 11:18 AM
Summons Issued as to CitiBank, N.A. (mab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/02 10:37 PM
COMPLAINT against CitiBank, N.A.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15687695, filed by Royal Bengal Logistics, Inc..(Hueber, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 06/03 11:15 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab)
Related: [-]