Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00052
Case Filed:May 04, 2022
Terminated:Jul 18, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jun 03, 2022 3:49 AM EDT
Defendant
Christopher Alan Johnson (1)
Represented By
Lindsay Jo McCaslin
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Amanda L. Turner
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/18/2024 6:16 PM EST
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
1 1 INDICTMENT RETURNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT as to Christopher Alan Johnson (1) counts 1-5. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 MOTION to Seal Indictment by USA as to Christopher Alan Johnson. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Indictment as to Christopher Alan Johnson (1). The Indictment and Arrest Warrant are unsealed at the arrest of the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 5/4/2022. (dbra, )
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant Issued and Delivered to USM in case as to Christopher Alan Johnson. (dbra, )
Related: [-]