Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:14-cv-00875
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2014
Terminated:Nov 25, 2015
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 4:42 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Comstock Oil & Gas LP
Represented By
Mark Richard Backofen
Locke Lord Llp - Dallas
contact info
Roy William Hardin
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Effective Exploration, LLC
Represented By
Anthony Gene Beasley
Farney Daniels, Pc - Georgetown
contact info
Gary R Sorden
Farney Daniels, Pc - Dallas
contact info
Steven Robert Daniels
Farney Daniels, Pc - Georgetown
contact info
Defendant
Comstock Oil & Gas LP
Represented By
Mark Richard Backofen
Locke Lord Llp - Dallas
contact info
Roy William Hardin
Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Effective Exploration, LLC
Represented By
Anthony Gene Beasley
Farney Daniels, Pc - Georgetown
contact info
Gary R Sorden
Farney Daniels, Pc - Dallas
contact info
Steven Robert Daniels
Farney Daniels, Pc - Georgetown
contact info


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 25, 2015
16 16 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 11/25 11:44 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (ch, )
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order Dismissing Case Wed 11/25 11:41 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/25/2015. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2015
14 14 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 07/20 10:34 AM
ORDER granting Motion to Withdraw Attorney Anthony Gene Beasley terminated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/19/2015. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 17, 2014
13 13 order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Wed 12/17 3:30 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER - cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:14-cv-869. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/16/2014. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 10, 2014
12 12 Effective Exploration LLC's ANSWER to9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Comstock Oil & Gas, L.P. by Effective Exploration, LLC.(Sorden, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 04, 2014
11 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roy William Hardin on behalf of Comstock Oil & Gas LP (Hardin, Roy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 29, 2014
10 10 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Effective Exploration, LLC (Daniels, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 27, 2014
9 9 Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint For Patent Infringement , COUNTERCLAIM against Effective Exploration, LLC by Comstock Oil & Gas LP.(Backofen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 13, 2014
8 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/13/14. (ch, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 16, 2014
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Comstock Oil & Gas LP to 10/27/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 15, 2014
7 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Comstock Oil & Gas LP.( Backofen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 11, 2014
6 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary R Sorden on behalf of Effective Exploration, LLC (Sorden, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 08, 2014
5 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Gene Beasley on behalf of Effective Exploration, LLC (Beasley, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 05, 2014
Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
Related: [-]
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (ch, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 03, 2014
4 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Comstock Oil & Gas LP. (ch, )
Related: [-]
3 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Effective Exploration, LLC (Daniels, Steven)
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Daniels, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Comstock Oil & Gas LP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4817570.), filed by Effective Exploration, LLC.(Daniels, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A