Arizona District Court
Judge:Douglas L Rayes
Case #: 3:22-cv-08102
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2022
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 30, 2022 2:17 AM MST
Defendant
Flagstaff Unified School District
Represented By
Donald Peder Johnsen
Gallagher & Kennedy PA
contact info
Ashley Elizabeth Fitzgibbons
Gallagher & Kennedy PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Holly Jones
Represented By
Kelsey Whalen
Zoldan Law Group PLLC
contact info
Anjali J Patel
Tyler Allen Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Tyler Kirk Allen
Tyler Allen Law Firm PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Unknown Gilmore
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Unknown Popham
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Tari Popham
Terminated: 09/21/2022
Defendant
Unknown Penca
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Michael Penca
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Unknown Haden
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Carol Haden
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Unknown Gishie
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Dorothy Denetsosie Gishie
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Carole Gilmore
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Unknown Gibson
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Audra Gibson
Terminated: 09/21/2022
Defendant
Unknown Fredericks
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Christine Fredericks
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Unknown Dunno
Terminated: 08/29/2022
Defendant
Anne Dunno
Terminated: 08/29/2022

GPO Apr 24 2024
ORDER - Plaintiff's motions (Docs. 108, 109, 110, 111, 120, 125, and140) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/24/24. (EJA)
GPO Mar 31 2025
glas L Rayes on 3/21/25. (DXD)ORDER denying 266 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply and granting 209 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall deny any remaining motions as moot, enter judgment accordingly, and terminate this case. Within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel for the District shall submit a written explanation (limited to 5 pages) for his misleading citations to and reliance on outdated regulations and out-of-circuit caselaw that is contrary to the law of this circuit. Signed by Senior Judge Dou
GPO Apr 01 2025
AMENDED ORDER denying 266 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply and granting 209 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall deny any remaining motions as moot, enter judgment accordingly, and terminate this case. Within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel for the District shall submit a written explanation (limited to 5 pages) for his misleading citations to and reliance on outdated regulations and out-of-circuit caselaw that is contrary to the law of this circuit. Signed by Senior Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/1/25. (DXD)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
293 293 3 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 4:53 PM
ORDER: No later than 5/9/2025, Plaintiff shall explain to the Court in writing whether her 4/29/2025, filing (Doc.292 ) is intended to be a reply brief in support of her 4/21/2025 motion to alter or amend the judgment (Doc.286 ), or whether it instead is intended to be a brand-new Rule 59(e) motion. Signed by Senior Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/29/2025. (KJ)
Related: [-]
292 292 19 pgs motion Set Aside Tue 04/29 4:04 PM
MOTION to Set Aside272 Amended Order by Holly Beth Jones. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
291 291 3 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/28 4:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:286 MOTION for New Trial or Amend/Alter a Judgment filed by Flagstaff Unified School District. (Johnsen, Donald)
Related: [-]
290 290 3 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/28 4:32 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:277 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Flagstaff Unified School District. (Johnsen, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
289 289 1 pgs appeal USCA Appeal Fees Fri 04/25 11:32 AM
USCA Appeal Fees received re:282 Notice of Appeal filed by Holly Beth Jones,287 Notice of Appeal - Amended filed by Holly Beth Jones. Filing Fee $ 605.00, receipt number 200016395. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
288 288 1 pgs appeal USCA Case Number Tue 04/22 2:36 PM
USCA Case Number re:282 Notice of Appeal,287 Notice of Appeal - Amended. Case number 25-2523 Ninth Circuit. (DXD)
Related: [-]