South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 9:22-cv-01744
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2022
Terminated:Aug 11, 2022
Case in other court:Jasper County Court of Common Pleas, 2020-CP-27-00117
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 30, 2022 3:41 AM EST
Defendant
Huntsman Tree Supplier Inc
Represented By
Robert Trippett Boineau, III
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie (col)
contact info
Michael McCrea Trask
Mcangus Goudelock & Courie (col)
contact info
Defendant
Jack Peck
Represented By
Adam Miles Crain
Sweeny Wingate And Barrow PA
contact info
Mark Steven Barrow
Sweeny Wingate And Barrow
contact info
Aaron Jameson Hayes
Sweeny Wingate And Barrow PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Victor Manuel Garcia Espinoza
Represented By
John Elliott Parker, Jr
Parker Law Group LLP
contact info
Lee D Cope
Parker Law Group LLP
contact info
Harold Fred Kuhn, Jr
Moss Kuhn And Fleming
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, August 12, 2022
misc Document E-Mailed Fri 08/12 10:26 AM
***DOCUMENT E-MAILED31 certified filed Order on Motion to Remand, to Clerk of Court, Jasper County Court of Common Pleas. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
31 31 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Thu 08/11 9:30 AM
ORDER and OPINION: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Dkt. No. 18). This case is REMANDED to the Charleston County Court of Common Pleas. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/11/22.(ltap, )
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 08/11 9:33 AM
TEXT ORDER finding as moot 27 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Case remanded per 31 . Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/11/22.(ltap, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
30 30 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 08/03 5:34 PM
Defendant Jack Peck's ANSWER to25 Amended Complaint by Jack Peck.(Crain, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
29 29 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 08/02 5:39 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM RE: Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Jack Peck. Response to Motion due by 8/16/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Crain, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
27 27 motion Dismiss Mon 08/01 11:30 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amd Complaint by Huntsman Tree Supplier Inc. Response to Motion due by 8/15/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Boineau, Robert) Modified on 8/1/2022 to add descriptions to exhibits(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A original complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B memo in support of Green Goods MSJ,
Att: 3 Exhibit C Consent Order to Amend Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D First Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit E Second Amended Complaint
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 08/01 2:18 PM
ORDER: Defendants moved to dismiss the complaint for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. (Dkt. No. 10). The Court gave Plaintiff leave to amend the pleading to cure its purported defects or respond in opposition. (Dkt. No. 12). Plaintiff has filed an amended complaint. (Dkt. No. 25). Therefore, Defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as MOOT. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 8/1/22.(ltap, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
26 26 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 07/21 12:19 PM
RESPONSE in Support re18 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Victor Manuel Garcia Espinoza. (Cope, Lee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 07/20 5:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Huntsman Tree Supplier Inc, Jack Peck, filed by Victor Manuel Garcia Espinoza. Service due by 10/18/2022 (Cope, Lee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
22 22 motion Stay Tue 07/19 9:57 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay re6 Scheduling Order,,, by Victor Manuel Garcia Espinoza. Response to Motion due by 8/2/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Cope, Lee)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 07/19 11:08 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties filed a Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines 22 pending the Court's decision on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand 18 . The Joint Motion to Stay is GRANTED. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 7/19/22.(ltap, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 07/14 9:41 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Jack Peck.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/21/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Crain, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Green Goods MSJ
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 07/14 9:25 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION to Remand Response filed by Huntsman Tree Supplier Inc.Reply to Response to Motion due by 7/21/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Trask, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Green Goods Answer,
Att: 3 Exhibit Green Goods Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 4 Exhibit Memo in Support of Summary Judgment,
Att: 5 Exhibit 40(j) Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion to Restore Case,
Att: 7 Exhibit Order Restoring Case,
Att: 8 Exhibit Amended Complaint,
Att: 9 Exhibit Stipulation of Dismissal
Monday, July 11, 2022
19 19 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 07/11 8:24 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Huntsman Tree Supplier Inc.(Boineau, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
18 18 motion Remand Thu 06/30 4:15 PM
MOTION to Remand by Victor Manuel Garcia Espinoza. Response to Motion due by 7/14/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Cope, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Answer,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Stipulation of Dismissal,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Unpublished Opinions,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Certificate of Service
Friday, June 24, 2022
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/24 1:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Elliott Parker, Jr on behalf of Victor Manuel Garcia Espinoza (Parker, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/23 11:55 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 Order, by Victor Manuel Garcia Espinoza. Response to Motion due by 7/7/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Cope, Lee)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance Thu 06/23 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Lee D Cope for 06/24/22 - 07/11/22 (Cope, Lee)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/23 9:37 AM
ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (Dkt. No. 10 ). Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file either an amended complaint or a response to the instant motion on or before 10 days from date this order is issued. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/23/22. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 06/23 12:06 PM
TEXT ORDER re 13 Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance filed by Victor Manuel Garcia Espinoza. Counsel should please know the protection request is duly noted and take under advisement. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/23/22. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/23 10:15 PM
TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to respond to the defendants' motion to dismiss until 7/21/22 (Dkt. No. 14) is granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/23/22.(ltap, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
11 11 misc Consent to Removal from State Court Wed 06/22 4:03 PM
CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Huntsman Tree Supplier Inc. (Trask, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Wed 06/22 3:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Huntsman Tree Supplier Inc. Response to Motion due by 7/6/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Trask, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/22 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael McCrea Trask on behalf of Huntsman Tree Supplier Inc (Trask, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/22 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Trippett Boineau, III on behalf of Huntsman Tree Supplier Inc (Boineau, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
7 7 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 06/15 3:10 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Victor Manuel Garcia Espinoza.(Cope, Lee)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
6 6 order Scheduling Order Tue 06/14 12:34 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/5/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/19/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 7/19/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/12/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/12/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/14/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/21/2022, Discovery due by 12/12/2022, Motion in Limine must be filed no sooner than fifteen (15) days and no later than ten (10) days prior to the date certain set for jury selection and trial, Motions due by 12/27/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 21 business days prior to jury selection, Pretrial Briefs due by 5 business days prior to the date set for jury selection, Case ready for jury selection and/or trial on or after 5/1/2023 Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/14/22. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
5 5 notice Notice and Acknowledgment of Removal Mon 06/06 3:19 PM
NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Jasper County.(Barrow, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents
Friday, June 03, 2022
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 06/03 4:17 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jack Peck.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal Fri 06/03 4:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jack Peck. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 06/03 4:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jasper County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP 27-00117 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10524197), filed by Jack Peck.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents