Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 1:22-cv-02214
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2022
Terminated:Oct 04, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 30, 2022 3:58 AM EST
Defendant
Radiant Property Management LLC
Represented By
T. Brandon Welch
Stillman Welch, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Quintavius Render
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Brandt
James A. Rice, Jr. P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Amir Ross
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Brandt
James A. Rice, Jr. P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Deuntae Scott
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Brandt
James A. Rice, Jr. P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lorenzo Williams
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Brandt
James A. Rice, Jr. P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 10/04 12:29 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING11 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (tas)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 10/04 12:31 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (tas)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 10/03 3:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Quintavius Render, Amir Ross, Deuntae Scott, Lorenzo Williams. (Rice, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
10 10 misc Leave of Absence Fri 08/19 11:32 AM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 20, 2022 through October 7, 2022, by T. Brandon Welch. (Welch, T.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
9 9 discov Certificate of Service Wed 08/10 3:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Quintavius Render, Amir Ross, Deuntae Scott, Lorenzo Williams.(Rice, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
8 8 discov Initial Disclosures Tue 07/19 5:00 PM
Initial Disclosures by Quintavius Render, Amir Ross, Deuntae Scott, Lorenzo Williams.(Rice, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 discov Certificate of Service Tue 07/19 3:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Radiant Property Management LLC.(Welch, T.)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/19 1:56 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 1/22/2023. Summary Judgment Motions due by 2/2/2023. If no Motions for Summary Judgment are filed, the Proposed Consolidated Pretrial Order is due by 2/22/2023. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 7/19/2022. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
5 5 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Mon 07/18 3:42 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Quintavius Render, Amir Ross, Deuntae Scott, Lorenzo Williams. (Rice, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 06/29 3:48 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Radiant Property Management LLC. (Welch, T.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 06/17 12:08 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Radiant Property Management LLC. Discovery ends on 11/14/2022.(Welch, T.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
2 2 29 pgs order Order Mon 06/06 4:28 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/6/2022. (tas)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 06/03 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Radiant Property Management LLC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11843608)(ane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet