Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Marilyn J Horan
Case #: 2:22-cv-00802
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2022
Terminated:Oct 30, 2023
Last checked: Monday Nov 28, 2022 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
ALLEGHENY COUNTY ADULT PROBATION
Represented By
Robert Krandel
Administrative Office Of Pennsylvania Courts
contact info
Caroline Liebenguth
Administrative Office Of Pennsylvania Courts
contact info
Evaluator
SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI
Leech Tishman 525 William Penn Place 28th Floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15219
Plaintiff
KANDICE BROOKS
Represented By
Joel S. Sansone
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info
Massimo A. Terzigni
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info
Elizabeth Tuttle
Law Offices Of Joel Sansone
contact info


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Monday, October 30, 2023
30 30 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 10/30 4:42 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/30/2023. (cjm)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Stipulation Mon 10/30 1:42 PM
STIPULATION (JOINT) by ALLEGHENY COUNTY ADULT PROBATION. (Krandel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
28 28 order Order Fri 10/27 9:50 AM
TEXT ORDER. Pursuant to the Text Order at ECF 27 , the parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal or joint status report on the docket by November 10, 2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/27/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
27 27 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Order Wed 06/14 9:09 AM
TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER, per26 Joint Status Report filed on June 13, 2023 indicating that the parties have reached a settlement in principal in the matter, the Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference scheduled for June 15, 2023 is canceled. The parties are to file a stipulation of dismissal on the docket as soon as possible. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/14/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dmm) Modified text on 6/14/2023. Incorrect date of Post-Discovery Status Conference in original text entry. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
26 26 misc Stipulation Tue 06/13 10:37 AM
STIPULATION (JOINT) by ALLEGHENY COUNTY ADULT PROBATION. (Krandel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
25 25 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/01 10:01 AM
TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER, A Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 6/15/2023 at 09:00 AM in a Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Counsel shall refer to11 AT&T Scheduling Notice for information on accessing the Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/1/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
24 24 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 04/28 8:25 AM
ORDER granting23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery is now due in this matter by June 12, 2023. The Post-Discovery Status Conference set for May 15, 2023 is canceled and will be rescheduled by separate Court order. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/28/2023. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 04/27 2:30 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by KANDICE BROOKS. (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
22 22 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 02/28 4:05 PM
ORDER granting21 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to For Case Management Deadline. Discovery shall now be due in the case by May 1, 2023. The Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference initially set for 3/20/2023 is cancelled and rescheduled for 5/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in a Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Counsel shall refer to11 AT&T Scheduling Notice for information on accessing the Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/28/2023. (dmm)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Extend Time Tue 02/28 1:44 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time to For Case Management Deadline by ALLEGHENY COUNTY ADULT PROBATION. (Krandel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
20 20 adr Report of Early Neutral Evaluation Tue 12/06 12:15 PM
REPORT of Early Neutral Evaluation Case has not resolved. SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed [LINK:here] or at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. ENE session was held held on 12/6/2022. (Cimini, Sally)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
19 19 adr Notice of Early Neutral Evaluation Thu 10/06 12:37 PM
Notice of Early Neutral Evaluation by SALLY GRIFFITH CIMINI. Early Neutral Evaluation Date December 6, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. (Cimini, Sally)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
18 18 3 pgs order Order Implementing Fed Rule of Evidence 502(d) Mon 10/03 9:53 AM
ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/3/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Early Neutral Evaluation Mon 10/03 9:51 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Sally Cimini is appointed as an early neutral evaluator. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/3/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
16 16 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 10/03 9:50 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, an Initial Case Management Conference having been held, the following deadlines are set: Rule 26(a) disclosures are due by October 17, 2022; Joinder of Additional Parties are due by October 31, 2022; Amended Pleadings are due by October 31, 2022; Fact Discovery is due by March 2, 2023. A Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 3/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in a Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Counsel shall refer to11 AT&T Scheduling Notice for information on accessing the Telephone Conference. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/3/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference Mon 10/03 9:06 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: A Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference was held on 10/3/2022. A Case Management Order, Order Referring Case to ADR, and Order Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) to follow. (Court Reporter: Jane Proud) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
14 14 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Mon 09/26 3:14 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by KANDICE BROOKS. (Terzigni, Massimo)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 09/26 3:13 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Terzigni, Massimo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/25 3:46 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER, a Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is set for 10/3/2022 at 09:00 AM in a Telephone Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Counsel shall refer to11 AT&T Scheduling Notice for information on accessing the Telephone Conference. Counsel shall submit the Rule 26(f) Report and ADR Stipulation by September 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/25/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Rule 26(f) Report of Parties,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Stipulation Selecting ADR Process
11 11 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/25 3:38 PM
AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/25/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 08/24 12:56 PM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint by ALLEGHENY COUNTY ADULT PROBATION. (Liebenguth, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 08/10 5:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY ADULT PROBATION ALLEGHENY COUNTY ADULT PROBATION answer due 8/24/2022, filed by KANDICE BROOKS. (Sansone, Joel)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/10 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Massimo A. Terzigni on behalf of KANDICE BROOKS. (Terzigni, Massimo)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/10 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of KANDICE BROOKS. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 07, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/07 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Liebenguth on behalf of ALLEGHENY COUNTY ADULT PROBATION. (Liebenguth, Caroline)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/07 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Krandel on behalf of ALLEGHENY COUNTY ADULT PROBATION. (Krandel, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/07 11:41 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALLEGHENY COUNTY ADULT PROBATION. ALLEGHENY COUNTY ADULT PROBATION waiver sent on 6/14/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Liebenguth, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
3 3 5 pgs order Order Fri 06/10 9:03 AM
STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/10/2022. (dmm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
order Order Reassigning Case Thu 06/09 10:47 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 6/9/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mwm)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 06/09 3:31 PM
Judge Marilyn J. Horan added. (ijh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Fri 06/03 10:32 AM
COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY ADULT PROBATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC 7132451), filed by KANDICE BROOKS. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet