Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:22-cv-00406
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause46:30501 Exoneration and Limitation of Liability (Maritime)
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2022
Terminated:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 29, 2022 2:30 AM CST
Defendant
R.J. Corman Railroad Company/Memphis Line
Martin, Tate, Morrow & Marston, P.C. 6410 Poplar Avenue Tower II Suite 1000
Memphis, TN 38119
Represented By
Grahmn N. Morgan
Dinsmore & Shohl, Llp (lexington)
contact info
Kristeena L. Johnson
Dinsmore & Shohl, Llp (lexington)
contact info
Lee L. Piovarcy
Martin, Tate, Morrow & Marston, P.C.
contact info
In Re
In the Matter of the Complaint of Ingram Barge Company LLC as owner of the M/V Clarence G. Frame, Official No. 574683 and Barge ZT309, Official No. 1042758 for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liabil
Represented By
C. Thomas Miller
Whitlow, Roberts, Houston & Straub, PLLC
contact info
Darren R. Smith
Whitlow, Roberts, Houston & Straub
contact info
Matthew S. Eddy
contact info
Plaintiff
Ingram Barge Company LLC
Represented By
C. Thomas Miller
Whitlow, Roberts, Houston & Straub, PLLC
contact info
Darren R. Smith
Whitlow, Roberts, Houston & Straub
contact info
Matthew S. Eddy
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
101 101 misc Entry of Judgment Wed 04/02 3:54 PM
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT re:100 Order. (ch)
Related: [-]
100 100 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 04/02 3:53 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is Ingram Barge Company LLC's "Motion for Default Judgment, Release of Security, and Order Permanently Restraining Suits" (Doc.98 . "Motion"). The Motion is GRANTED and, as specifically requested via the Motion, it is hereby ordered as follows with respect to any claimants other than R.J. Corman Railroad/Company/Memphis Line: That a default judgment be entered against all other claimants, known or unknown. As there are no other matters remaining to be resolved in the instant case, the Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgement under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58 and close the file. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/2/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ch)
Related: [-]