Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Thomas P Barber
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:22-cv-01295
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Dec 03, 2022 4:27 AM EST
Defendant
Feld Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
Ian Paul Stanley
Bush Ross, P.A.
contact info
James John Evangelista
Bush Ross, PA
contact info
Bryan D. Hull
Bush Ross, PA
contact info
Michael W. Bootier
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Caroline B. Warren
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Joshua Thomas Calo
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Joshua Samuel Michael Smith
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Feld Motor Sports, Inc.
Represented By
Ian Paul Stanley
Bush Ross, P.A.
contact info
Michael W. Bootier
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Caroline B. Warren
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Joshua Thomas Calo
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Joshua Samuel Michael Smith
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
John A. Bodnar, M.D.
Represented By
Julie A. Tyk
Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis LLP
contact info
David O. Doyle, Jr.
Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis LLP
contact info
Bethany Nduka
Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis, LLP
contact info
Defendant
James Kennedye, M.D.
Represented By
Julie A. Tyk
Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis LLP
contact info
David O. Doyle, Jr.
Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis LLP
contact info
Bethany Nduka
Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Amy Metiva
Represented By
Julie A. Tyk
Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis LLP
contact info
David O. Doyle, Jr.
Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis LLP
contact info
Bethany Nduka
Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis, LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
The Medic Rig, LLC
Represented By
Julie A. Tyk
Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis LLP
contact info
David O. Doyle, Jr.
Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis LLP
contact info
Bethany Nduka
Pearson Doyle Mohre & Pastis, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Moreau
Represented By
Maria A. Dominguez
Dmra Law LLC
contact info
Jason Beau Giller
Jason B. Giller, P.A.
contact info
Juan Carlos Ramos-Rosado
Dmra Law LLC
contact info
Mark Adam Schweikert
Schweikert Law, PLLC
contact info
Javier F. Micheo-Marcial
Dmra Law LLC
contact info
Manuel A. Franco
Dmra Law LLC
contact info
Hilary Schein
Jason B. Giller, P.A.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Anthony De Hoyos
Terminated: 07/27/2022


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
324 324 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/16 1:01 PM
NOTICE by Brian Moreau re320 Response in Opposition to Motion,319 Response in Opposition to Motion,318 Response in Opposition to Motion of Filing Video Exhibits 36, 37, 38, and 39 in Support of His Responses to Defendants' Summary Judgment Motions (Schweikert, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
323 323 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 9:51 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re290 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to partially exclude the testimony and opinions of Plaintiff's expert, John Bedolla, M.D. filed by Brian Moreau.(Ramos-Rosado, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Expert Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposition Transcript,
Att: 3 Exhibit Rebuttal Report
322 322 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 9:16 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re296 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Witnesses Lichtblau and Raffa filed by Brian Moreau.(Ramos-Rosado, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Lichtblau's Expert Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposition Transcript,
Att: 3 Exhibit Amended Life Expectancy,
Att: 4 Exhibit Raffa's Expert Report,
Att: 5 Exhibit Amended Report,
Att: 6 Exhibit Second Amended Report
321 321 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 9:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re291 MOTION to Strike or Limit the Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert, John B. Everlove filed by Brian Moreau.(Ramos-Rosado, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Expert Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposition Transcript,
Att: 3 Exhibit Emergency Action Plan,
Att: 4 Exhibit Rebuttal Report
320 320 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 9:11 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re295 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law by The Medic Rig, Dr. Bodnar, Dr. Kennedye, Amy Metiva, and Scott Combs filed by Brian Moreau.(Schweikert, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit,
Att: 21 Exhibit,
Att: 22 Exhibit,
Att: 23 Exhibit,
Att: 24 Exhibit,
Att: 25 Exhibit,
Att: 26 Exhibit,
Att: 27 Exhibit,
Att: 28 Exhibit,
Att: 29 Exhibit,
Att: 30 Exhibit,
Att: 31 Exhibit,
Att: 32 Exhibit,
Att: 33 Exhibit,
Att: 34 Exhibit,
Att: 35 Exhibit,
Att: 36 Exhibit,
Att: 37 Exhibit,
Att: 38 Exhibit,
Att: 39 Exhibit,
Att: 40 Exhibit,
Att: 41 Exhibit,
Att: 42 Exhibit,
Att: 43 Exhibit
319 319 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 8:34 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re292 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support [REDACTED] by Feld Motor Sports filed by Brian Moreau.(Schweikert, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit,
Att: 21 Exhibit,
Att: 22 Exhibit,
Att: 23 Exhibit,
Att: 24 Exhibit,
Att: 25 Exhibit,
Att: 26 Exhibit,
Att: 27 Exhibit,
Att: 28 Exhibit,
Att: 29 Exhibit,
Att: 30 Exhibit,
Att: 31 Exhibit,
Att: 32 Exhibit,
Att: 33 Exhibit,
Att: 34 Exhibit,
Att: 35 Exhibit,
Att: 36 Exhibit,
Att: 37 Exhibit,
Att: 38 Exhibit,
Att: 39 Exhibit,
Att: 40 Exhibit,
Att: 41 Exhibit,
Att: 42 Exhibit,
Att: 43 Exhibit
318 318 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 8:16 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re294 MOTION for Summary Judgment by American Motorcyclist Association filed by Brian Moreau.(Schweikert, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit,
Att: 21 Exhibit,
Att: 22 Exhibit,
Att: 23 Exhibit,
Att: 24 Exhibit,
Att: 25 Exhibit,
Att: 26 Exhibit,
Att: 27 Exhibit,
Att: 28 Exhibit,
Att: 29 Exhibit,
Att: 30 Exhibit,
Att: 31 Exhibit,
Att: 32 Exhibit,
Att: 33 Exhibit,
Att: 34 Exhibit,
Att: 35 Exhibit,
Att: 36 Exhibit,
Att: 37 Exhibit,
Att: 38 Exhibit,
Att: 39 Exhibit,
Att: 40 Exhibit,
Att: 41 Exhibit,
Att: 42 Exhibit,
Att: 43 Exhibit
317 317 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 5:56 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re299 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Law filed by John A. Bodnar, MD, Scott Combs, James Kennedye, MD, Amy Metiva.(Nduka, Bethany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition,
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposition,
Att: 3 Exhibit Deposition,
Att: 4 Exhibit Deposition
316 316 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 5:19 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re299 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by American Motorcycle Association, Feld Motor Sports, Inc..(Hooker, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 3.19.24 Hrg Transcript,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Moreau Vol. 3 Dep Excerpt,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Moreau Vol. 2 Dep Excerpt,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - AMA Supercross 2020 Rulebook,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Supercross is a Contact Sport,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Keefe Dep Excerpt,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Prater Dep Excerpt,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Moreau Vol. 1 Dep Excerpt
315 315 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 4:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re298 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Daubert Motion to Exclude or Limit the Testimony of Defendants' Neurosurgeons, Dr. Matthew Budway and Dr. John Sampson filed by Feld Motor Sports, Inc..(Jankowski, Gretchen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
314 314 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 05/15 4:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re297 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Defendants' Biomechanical Engineer, Jacob L. Fisher, Ph.D, P.E. filed by Feld Motor Sports, Inc..(Jankowski, Gretchen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8