Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Mark A Goldsmith
Referred: Jonathan JC Grey
Case #: 2:22-cv-11232
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jun 06, 2022 2:13 PM EDT
Defendant
Jocelyn Benson
Defendant
Jonathan Brater
Defendant
Michigan Board of State Canvassers
Plaintiff
Perry Johnson
Represented By
Eric Steven Esshaki
Esshaki Legal PLLC
contact info

GPO Jun 13 2022
OPINION & ORDER (1) Denying Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. 2), (2) Granting Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Expedite Hearing (Dkt. 13), (3) Denying as Moot Intervenor's Motions to Intervene (Dkts. 14, 15), and (4) Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response (Dkt. 20). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Tue 06/14 11:03 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Motion Hearing set for June 14, 2022 is Cancelled (KSan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
24 24 15 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion to Expedite Order on Motion to Intervene Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 06/13 12:32 PM
OPINION & ORDER (1) Denying Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Dkt.2 ), (2) Granting Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Expedite Hearing (Dkt.13 ), (3) Denying as Moot Intervenor's Motions to Intervene (Dkts.14 ,15 ), and (4) Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response (Dkt.20 ). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Appearance Mon 06/13 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Liedel on behalf of Carol Bray. (Liedel, Steven)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice - Other Mon 06/13 8:38 AM
NOTICE by Carol Bray re17 Response to Motion, Notice of Supplemental Authority (Asher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 11, 2022
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Sat 06/11 6:28 PM
REPLY to Response re2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Perry Johnson. (Esshaki, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A_E-mail Exchange
Friday, June 10, 2022
20 20 motion File Excess Pages Fri 06/10 5:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Michigan Board of State Canvassers. (Meingast, Heather)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/10 4:55 PM
RESPONSE to2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Michigan Board of State Canvassers. (Meingast, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit A. Brater Affidavit,
Att: 3 Exhibit B. Complaint for Mandamus,
Att: 4 Exhibit C. State Court Orders,
Att: 5 Exhibit D. Declaration of Bourbonais
18 18 notice Appearance Fri 06/10 1:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle M. Asher on behalf of Carol Bray. (Asher, Kyle)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/10 1:06 PM
RESPONSE to2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Carol Bray. (Gordon, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Bray Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Bray Supplemental Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Complaint
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/10 12:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Carol Bray. (Gordon, Gary)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Intervene Fri 06/10 12:41 PM
MOTION to Intervene and Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene by Carol Bray. (Gordon, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Bray Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Supplemental Complaint
14 14 motion Intervene Fri 06/10 12:09 PM
MOTION to Intervene by Carol Bray. (Gordon, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Response to Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction
minutes Motion Hearing Mon 06/13 12:27 PM
Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2022 re2 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Perry Johnson, (Court Reporter: David Yarbrough) (KSan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
13 13 motion Expedite Thu 06/09 5:01 PM
Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing on TRO by Perry Johnson. (Esshaki, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
12 12 minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Thu 06/09 3:09 PM
ORDER (1) for Hearing and (2) Directing Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Dkt.2 ). Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2022 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith . Defendants response to motion due by 6/13/2022 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (BSau)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Appearance Thu 06/09 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erik A. Grill on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Michigan Board of State Canvassers. (Grill, Erik)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Appearance Thu 06/09 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Heather S. Meingast on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Michigan Board of State Canvassers. (Meingast, Heather)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance Thu 06/09 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erik A. Grill on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Michigan Board of State Canvassers. (Grill, Erik)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance Thu 06/09 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Heather S. Meingast on behalf of Jocelyn Benson, Jonathan Brater, Michigan Board of State Canvassers. (Meingast, Heather)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/09 8:25 AM
ORDER for Hearing. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (EPar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order Wed 06/08 10:08 AM
ORDER Regarding Filings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued* Tue 06/07 8:24 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Michigan Board of State Canvassers* (LHos)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued* Tue 06/07 8:22 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Jonathan Brater* (LHos)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued* Tue 06/07 8:21 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Jocelyn Benson* (LHos)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Tue 06/07 8:25 AM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LHos)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 06/06 2:22 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Esshaki, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 06/06 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8936697 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Michigan. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Esshaki, Eric)
Related: [-]