Nebraska District Court
Judge:Robert F Rossiter, Jr
Referred: Susan M Bazis
Case #: 8:22-cv-00198
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2022
Terminated:Jan 19, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Dec 03, 2022 4:50 AM CST
Defendant
Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC
5000 Central Park Drive Suite 204
Lincoln, NE 68504
Represented By
Isaiah J Frohling
Cline, Williams Law Firm - Lincoln
contact info
Travis W. Tettenborn
Cline, Williams Law Firm - Omaha
contact info
Plaintiff
Cheryl L. Harman
Represented By
Patrick J. Cullan
Cullan, Cullan Law Firm - Omaha
contact info
Plaintiff
Van W. Harman, III
Represented By
Patrick J. Cullan
Cullan, Cullan Law Firm - Omaha
contact info

GPO Aug 03 2022
PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. 12), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)

Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago
Thursday, January 19, 2023
utility Remark - Public Thu 01/19 1:23 PM
Remark - Public: This case has been dismissed pursuant to the plaintiffs' motion to dismiss, to which defendant does not object. This case is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees, costs and expenses. (JSF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
20 20 motion Dismiss Fri 01/13 2:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Attorney Patrick J. Cullan on behalf of Plaintiffs Cheryl L. Harman, Van W. Harman, III.(Cullan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 09/06 3:32 PM
TEXT NOTICE of Hearing regarding Order Setting Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case18 . Status Conference set for 10/5/2023 at 01:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (JAB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
18 18 3 pgs order Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW) Wed 08/10 10:36 AM
FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 10/2/23. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge by telephone on October 5, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. (Filing No.9 ) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 08/09 3:56 PM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis Scheduling Conference held on 8/9/2022. (RMW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
16 16 order Protective Order Wed 08/03 1:23 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No.12 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
Related: [-]
order Order - Text Only ~Util - Set/Reset All Hearings Wed 08/03 11:19 AM
TEXT ORDER: As requested by the parties in their Rule 26(f) Report, a Scheduling Conference will be held on 8/9/2022 03:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Telephone conference instructions are found at9 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
14 14 oth_doc Certificate Mon 08/01 3:04 PM
Certificate Service Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by Attorney Patrick J. Cullan on behalf of Plaintiffs Cheryl L. Harman, Van W. Harman, III.(Cullan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
13 13 oth_doc Disclosure Document Fri 07/29 4:30 PM
DISCLOSURE Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures of Defendant Wellpath, LLC by Attorney Isaiah J Frohling on behalf of Defendant Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC.(Frohling, Isaiah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
12 12 oth_doc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 07/26 2:52 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Patrick J. Cullan on behalf of Plaintiffs Cheryl L. Harman, Van W. Harman, III.(Cullan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
11 11 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Thu 07/14 9:03 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Wellpath Group Holdings, LLC (DE), Other Affiliate Jessamine Healthcare, Inc. for Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC. (Amended) by Attorney Travis W. Tettenborn on behalf of Defendants Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Wellpath Group Holdings, LLC (DE), Jessamine Healthcare, Inc..(Tettenborn, Travis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
10 10 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Wed 07/13 12:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Wellpath Group Holdings, LLC (DE) for Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC. by Attorney Travis W. Tettenborn on behalf of Defendants Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Wellpath Group Holdings, LLC (DE).(Tettenborn, Travis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
9 9 oth_evt Restricted Case Conference Instructions Thu 06/30 1:28 PM
RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Thu 06/30 1:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/1/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/30 9:23 AM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MLF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/29 12:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC (Tettenborn, Travis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/16 8:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC on 6/9/2022. (Cullan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 06/07 10:52 AM
Summons Issued as to defendant Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Assignment of Judges Tue 06/07 10:46 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
2 2 service Summons Requested Mon 06/06 1:04 PM
Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 06/06 12:50 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4648670), by Attorney Patrick J. Cullan on behalf of Cheryl L Harman, Van W. Harman(Cullan, Patrick)
Related: [-]