Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:John F Heil, III
Referred: Christine D Little
Case #: 4:22-cv-00247
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2022
Case in other court:Tulsa County Dist Ct, CJ-22-01335
Last checked: Saturday Dec 03, 2022 4:37 AM CST
Defendant
DISH Network L.L.C.
Represented By
Tammy D'ahn Barrett
Gablegotwals
contact info
Christopher S Thrutchley
Gablegotwals
contact info
Plaintiff
Sacha M Rathe
Represented By
Steven R Hickman
Frasier Frasier & Hickman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Tue 04/09 11:15 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Dish Network L.L.C., Corporate Parent Dish Network Corporation, Corporate Parent Dish DBS Corporation, Corporate Parent Dish Orbital Corporation, Corporate Parent EchoStar Corporation for DISH Network L.L.C.) by DISH Network L.L.C. (Thrutchley, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/25 3:20 PM
NOTICE of Agreement Regarding Motion to Stay Action and Compel Arbitration by DISH Network L.L.C. (Cook, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
14 14 order 01 - Order Case - Consolidated Ruling on Motion to Consolidate Cases Fri 01/19 2:19 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : consolidating case with 24cv14-JFH-CDL ; consolidating cases (trial); granting13 Motion to Consolidate Cases Related [+] (pll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 13 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Brief in Support
Thursday, January 18, 2024
13 13 motion Consolidate Cases Thu 01/18 5:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Brief in Support by DISH Network L.L.C. (Thrutchley, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
order 02 - Minute Order Attorney - Added/Terminated Ruling on Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) Fri 05/05 7:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : Defendant's Motion to Withdraw is granted ; terminating attorney Tammy D'ahn Barrett ; granting11 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
Related: [-] 11 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) As Counsel for Defendant
Thursday, May 04, 2023
11 11 motion Withdraw Attorney(s) Thu 05/04 9:27 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) As Counsel for Defendant by DISH Network L.L.C. (Barrett, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
10 10 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Tue 06/28 11:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III regarding delay in Scheduling Order. Related [+] (JFH1, Chambers)
Related: [-] 7 MOTION to Stay Action and Compel Arbitration
Monday, June 27, 2022
9 9 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 06/27 3:39 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion Related [+] by DISH Network L.L.C. ; (Thrutchley, Christopher)
Related: [-] 7 MOTION to Stay Action and Compel Arbitration
Monday, June 13, 2022
8 8 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/13 3:52 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration Related [+] by Sacha M Rathe ; (With attachments) (Hickman, Steven)
Related: [-] 7 MOTION to Stay Action and Compel Arbitration
Friday, June 10, 2022
7 7 motion Stay Fri 06/10 1:51 PM
MOTION to Stay Action and Compel Arbitration by DISH Network L.L.C. (With attachments) (Barrett, Tammy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Corporate) Tue 06/07 1:21 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Dish Network Corporation, Corporate Parent Dish DBS Corporation, Corporate Parent Dish Orbital Corporation for DISH Network L.L.C.) by DISH Network L.L.C. (Barrett, Tammy)
Related: [-]
5 5 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 06/07 8:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing DISH Network L.L.C. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
4 4 2 pgs notice Appearance - Attorney Mon 06/06 3:30 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Tammy D'ahn Barrett on behalf of DISH Network L.L.C. (Barrett, Tammy)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs notice Appearance - Attorney Mon 06/06 3:27 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher S Thrutchley on behalf of DISH Network L.L.C. (Thrutchley, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs notice Notice of Removal Mon 06/06 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2022-01335 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2622273) by DISH Network L.L.C. (With attachments) (Thrutchley, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 06/06 3:13 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by DISH Network L.L.C. (Thrutchley, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
cmp State Court Petition/Complaint Mon 06/06 2:59 PM
PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against DISH Network L.L.C. by Sacha M Rathe (sc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]