Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Briones
Case #: 3:22-cv-00201
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2022
Terminated:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 03, 2022 5:10 AM CST
Defendant
Christopher Sierra
Represented By
Manuel Romero
U.S. Attorney
contact info
Eric M. Brittain
Windle Hood Norton Brittain & Jay LLP
contact info
Eric M Brittain
Windle Hood Norton Brittain & Jay LLP
contact info
Defendant
Town of Anthony, Texas
Represented By
Eric M. Brittain
Windle Hood Norton Brittain & Jay LLP
contact info
Eric M Brittain
Windle Hood Norton Brittain & Jay LLP
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Manuel Romero
U.S. Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Named Deputies of the United States Marshals Service
Defendant
E.B.
Defendant
R.D.
Defendant
R.E.
Defendant
S.W.
Notice Only Party
Magdalena Jara
Plaintiff
Frank Hernandez
Represented By
Mike Milligan
Attorney At Law
contact info
Daniel A. Marquez
Law Offices Of Daniel Marquez
contact info
Plaintiff
Rosana Hernandez
Represented By
Mike Milligan
Attorney At Law
contact info
Daniel A. Marquez
Law Offices Of Daniel Marquez
contact info
Plaintiff
Wenseslao Hernandez
Represented By
Mike Milligan
Attorney At Law
contact info
Daniel A. Marquez
Law Offices Of Daniel Marquez
contact info

GPO Feb 14 2025
Judge David Briones. (ep1)MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 66 Motion to Dismiss filed by R.D., S.W., E.B., R.E., 49 Motion to Dismiss filed by Christopher Sierra, 46 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Town of Anthony, Texas. Signed by

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
121 121 transcript Transcript Filed Mon 05/05 11:36 AM
Transcript filed of Proceedings held on 4 4-2023 Proceedings Transcribed: Pretrial Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Maria S. Briggs, Telephone number: 9158340568. Tape Number: msbriggs67@sbcglobal.net. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 5/27/2025, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2025, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2025, Appeal Record due by 5/20/2025, (mb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
120 120 appeal Transcript Request (Appeal) Wed 04/30 10:19 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Frank Hernandez, Rosana Hernandez, Wenseslao Hernandez for dates of 04/04/2023. Proceedings Transcribed: Summary Judgment Hearing. Court Reporter: Maria del Socorro Briggs. (Milligan, Mike) **SENT TO M.S. BRIGGS ON 04/30/2025** Modified on 4/30/2025 (bg2)
Related: [-]
notice Deficiency Notice Wed 04/30 8:25 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 119 Appeal Transcript Request **PLEASE USE THE DKT-13 FORM. INCLUDE THE COA NUMBER 25-50327 . YOU MAY ALSO REMOVE THE "OPINION OF THE COURT" SINCE THE 04/04/2023 STATUS CONFERENCE REQUEST WILL INCLUDE IT UNLESS YOU SPECIFY OTHERWISE. PLEASE FILL OUT THE FORM COMPLETELY(EXCEPT PART II & III).** (bg2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
119 119 appeal Transcript Request (Appeal) Tue 04/29 2:19 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Frank Hernandez, Rosana Hernandez, Wenseslao Hernandez for dates of 04/04/2023. Proceedings Transcribed: Summary Judgment Hearing. Court Reporter: Socorro Briggs.. (Milligan, Mike)
Related: [-]