Original Case: 0:21-cv-00336

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-02183
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 07, 2022 3:21 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
City of Belle Plaine, Minnesota
Represented By
Monte Mills
GREENE & ESPEL
contact info
Katherine M. Swenson
GREENE & ESPEL
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
The Satanic Temple
Represented By
Matthew A. Kezhaya
KEZHAYA LAW PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/07/2022 3:21 AM CDT
Monday, June 06, 2022
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5164660] 22-2183 (CBO)
Related: [-]
28 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of docket entries, order filed 5/24/2022, judgment filed 5/25/2022, and notice of appeal filed 6/2/2022. [5164665] 22-2183 (CBO)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Transcript due on or before 07/18/2022. Appendix due 07/26/2022. BRIEF APPELLANT, The Satanic Temple due 07/26/2022
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5164666] 22-2183 (CBO)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Matthew A. Kezhaya for Appellant The Satanic Temple w/service 06/06/2022 [5164893] 22-2183 (MAK)
Related: [-]