Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah K Chasanow
Case #: 1:22-cv-01386
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2022
Terminated:Sep 19, 2022
Defendant
Dr. Zowie Barnes
Defendant
Gail Watts
Defendant
Major Robert Alford
Defendant
Ms. Alston
Defendant
Ms. Johnson
Defendant
N. Kpikpitse
Defendant
Renard Brooks
Defendant
Sgt. A. Dupree
Defendant
Sgt. A. Kelly
Defendant
Sgt. B. Rose
Defendant
Sgt. CE. Carter
Defendant
Sgt. G. Carter
Defendant
Sgt. J. Paige
Defendant
Sgt. T. Bond
Plaintiff
Terrence Hammock

GPO Aug 29 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/29/2022. (c/m 8/29/2022 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Sep 19 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/19/2022. (c/m P, 9/19/2022)(kos, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, September 19, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 09/19 11:55 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing the complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/19/2022. (c/m P, 9/19/2022) (kos, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Mon 09/19 11:53 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 9/19/2022. (c/m P, 9/19/2022)(kos, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
5 5 respm Response Thu 09/15 12:07 PM
RESPONSE re4 Order to Show Cause, filed by Terrence Hammock.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, August 29, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order Mon 08/29 1:23 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's Request for class certification; granting Plaintiff 28 days to show cause why the claims asserted in this complaint were not raised in Civil Action TDC-22-482 or why he should not be required to move for leave to raise any additional claims in that action. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/29/2022. (c/m 8/29/2022 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 5 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Mon 08/29 1:20 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/29/2022. (c/m 8/29/2022 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 06/07 8:48 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrence Hammock(bs4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 06/07 8:47 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Terrence Hammock.(bs4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope