Delaware District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00024
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 08, 2022 3:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Jesus Alfaro (4)
Represented By
Andrew G. Ahern, III
Joseph W. Benson, Esq.
contact info
Joseph W. Benson
Joseph W. Benson, Esq.
contact info
Caroline Goldner Cinquanto
Law Firm Of Caroline Goldner Cinquanto
contact info
Defendant
Malik J Moss (1)
Represented By
Daniel C. Breslin
Law Office Of Christopher S. Koyste, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Gerardo Rodriquez (3)
Represented By
David Pugh
David L. Pugh
contact info
John S. Malik
John S. Malik, Esq.
contact info
Eleni Kousoulis
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jacob Santiago (2)
Represented By
Margaret M. Grasso
contact info
Margaret M Grasso
Law Office Of Margaret M. Grasso
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Alexander Ibrahim
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Ruth Mandelbaum
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Jun 20 2023
MEMORANDUM as to Malik J Moss, Jacob Santiago. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/20/2023. (nmf)MEMORANDUM as to Malik J Moss, Jacob Santiago. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/20/2023. (nmf)

Docket last updated: 06/08/2022 4:13 AM EDT
Monday, December 13, 2021
SO ORDERED as to Malik J Moss granting1 MOTION to Seal the Case File filed by USA. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/13/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
SO ORDERED as to Gerardo Rodriquez granting1 MOTION to Seal the Case File filed by USA. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/13/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
SO ORDERED as to Jacob Santiago granting1 MOTION to Seal the Case File filed by USA. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/13/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Seal the Case File by USA as to Malik J Moss. (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Seal the Case File by USA as to Gerardo Rodriquez. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Seal the Case File by USA as to Jacob Santiago. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
2 2 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT by DEA Agent, sworn to before Judge Sherry R. Fallon as to Malik J Moss (1). (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
2 2 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT by DEA Agent, sworn to before Judge Sherry R. Fallon as to Gerardo Rodriquez (1). (lih) Modified on 2/4/2022 (kjk). Criminal Complaint removed. Original SEALED - to be maintained in the Clerk's Office. Redacted version shall be entered. [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
2 2 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT by DEA Agent, sworn to before Judge Sherry R. Fallon as to Jacob Santiago (1). (lih) Modified on 2/4/2022 (kjk). Criminal Complaint removed . Original SEALED - to be maintained in the Clerk's Office . Redacted version shall be entered. [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
Arrest of Malik J Moss (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Initial Appearance as to Malik J Moss held via video conference from Courtroom# 6C on 12/14/2021. Defendant was present without counsel ( CJA counsel to be appointed at a later time ); Deft. orally consented to proceed via video; Court advised counsel of their Brady obligations under Rule 5(f); Govt. filed a Motion For A Detention Hearing; Govt. filed a motion to unseal case file; GRANTED; Deft ordered detained pending preliminary and detention hearing set for 12/22/2021 at 12:00 PM. ATTENDEES: AUSA -C. Howland, Esq.; USPO - A. Ramirez; CLERK - Hicks. (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER appointing Daniel C. Breslin for Malik J Moss until further Order of the Court. The CJA representation type is Criminal Case. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/14/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Malik J Moss: A Preliminary Hearing is set for 12/22/2021 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jacob Santiago (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Initial Appearance as to Jacob Santiago held via video conference from Courtroom# 6C on 12/14/2021. Defendant was present without counsel ( CJA counsel to be appointed at a later time ); Deft. orally consented to proceed via video; Court advised counsel of their Brady obligations under Rule 5(f); Govt. filed a Motion For A Detention Hearing; Govt. filed a motion to unseal case file; GRANTED; Deft ordered detained pending preliminary and detention hearing set for 12/22/2021 at 1:00 PM. ATTENDEES: AUSA -C. Howland, Esq.; USPO - R. Shaw; CLERK - Hicks. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER appointing Margaret M. Grasso for Jacob Santiago until further Order of the Court. The CJA representation type is Criminal Case. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/14/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Jacob Santiago: A Preliminary Hearing is set for 12/22/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Unseal the Case File by USA as to Malik J Moss. (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Unseal the Case File by USA as to Jacob Santiago. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) as to Malik J Moss. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/14/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) as to Jacob Santiago. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/14/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Detain Pending Trial by USA as to Malik J Moss. (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION to Detain Pending Trial by USA as to Jacob Santiago. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Malik J Moss. A Detention Hearing is set for 12/22/2021 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/14/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Jacob Santiago. A Detention Hearing is set for 12/22/2021 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/14/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
SO ORDERED as to Malik J Moss granting3 MOTION to Unseal the Case File filed by USA. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/15/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Gerardo Rodriquez (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Initial Appearance as to Gerardo Rodriquez held via video conference from Courtroom# 6C on 12/15/2021. Defendant was present with counsel ( David Pugh, Esq., from the FPD's Office was appointed ); Deft. orally consented to proceed via video; Court advised counsel of their Brady obligations under Rule 5(f); Govt. filed a Motion For A Detention Hearing; Govt. filed a Motion to Unseal Case File; GRANTED; Deft. contests detention; Deft ordered detained pending preliminary and detention hearing set for 12/22/2021 at 2:00 PM. ATTENDEES: AUSA -A. Ibrahim, Esq.; DEFT - D. Pugh, Esq.; USPO - C. Sain; CLERK - Hicks. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
SO ORDERED as to Gerardo Rodriquez re3 MOTION to Unseal the Case File filed by USA. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/15/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Gerardo Rodriquez: A Preliminary Hearing is set for 12/22/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
SO ORDERED as to Jacob Santiago granting3 MOTION to Unseal the Case File filed by USA. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/15/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Unseal the Case File by USA as to Gerardo Rodriquez. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Gerardo Rodriquez. Appointment of Eleni Kousoulis, Esq. for Gerardo Rodriquez. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/15/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) as to Gerardo Rodriquez. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/15/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
6 6 MOTION to Detain Pending Trial by USA as to Gerardo Rodriquez. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Gerardo Rodriquez. A Detention Hearing is set for 12/22/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/15/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
Oral Motion to Continue Preliminary and Detention Hearing per 12/16/2021 email request of counsel by Jacob Santiago. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
CORRECTING ENTRY: D.I.7 has been replaced with a revised version of the document to correct the signature line. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ruth Mandelbaum appearing for USA. (Mandelbaum, Ruth) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing by Jacob Santiago. (Grasso, Margaret) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ruth Mandelbaum appearing for USA. (Mandelbaum, Ruth) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ruth Mandelbaum appearing for USA. (Mandelbaum, Ruth) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to Jacob Santiago granting7 MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing. A Detention Hearing is set for 1/6/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. A Preliminary Hearing is set for 1/6/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 12/17/2021. (lih) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Pugh appearing for Gerardo Rodriquez (Pugh, David) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 21, 2021
8 8 MOTION for Protective Order Governing Discovery (Unopposed) by USA as to Malik J Moss. (Ibrahim, Alexander) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
9 9 PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Malik J Moss re8 Unopposed Motion for Protective Order Governing Discovery filed by USA. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/21/2021. (ceg) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION to Continue Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue the Detention Hearing by Gerardo Rodriquez.(Pugh, David) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Preliminary Hearing as to Malik J Moss held on 12/22/2021 in courtroom 2A. Defendant was present with counsel. Government and Defendant presented argument regarding probable cause. Probable Cause found. Defendant shall await further action by the Court. ATTENDEES: AUSA - A. Ibrahim, Esq.; DEFT - D. Breslin, Esq.; USPO - J. Sanchez; CLERK - Garfinkel. (ceg) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Detention Hearing as to Malik J Moss held on 12/22/2021 in courtroom 2A. Defendant was present with counsel. Government and Defendant presented argument regarding detention. Government's Motion for Detention is GRANTED. Defendant ordered detained pending trial. ATTENDEES: AUSA - A. Ibrahim, Esq.; DEFT - D. Breslin, Esq.; USPO - J. Sanchez; CLERK - Garfinkel. (ceg) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER of Probable Cause as to Malik J Moss: Defendant is ordered to await further action by the Court. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/22/2021. (ceg) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
11 11 EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST by USA as to Malik J Moss(ceg) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Govt. Exhibit 1
11 11 ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice granting D.I.10 MOTION to Continue Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Continue the Detention Hearing filed by Gerardo Rodriquez as to Gerardo Rodriquez. Time is excluded from 12/22/2021 until 1/6/2022, ( A Detention Hearing is set for 1/6/2022 at 01:00 PM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/22/2021. (dlb) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORAL ORDER as to Malik J Moss GRANTING5 Motion to Detain Pending Trial filed by USA (*a written order will follow). Issued by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/22/2021. (ceg) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
10 10 MOTION for Protective Order Governing Discovery (Unopposed) by USA as to Jacob Santiago. (Ibrahim, Alexander) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
11 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Jacob Santiago re10 Unopposed Motion for Protective Order Governing Discovery filed by USA. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 12/29/2021. (ceg) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION for Protective Order Governing Discovery (Unopposed) by USA as to Gerardo Rodriquez. (Ibrahim, Alexander) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
13 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Gerardo Rodriquez re12 Unopposed Motion for Protective Order Governing Discovery filed by USA. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 12/29/2021. (ceg) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
Remark: Preliminary and Detention Hearing continued. New date and time to be determined. (kjk) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Remark: Preliminary and Detention hearing continued per the joint request from counsel. New hearing date and time to be determined. (kjk) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
12 12 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/7/22 in case as to Jacob Santiago. (kjk) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
13 13 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/14/21 in case as to Malik J Moss. (kjk) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
14 14 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/7/22 in case as to Gerardo Rodriquez. (kjk) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
14 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict and Exclusion of Time Under The Speedy Trial Act (Unopposed) by USA as to Malik J Moss. (Ibrahim, Alexander) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice re14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict and Exclusion of Time Under The Speedy Trial Act (Unopposed) filed by USA as to Malik J Moss. Time is excluded from 1/21/2022 until 2/20/2022. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/13/2022. (dlb) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
Set Hearings as to Gerardo Rodriquez: A Detention Hearing is set for 2/3/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge; A Preliminary Hearing is set for 2/3/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. (kjk) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to Jacob Santiago: A Detention Hearing is set for 2/3/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge; A Preliminary Hearing is set for 2/3/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. (kjk) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Miscellaneous Hearing as to Gerardo Rodriquez held on 2/3/2022; Deft. was present with counsel ( John S. Malik, Esq. appeared on behalf of the defendant as retained counsel ); Mr. Malik stated that he was recently retained and intended to file his Entry of Appearance in addition to a Motion For Release; Counsel requested a two week continuance; Preliminary and Detention Hearing rescheduled for 2/17/22 at 1:00 pm before Judge Fallon in Courtroom #6C. ATTENDEES: AUSA - A. Ibrahim, Esq., R. Mandelbaum, Esq.; DEFT - D. Pugh, Esq., J. Malik, Esq.; USPO - C. Sain; CLERK - Kincaid, N. Gland. (kjk) Modified on 2/9/2022 (kjk). [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Reset Hearings as to Gerardo Rodriquez: A Detention Hearing is set for 2/17/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon; A Preliminary Hearing is set for 2/17/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (kjk) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Preliminary Hearing as to Jacob Santiago held on 2/3/2022 in Courtroom 2B. Defendant was present with counsel. Probable Cause Found; Deft shall await further action by the Court. ATTENDEES: AUSA - A. Ibrahim, Esq. and R. Mandelbaum; DEFT - M. Grasso, Esq.; USPO - R. Shaw; CLERK - Kincaid. (nmg) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary Pat Thynge - Detention Hearing as to Jacob Santiago held on 2/3/2022 in Courtroom 2B. Defendant was present with counsel. Counsel presented argument regarding detention. Government's Motion for Detention is GRANTED. Defendant ordered detained pending trial. ATTENDEES: AUSA - A. Ibrahim, Esq., R. Mandelbaum; DEFT - M. Grasso, Esq.; USPO - R. Shaw; CLERK - Kincaid. (nmg) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER of Probable Cause as to Jacob Santiago: Defendant is ordered to await further action by the Court. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/3/2022. (nmg) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
14 14 WITNESS and EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Jacob Santiago. (nmg) (kjk). [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/18/2022) Redacted Criminal Complaint. Govt. Exhibit 1
15 15 ORAL ORDER granting5 Motion for Detention Hearing as to Jacob Santiago (1). Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/3/2022. (nmg) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
16 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict and Exclusion of Time Under The Speedy Trial Act (Unopposed) by USA as to Malik J Moss. (Ibrahim, Alexander) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
15 15 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John S. Malik appearing for Gerardo Rodriquez (Malik, John) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
Minute Entry for proceedings held via video conference from Courtroom# 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon - Miscellaneous Hearing as to Gerardo Rodriquez held on 2/17/2022. Defendant was present with counsel ( John Mailk, Esq. Esq.,); Deft. orally consented to proceed via video; Deft. made an oral application to reschedule preliminary and detention hearings; Govt. did not oppose the request; Deft's request to reschedule hearings to 2/24/2022 at 1:00 pm; GRANTED. Deft. ordered to submit written request to reschedule hearings. Deft ordered detained pending preliminary and detention hearing set for 2/24/2022 at 1:00 PM. ATTENDEES: AUSA -R. Mandelbaum, Esq.; DEFT- J. Malik, Esq.; USPO - A. Docherty; CLERK - Hicks. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings as to Gerardo Rodriquez: A Detention Hearing is set for 2/24/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Jennifer L. Hall. A Preliminary Hearing is set for 2/24/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Jennifer L. Hall. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
16 16 REDACTED VERSION of 2 Criminal Complaint by USA as to Gerardo Rodriquez. (kjk) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
16 16 REDACTED VERSION of 2 Criminal Complaint by USA as to Jacob Santiago. (kjk) [1:21-mj-00343-UNA]
Related: [-]
17 17 REDACTED VERSION of2 Criminal Complaint by USA as to Malik J Moss. (kjk) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
17 17 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing and Pretrial Detention Hearing by Gerardo Rodriquez. (Malik, John) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER as to Malik J Moss granting16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict and Exclusion of Time Under The Speedy Trial Act (Unopposed). ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice as to Malik J Moss. Time is excluded from 2/11/2022 until 3/22/2022. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/8/2022. (lih) [1:21-mj-00342-UNA]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER as to Gerardo Rodriquez GRANTING17 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing and Pretrial Detention Hearing. ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice as to Gerardo Rodriquez. Time is excluded from 2/18/2022 until 2/24/2022. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 2/18/2022. (lih) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 24, 2022
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jennifer L. Hall - Preliminary Hearing as to Gerardo Rodriquez held on 2/24/2022 in courtroom 2B. Defendant was present with counsel. Probable Cause found. Defendant shall await further action by the Court. ATTENDEES: AUSA - R. Mandelbaum, Esq.; DEFT - J. Malik, Esq.; USPO - R. Shaw; CLERK - Garfinkel. (ceg) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jennifer L. Hall - Detention Hearing as to Gerardo Rodriquez held on 2/24/2022 in courtroom 2B. Defendant was present with counsel. Government and Defendant presented argument regarding detention. The Court GRANTED the Government's motion to detain. Defendant ordered detained pending trial. ATTENDEES: AUSA - R. Mandelbaum, Esq.; DEFT - J. Malik, Esq.; USPO - R. Shaw; CLERK - Garfinkel. (ceg) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER of Probable Cause as to Gerardo Rodriquez: Defendant is ordered to await further action by the Court. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/24/2022. (ceg) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
20 20 EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST as to Gerardo Rodriquez. (ceg) (kjk). [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/2/2022) Govt.'s Exhibit 1 ( Preliminary Hearing )
21 21 ORAL ORDER: The Government's Motion for Detention (D.I.6 ) as to Gerardo Rodriquez is GRANTED. The defendant is ordered detained pending trial. (*a written order will follow). Ordered by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/24/2022. (ceg) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
22 22 EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST as to Gerardo Rodriquez.(ceg) (kjk). [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Character Reference Letters # 2 Govt's Exhibit 1 ( Prelim / Deten. Hrg.)
Friday, February 25, 2022
23 23 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Gerardo Rodriquez. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 2/25/2022. (ceg) [1:21-mj-00344-UNA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
Set Hearings as to Malik J Moss, Jacob Santiago, Gerardo Rodriquez: An Arraignment is set for 3/24/2022 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. (kjk)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jesus Alfaro (dlb)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Initial Appearance as to Jesus Alfaro held on 3/10/2022. Government filed a Motion for Detention. Defendant indicated he was in the process of retaining counsel, Joe Benson. Defendant appeared without counsel for his Initial Appearance. The Court will set Detention Hearing and Arraignment. The Court advised counsel of their Brady obligations under Rule 5(f). (Clerk, Benyo) APPEARANCES: A. Ibrahim, G. Robinson for Government; B. Williams for USPO. (dlb)
Related: [-]
24 24 INDICTMENT with a Notice of Forfeiture as to Malik J. Moss (1) count 1, Jacob Santiago (2) count 1, Gerardo Rodriquez (3) count 1, Jesus Alfaro (4) count 1. ( Original SEALED - to be maintained in the Clerk's Office ) (kjk)
Related: [-]
25 25 REDACTED VERSION of 24 Indictment with a Notice of Forfeiture by USA as to Malik J Moss, Jacob Santiago, Gerardo Rodriquez, Jesus Alfaro.(kjk) (kjk). (ceg). (kmd).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Defendant Information Sheet,
Att: 2 Defendant Information Sheet,
Att: 3 Defendant Information Sheet,
Att: 4 Defendant Information Sheet
Att: 5 (3/25/2022) Malik Moss and Gerardo Rodruguez NGP
Att: 6 (4/1/2022) Jesus Alfaro and Jacob Santiago NGP
Att: 7 (5/24/2022) Moss Signature Page - Guilty Plea
26 26 MOTION to Detain Pending Trial by USA as to Jesus Alfaro. (dlb)
Related: [-]