Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-07732
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 06, 2022 5:06 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JASON CUCINOTTA
Represented By
JASON BENJAMIN WOLF
Parafinczuk & Wolf - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, June 17, 2022
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 06/17 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM - Syracuse, NY by JASON CUCINOTTA (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 06/08 2:11 PM
NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM by JASON CUCINOTTA (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 06/08 2:09 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/08 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7167495.), filed by JASON CUCINOTTA. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]