Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Case #: 1:22-cv-02259
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2022
Terminated:Jan 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 04, 2022 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC
Represented By
Steven William Hardy
Steven W. Hardy, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Erin Williamson
Represented By
Steven William Hardy
Steven W. Hardy, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jason Woodward
7 Pritchard Way
Atlanta, GA 30326
Interested Party
Marques-Jeremiah Worthmore
Interested Party
Courtney Thomas
Interested Party
Nicci Savant
Interested Party
Darriana Reda
Interested Party
Steven Reames
Interested Party
Saul Peralta Ramirez
Interested Party
Cameron Ortego
Interested Party
William Murphy
Interested Party
Michael Magno
Interested Party
Nicole King
Interested Party
Torrey Cox
Interested Party
S. Tek Chang
Interested Party
Mario Campos
Plaintiff
Jonathan Schechter
Represented By
David S. Fried
Fried Bonder White, LLC
contact info
Joseph Alan White
Fried Bonder White, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Amanda Maylor
Represented By
David S. Fried
Fried Bonder White, LLC
contact info
Joseph Alan White
Fried Bonder White, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Garrison Finzer
Represented By
David S. Fried
Fried Bonder White, LLC
contact info
Joseph Alan White
Fried Bonder White, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
44 44 misc Mail Returned Wed 07/10 4:11 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Jason Woodward re42 Order,43 Order-Default Judgment. Marked: return to sender, no such, street, unable to forward. (ces)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
43 43 order Judgment - Default Tue 01/30 4:29 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs against Jason Woodward (ces)
Related: [-]
42 42 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 01/30 4:24 PM
ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the Motion for Default Judgment40 and the Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Default Judgment41 . Having considered Plaintiffs' Motion and Supplemental Brief, and for good cause shown, the Court herbey GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs are GRANTED a default judgment against Defendant Jason Wooward as to liability on the claims which are the subject of their Motion, and awarded damages to the following Plaintiffs, consistent with the evidence proferred in support of their Motion, in the following amounts: (See Order for Amounts). Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/30/24. (ces)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 01/30 4:29 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Woodward re42 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,43 Order-Default Judgment. (ces)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/30 4:30 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ces)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 09/27 3:56 PM
Submission of40 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jason Woodward ,41 Supplemental MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jason Woodard Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Default Judgment , to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
41 41 motion Default Judgment Wed 09/06 6:41 PM
Supplemental MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jason Woodard Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Default Judgment with Brief In Support by Mario Campos, S. Tek Chang, Torrey Cox, Garrison Finzer, Nicole King, Michael Magno, Amanda Maylor, William Murphy, Cameron Ortego, Saul Peralta Ramirez, Steven Reames, Darriana Reda, Nicci Savant, Jonathan Schechter, Courtney Thomas, Marques-Jeremiah Worthmore.(White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit M - Declaration of Darriana Reda,
Att: 2 Exhibit N - Declaration of Mario Campos,
Att: 3 Exhibit O - Declaration of Nicole King,
Att: 4 Exhibit P - Declaration or Saul Ramirez,
Att: 5 Exhibit Q - Declaration of Courtney Thomas,
Att: 6 Exhibit R - Updated Damages Calculation
Thursday, August 24, 2023
40 40 motion Default Judgment Thu 08/24 4:24 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Jason Woodward with Brief In Support by Mario Campos, S. Tek Chang, Torrey Cox, Garrison Finzer, Nicole King, Michael Magno, Amanda Maylor, William Murphy, Cameron Ortego, Saul Peralta Ramirez, Steven Reames, Darriana Reda, Nicci Savant, Jonathan Schechter, Courtney Thomas, Marques-Jeremiah Worthmore.(White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Declaration of S. Tek Chang,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Torrey Cox,
Att: 4 Brief C - Declaration of Garrison Finzer,
Att: 5 Brief D - Declaration of Amanda Maylor,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Declaration of William Murphy,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Declaration of Cameron Ortego,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Declaration of Steven Reames,
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Jonathan Schechter,
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Declaration of Marquez-Jeremiah Worthmore,
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Declaration of Erin Williamson,
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Certificate of Dissolution,
Att: 13 Exhibit L - Damages Calculation Worksheet
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 08/24 1:37 PM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendant Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC.38 . Upon review of the Motion, the Motion is GRANTED.38 . All claims against Defendant Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and Defendant Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this action. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/24/23. (ces)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/24 1:39 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Woodward re39 Order on Motion to Dismiss. (ces)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
38 38 motion Dismiss Wed 08/23 5:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter.(White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, August 14, 2023
37 37 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 08/14 1:20 PM
ORDER: The Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to show cause, within ten (10) days of this order, as to why their claims against Defendant Woodward should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this case to the undersigned after expiration of the ten (10)-day period. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/14/23. (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 08/14 1:22 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Woodward re37 Order to Show Cause. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
36 36 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Thu 07/20 2:57 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Plaintiffs' "Renewed Motion to Strike Defendant Jason Woodward's Answer and/or for Entry of Default Judgment Against Him."35 . Specifically, the Court grants the motion in that it DIRECTS the Clerk to STRIKE Defendant Woodward's Answer13 and to ENTER DEFAULT against him. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' motion to the extent that the undersigned does not yet enter default judgment against Defendant Woodward. Instead, the Court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to file a motion for default judgment pursuant to the appropriate provision of Rule 55(b), should they elect to seek such a judgment against Defendant Woodward. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 7/20/23. (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/20 2:58 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Woodward re36 Order on Motion to Strike. (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Entry of Default Thu 07/20 2:59 PM
Clerks Entry of Default as to Jason Woodward (ceo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 07/11 12:53 PM
Submission of35 MOTION to Strike Defendant Jason Woodward's Answer and/or For Entry of Default Judgment Against Him , to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
35 35 motion Strike Tue 06/20 3:00 PM
MOTION to Strike Defendant Jason Woodward's Answer and/or For Entry of Default Judgment Against Him by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter. (White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
34 34 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 05/26 12:33 PM
ORDER: The Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Plaintiffs' "Motion to Strike Defendant Jason Woodward's Answer, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Compel."30 . Specifically, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to compel responses from Defendant Woodward as to Plaintiffs' First Discovery Requests. The Court ORDERS Defendant Woodward to, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order, respond to Plaintiffs' First Discovery Requests without objection. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' motion to strike Defendant Woodward's Answer. Additionally, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' "Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery."32 . The Court hereby REOPENS the discovery period in this case and extends it through and including July 25, 2023. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 5/26/23. (ceo)
Related: [-]
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 05/26 11:56 AM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendant Erin Williamson.31 . Upon review, the Motion is GRANTED. All claims against Defendant Erin Williamson are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and Defendant Erin Williamson is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this action. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 5/26/23. (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:57 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Woodward re33 Order on Motion to Dismiss. (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 12:34 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Woodward re34 Order. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
32 32 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 05/16 5:39 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter.(White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
31 31 motion Dismiss Tue 05/16 2:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Erin Williamson by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter.(White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
30 30 motion Strike Wed 05/03 2:48 PM
MOTION to Strike Defendant Jason Woodward's Answer, or in the Alternative, Motion to Compel with Brief In Support by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter.(White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, Motion to Compel,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' First Discovery Requests,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - 2/20/23 Email to Def. Woodward,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - 3/6/23 Letter to Def. Woodward,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - 4/18/23 Email to Def. Woodward
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 03/15 3:52 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The time for the parties to conduct discovery in this case is hereby extended through and including May 16, 2023. All corresponding deadlines shall be adjusted accordingly. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/15/23. (ceo)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 03/15 2:04 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter.(White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email re: Outstanding Discovery,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Correspondence re: Outstanding Discovery,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/15 3:52 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Woodward re29 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
27 27 misc Leave of Absence Wed 03/08 3:00 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 03/29/23 through 04/10/23, 06/12/23 through 06/21/23, 12/15/23 through 12/29/23, by Joseph Alan White. (White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
26 26 discov Certificate of Service Tue 01/10 3:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Jason Woodward by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter.(White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Tue 01/10 3:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents to Defendants Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC and Erin Williamson by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter.(White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
24 24 discov Initial Disclosures Tue 12/06 8:44 PM
Initial Disclosures by Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC.(Hardy, Steven)
Related: [-]
23 23 discov Initial Disclosures Tue 12/06 6:01 PM
Initial Disclosures by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter.(White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/18 9:38 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Woodward re22 Scheduling Order. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
22 22 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/17 4:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:21 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan: This case remains on a four (4)- month discovery track, with discovery in this matter concluding on March 17, 2023. The Court LIFTS the previously imposed stay of proceedings. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/17/22. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
21 21 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Tue 11/15 10:13 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC. (Hardy, Steven)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Tue 11/08 5:23 PM
NOTICE by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter of Completion of Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference (White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
19 19 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 11/02 3:45 PM
ORDER: The Court DENIES Defendant Woodward's construed motion for access to the Court's electronic filing and notification system.18 . Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/2/22. (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 11/02 3:46 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Woodward re19 Order. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/27 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Woodward as Pro Se (ceo)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Fri 10/07 12:15 PM
Clerks Notation re16 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor and Jonathan Schechter. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
17 17 5 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Set Submission Deadline Wed 10/05 9:22 AM
ORDER: As a preliminary matter, the Court DIRECTS Defendant Woodward to, within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this order, (1) file a notice setting forth his current address and telephone number and (2) contact the Clerk of Court's office to have his contact information added to the docket. The Court DIRECTS the Represented Parties to contact Defendant Woodward and to hold a Rule 26(f) conference with him. The Court DIRECTS that the Rule 26(f) conference with Defendant Woodward should take place no later than fourteen (14) days after he files the notice with his contact information on the docket. The Court DIRECTS Defendant Woodward to participate in a Rule 26(f) conference with the Represented Parties within the time provided. Additionally, the Court DIRECTS the Represented Parties to file a notice on the docket indicating the date and time of the Rule 26(f) conference with Defendant Woodward once the conference has been held.Whether with the other Parties or individually, the Court DIRECTS Defendant Woodward to file his portion of the JPRDP. Finally, the Court STAYS these proceedings and DIRECTS the Clerk to mail a copy of this order to Defendant Woodward's last known residential address. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to resubmit this matter to the undersigned after twenty- one (21) days. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/5/22. (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 10/05 9:24 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Jason Woodward re17 Order. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
16 16 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 09/28 5:33 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter. (White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Wed 09/28 5:30 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter.(White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order
Monday, September 19, 2022
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/19 10:38 AM
NOTICE by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter of Filing of Consents to Join(White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent to Join of Cameron Ortego,
Att: 2 Exhibit Consent to Join of Courtney Thomas,
Att: 3 Exhibit Consent to Join of Darriana Reda,
Att: 4 Exhibit Consent to Join of Mario Campos,
Att: 5 Exhibit Consent to Join of Marques-Jeremih Worthmore,
Att: 6 Exhibit Consent to Join of Michael Magno,
Att: 7 Exhibit Consent to Join of Nicci Savant,
Att: 8 Exhibit Consent to Join of Nicole King,
Att: 9 Exhibit Consent to Join of S. Tek Chang,
Att: 10 Exhibit Consent to Join of Saul Peralta Ramirez,
Att: 11 Exhibit Consent to Join of Steven Reames,
Att: 12 Exhibit Consent to Join of Torrey Cox,
Att: 13 Exhibit Consent to Join of William Murphy
Monday, August 29, 2022
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/30 8:50 AM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Jason Woodward.(tcc)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/29 6:40 PM
Defendants Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC and Erin Williamson's ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC. Discovery ends on 1/26/2023.(Hardy, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 08/17 11:16 AM
ORDER granting10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendants Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC, Erin Williamson, and Jason Woodward shall have up to and including August 29, 2022 to file a response to the Complaint served upon each of them in this action. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 8/17/22. (ceo)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/17 11:17 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC answer due 8/29/2022; Erin Williamson answer due 8/29/2022; Jason Woodward answer due 8/29/2022. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
10 10 motion Extension of Time Tue 08/16 11:18 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor, Jonathan Schechter. (White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Tue 08/09 3:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Jason Woodward. (White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Thu 08/04 2:01 PM
Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint. Erin Williamson served 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. (White, Joseph) Modified on 8/4/2022 to edit text(ane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Wed 07/27 12:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint , as to Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC. (White, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
6 6 12 pgs order Order Fri 06/10 9:29 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 06/08 4:47 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross for all further proceedings. Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-cv-02259-ELR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Charles A. Pannell, Jr. on 6/8/2022. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 06/08 8:57 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Atlanta Bar & Grille, LLC. (nmb)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 06/08 8:56 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Jason Woodward. (nmb)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 06/08 8:56 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Erin Williamson. (nmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/08 8:55 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jonathan Schechter, Garrison Finzer, Amanda Maylor. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11849597)(nmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet