CARMIEL v. MONSANTO COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-03389 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 08, 2022 |
Case in other court: | New Jersey, 3:22-cv-02813 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 06, 2022 2:01 AM PST |
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-50
|
|
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BILHA CARMIEL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, January 13, 2025 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting in part and denying in part 19572 , 19609 Motion to Dismiss. Associated cases: 3:16-md-02741-VC; 3:22-cv-03389-VC; 3:23-cv-04605-VC; 3:23-cv-05241-VC; 3:23-cv-06435-VC; 3:24-cv-00684-VC; 3:24-cv-01445-VC; 3:24-cv-01595-VC; 3:24-cv-01615-VC; 3:24-cv-01613-VC. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Tuesday, December 03, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER DENYING 19305 , 19306 , 19571 , 19583 MOTIONS TO MOVE WAVES by Judge Vince Chhabria. Associated Cases: 3:16-md-02741-VC; 3:19-cv-07533-VC; 3:20-cv-03067-VC; 3:21-cv-09832-VC; 3:22-cv-03389-VC; 3:23-cv-02509-VC. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Thursday, November 07, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 11/07 9:29 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 11/12/2024 MOTION HEARINGS. The Court will issue a written ruling based on the motions and the responsive briefs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxs, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, November 06, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() REPLY filed byMonsanto Company.(Martinez, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 22, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Second MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Failure to Submit a Plaintiff Fact Sheet [Re: Bilha Carmiel] filed by Monsanto Company. Responses due by 11/5/2024. Replies due by 11/12/2024.(Martinez, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, October 14, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION to Transfer Case to Wave 9 filed by Bilha Carmiel. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2024 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 10/29/2024. Replies due by 11/5/2024. (Kizis, Lynne) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Amended MOTION to Dismiss to Dismiss with Prejudice for Failure to Submit a Plaintiff Fact Sheet [Carmiel] filed by Monsanto Company. Responses due by 10/28/2024. Replies due by 11/4/2024.(Martinez, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() First MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice for Failure to Submit a Plaintiff Fact Sheet [Carmiel] filed by Monsanto Company. Responses due by 10/28/2024. Replies due by 11/4/2024.(Martinez, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO MOVE CASES TO WAVE 8. Associated Cases: See Order. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() MOTION to Move Case to Wave 8C [Unopposed} filed by BILHA CARMIEL. Responses due by 2/14/2024. Replies due by 2/21/2024.(Kizis, Lynne) Modified on 1/31/2024 (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Bilha Carmiel] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Bilha Carmiel] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Defendant Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Bilha Carmiel] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
Wednesday, June 08, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 3:22-cv-02813. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
4 | 4
![]() Order of MDL Panel (CTO-334) transferring case to the USDC for the CAND. (dm ) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 06/08 6:23 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2741: New Jersey (Trenton), 3:22-cv-02813-MAS-LHG, Carmiel v. Monsanto Company, et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:22-cv-03389-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 334 cc: JPMDL (mjj2, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, June 01, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Friday, May 13, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (kht) |