Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-07783
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 09, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 06, 2022 4:55 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JOSHUA GENBERG
Represented By
JASON BENJAMIN WOLF
Parafinczuk & Wolf - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, June 17, 2022
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 06/17 2:01 PM
NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM - KADC by JOSHUA GENBERG (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 06/09 8:14 AM
NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM by JOSHUA GENBERG (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 06/09 8:12 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/09 8:10 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7169649.), filed by JOSHUA GENBERG. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]