Texas Western District Court
Judge:Frank Montalvo
Case #: 3:22-cv-00202
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2022
Terminated:Jan 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 16, 2024 12:25 AM CDT
Defendant
Sedrick Ambroise
Defendant
Omega Capital Funding Inc.
Plaintiff
James Everett Shelton
316 Covered Bridge Road
King of Prussia, PA 19406


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, January 23, 2023
12 12 misc Certified Mail Receipt Tue 01/24 9:53 AM
Certified Mail Receipt of8 Order to Show Cause (jg1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
11 11 misc Certified Mailing Thu 01/12 11:31 AM
Certified Mailing of10 Judgment (jg1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
10 10 order Judgment Wed 01/11 5:26 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certified Mailing Wed 01/11 5:21 PM
Certified Mailing of8 Order to Show Cause (jg1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 01/10 5:40 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to James Everett Shelton. Show Cause Response due by 1/27/2023,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 01/10 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Everett Shelton (jg1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/03 1:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Everett Shelton. Sedrick Ambroise served on 10/19/2022, answer due 11/9/2022. (jg1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 09/15 6:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Sedrick Ambroise. (jg1)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/15 6:13 PM
PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sedrick Ambroise, Omega Capital Funding Inc. amending, filed by James Everett Shelton.(jg1)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/09 3:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Everett Shelton. Omega Capital Funding Inc. served on 8/13/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (jg1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 06/09 11:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Omega Capital Funding Inc.. (jg1)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/09 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 158), filed by James Everett Shelton.(jg1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 filing fee receipt
misc To be Referred to EP Mag Judge Thu 06/09 11:42 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (jg1)
Related: [-]