Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-00189

North Carolina Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Pamela W Mcafee
Case #: 5:22-ap-00108
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2022
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust
Represented By
The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust
contact info
Defendant
Kasandra W. Herbert, in her capacity as trustee of The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust
Represented By
Kasandra W. Herbert
contact info
Defendant
M.B.H., a minor, in her capacity as beneficiary of The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust
Represented By
M.B.H., a minor
contact info
Defendant
K and H Advantages
Represented By
K and H Advantages
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard D. Sparkman
Represented By
George F. Sanderson, III
The Sanderson Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
admis Pay Fee-AP Wed 12/04 12:00 PM
Payment of AP Filing Fee in the amount of $350 filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D. Sparkman. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none (ADI) Wed 12/04 12:03 PM
Receipt Of Filing Fee For Payment of AP Fee([LINK 22-00108 5-PWM] ) [admis,payfeeap] ( 350.00), Receipt Number A18229687, Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/03 12:35 PM
Adversary Case 5:22-ap-108 Closed (Donnery, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
29 29 notice Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 10/01 6:06 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Jennifer K. Bennington, J.M. Cook, George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Kasandra W. Herbert, K and H Advantages, M.B.H., a minor, Richard D. Sparkman, The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2023
28 28 order Compromise Mon 01/09 10:01 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 24
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Wed 12/14 8:08 AM
Deadline(s) Terminated/certificate of service filed. Related [+] (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-] ument no. 26 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP)
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
27 27 misc Certificate of Service (Not for Summons) Tue 12/13 3:37 PM
Certificate of Service filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D. Sparkman Related [+]. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Approve Compromise With The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust, Kasandra W. Herbert, M.B.H. through guardian ad litem Jennifer K. Bennington, and K and H Advantages
26 26 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (AP) Tue 12/13 3:04 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to George Sanderson. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The certificate of service was omitted. Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief. Related [+] Due by 1/5/2023. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.24 Motion to Approve Compromise With The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust, Kasandra W. Herbert, M.B.H. through guardian ad litem Jennifer K. Bennington, and K and H Advantages filed by Richard D. Sparkman
Monday, December 12, 2022
25 25 admis Report of Mediator/Examiner Mon 12/12 1:58 PM
Report of Mediator filed by Jason L. Hendren on behalf of Jason Hendren. (Hendren, Jason)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Compromise Mon 12/12 11:35 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise With The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust, Kasandra W. Herbert, M.B.H. through guardian ad litem Jennifer K. Bennington, and K and H Advantages filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D. Sparkman. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2022
23 23 order Extend Time Wed 11/09 4:05 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Guardian Ad Litem for Defendant, M.B.H, a minor Answer due by 1/9/2023. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 21
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
22 22 3 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Tue 11/08 12:58 PM
Order Granting Joint Motion to Mediate Adversary Proceeding and Motion and Order to Show Cause filed by George F. Sanderson, III, J.M. Cook, Jennifer K. Bennington on behalf of Richard D. Sparkman, The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust, Kasandra W. Herbert, M.B.H, a minor, and K and H Advantages Related [+] (Brock, Anna)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, November 07, 2022
21 21 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Mon 11/07 3:47 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time to File Response, filed by Jennifer K. Bennington on behalf of M.B.H., a minor. (Bennington, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadline (Public) Mon 11/07 3:51 PM
Deadline(s) Terminated. Revised Proposed Order Received. Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no. 20 Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK)
Friday, November 04, 2022
20 20 court Deficiency Notice - Attorney (BK) Fri 11/04 10:57 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE to George Sanderson. The referenced document has been filed; however, it is deficient as follows: The order uploaded is incorrect, illegible or improperly formatted (Sentence # 3 in the Proposed Order and Motion have incorrect year that Docket Entry # 173 was entered. Correct year should be 2022). Failure to correct the deficiencies by the date indicated may result in the court assuming you no longer desire the relief requested and entering an order denying or dismissing the requested relief, or in the matter being forwarded to the judge for appropriate action. Related [+] Due by 11/14/2022. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.19 Joint Motion to Establish a Procedure - to Mediate filed by Richard D. Sparkman, The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust, Kasandra W. Herbert, M.B.H., a minor, K and H Advantages
Thursday, November 03, 2022
19 19 motion Establish a Procedure Thu 11/03 6:28 PM
Joint Motion to Establish a Procedure - to Mediate filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Kasandra W. Herbert, K and H Advantages, M.B.H., a minor, Richard D. Sparkman, The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 27, 2022
utility Note - Other (Public) Thu 10/27 3:09 PM
NOTE: Audio file for hearing located in Case Number 21-00189 5-PWM. (Crossman, Ahronda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
18 18 order Status Conference (Continued) Wed 09/28 3:53 PM
Order Continuing Status Conference Status hearing to be held on 10/27/2022 at 11:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. Related [+]. (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 17 Order Setting Status Conference
Monday, September 26, 2022
17 17 order Status Conference (Set) Mon 09/26 1:42 PM
Order Setting Status Conference Status hearing to be held on 10/4/2022 at 10:30 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. . (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-]
16 16 utility Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Mon 09/26 1:39 PM
Matter Scheduled/Added to Calendar Related [+] (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] ument no.14 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, September 08, 2022
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/08 7:04 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by J.M. Cook on behalf of Kasandra W. Herbert, K and H Advantages, The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust. (Cook, J.M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
14 14 order Extend Time Fri 09/02 3:53 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Guardian Ad Litem for Defendant, M.B.H, a minor Answer due by 11/7/2022. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, September 01, 2022
13 13 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Thu 09/01 12:08 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, filed by Jennifer K. Bennington on behalf of M.B.H., a minor Related [+]. (Bennington, Jennifer)
Related: [-] ument no.1 Complaint
Monday, August 29, 2022
12 12 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Mon 08/29 12:59 PM
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
11 11 audio Wed 08/24 3:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [08/24/2022 11:02:41 AM]. File Size [ 4204 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:12:24 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
10 10 order Status Conference (Set) Thu 08/11 2:55 PM
Order Setting Status Conference Status hearing to be held on 8/24/2022 at 11:00 AM at Raleigh Courtroom. Related [+]. (Howard, Allyson)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Status Conference filed by Defendant The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust, Defendant Kasandra W. Herbert, Defendant K and H Advantages
9 9 utility Calendar - Schedule Thu 08/11 11:35 AM
Note to Courtroom Deputy - Schedule Hearing Date Related [+] (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] ument no.7 Motion for Status Conference filed by Defendant The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust, Defendant Kasandra W. Herbert, Defendant K and H Advantages
8 8 order Extend Time Thu 08/11 11:03 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Answer due by 9/8/2022. (Gibson, Aileen)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
7 7 motion Extend Time/Deadlines Tue 08/09 3:10 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer,Time to File Response,, Motion for Status Conference filed by J.M. Cook on behalf of Kasandra W. Herbert, K and H Advantages, The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust. (Cook, J.M.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
6 6 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Fri 07/01 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate Of Mailing - Order Notice Date 06/30/2022. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 06/28 2:53 PM
Order Extending Answer Deadline. (Felder-Campbell, Jade)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 06/15 4:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on Kasandra W. Herbert 6/14/2022; K and H Advantages 6/14/2022; M.B.H., a minor 6/14/2022; The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust 6/14/2022. filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D. Sparkman. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
3 3 misc Document Filed Under Seal Wed 06/08 4:14 PM
Document Filed Under Seal ( Rule 9037(f) Reference List for Complaint ) filed by George F. Sanderson III on behalf of Richard D. Sparkman. (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 06/08 3:59 PM
Summons Issued on The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust Answer Due 07/8/2022; Kasandra W. Herbert, in her capacity as trustee of The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust Answer Due 07/8/2022; M.B.H., a minor, in her capacity as beneficiary of The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust Answer Due 07/8/2022; K and H Advantages Answer Due 07/8/2022 (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/08 3:59 PM
Adversary case 22-00108 5. Complaint by Richard D. Sparkman against The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust, Kasandra W. Herbert, in her capacity as trustee of The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust, M.B.H., a minor, in her capacity as beneficiary of The M.B.H. Special Needs Trust, K and H Advantages (Fee Deferred) (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Sanderson, George)
Related: [-]