Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:22-cv-03386
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332pip
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2022
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:22-cv-01392
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 06, 2022 2:17 AM PST
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Rhoda Shirley
Represented By
Charles H. Johnson
Law Offices Of Charles H. Johnson, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, August 10, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Thu 08/10 2:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice [Rhoda Shirley] filed by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 07/20 11:48 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Estate of Rhoda Shirley] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 07/20 11:46 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Estate of Rhoda Shirley] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/20 11:44 AM
Defendant Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Estate of Rhoda Shirley] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 06/09 11:08 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:22-cv-01392. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Thu 06/09 11:10 AM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 16-md-2741: Minnesota, 22-cv-1392, Estate of Rhoda Shirley v. Monsanto, Opened in California Northern District as 22-cv-3386 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 334 cc: JPMDL (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
6 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-334) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria.(kt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
5 5 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (ACH)
Related: [-]
4 4 Clerk's Notice to JPML regarding case potentially related to MDL #2741 re:1 Complaint. (ACH)
Related: [-]
3 3 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. REISSUED//Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (ACH) Modified text on 5/24/2022 (ACH).
Related: [-]
2 2 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 22-cv-1392 JRT/DTS. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9531490) filed by Estate of Rhoda Shirley. Filer requests summons issued. (Johnson, Charles) Modified text on 5/24/2022 (MMP).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION: The plaintiff name was entered correctly on case opening. Docket3 Summons Issued has been marked as filed in error and the Summons was reissued at docket5 . (ACH)
Related: [-]