Utah District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00209
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2022
Last checked: Friday Jun 10, 2022 1:33 AM MDT
Defendant
Michael Paul Gibb (1)
Represented By
Audrey K. James
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Robert B. Breeze
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Aaron B. Clark
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cy H. Castle
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jennifer E. Gully
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/10/2023 4:18 AM MST
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT as to Michael Paul Gibb (1). Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. (mas) [2:22-mj-00375-CMR]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 27, 2022
3 3 2 pgs NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert B. Breeze appearing for Michael Paul Gibb (Breeze, Robert) [2:22-mj-00375-CMR]
Related: [-]
4 4 **SEALED DOCUMENT** PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Michael Paul Gibb (mec) [2:22-mj-00375-CMR]
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs MOTION for Detention by USA as to Michael Paul Gibb. (Gully, Jennifer) [2:22-mj-00375-CMR]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero: Initial Appearance/Pretrial Conference/Detention Hearing as to Michael Paul Gibb held on 5/27/2022. Defendant present with counsel and in custody. Rights and penalties explained. Defendant has retained counsel. Added attorney Robert B. Breeze for Michael Paul Gibb. Government seeks detention. Defendant requests continuance of detention hearing. Court reschedules matter. Court orders Defendant remain detained and remanded to USMS custody. (Detention Hearing set for 6/2/2022 at 01:30 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Jennifer Gully, Attorney for Defendant: Bob Breeze, Retained. Interpreter: ASL Possibly Needed. Probation Officer: Cat Bye-Routh. Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: 2:45:56 PM, Time End: 2:55:45 PM, Room 8.400.) (mas) [2:22-mj-00375-CMR]
Related: [-]
7 7 AMENDED ORDER SETTING IN-PERSON HEARING as to Michael Paul Gibb: Detention Hearing set for 6/2/2022 at 12:30 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 5/27/2022.(mas) [2:22-mj-00375-CMR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
8 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Michael Gibb by Robert B. Breeze. filed by Michael Paul Gibb. (Breeze, Robert) [2:22-mj-00375-CMR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett: Motion Hearing as to Michael Paul Gibb held on 6/2/2022 re8 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Michael Gibb by Robert B. Breeze filed by Michael Paul Gibb.The court GRANTS8 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel. The court appoints FPD counsel. Added attorney Audrey K. James for Michael Paul Gibb. Attorney Robert B. Breeze terminated in case as to Michael Paul Gibb.The detention hearing is continued to allow a PTS report to be prepared. The defendant is remanded to the USMS pending detention hearing. Court Reporter required N. Interpreter required Y. Is this an In-person Hearing Y.( Detention Hearing set for 6/9/2022 at 01:30 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Vernon Stejskal, Attorney for Defendant: Robert Breeze and Robert Steele, FPD. Interpreter: ASL Interpreter. Probation Officer: Cat Bye-Routh. Court Reporter: electronic.(Time Start: 12:35:29 PM, Time End: 12:45:29 PM, Room 8.400.) (ksm) [2:22-mj-00375-CMR]
Related: [-]
10 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 8 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Michael Paul Gibb as to Michael Paul Gibb (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/2/22. No attached document. (ksm) [2:22-mj-00375-CMR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
12 12 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Michael Paul Gibb (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5. Assigned to Judge David Barlow. (jl)
Related: [-]