BL Santa Fe, LLC v. HRV Hotel Partners, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:21-bk-11190
Lead BK case is: 1:21-bk-11190
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary F Walrath |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-50375 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 09, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
HRV Hotel Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Holland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Margaret Holland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BL Santa Fe, LLC
1297 Bishops Lodge Rd.
Santa Fe, NM 87501 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, February 27, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 02/27 8:17 AM
Adversary Case 1:22-ap-50375 Closed (LAM) |
||
Friday, February 24, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 02/24 3:34 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Taylor, Gregory) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Mon 02/13 10:16 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/15/2023 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Taylor, Gregory) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 02/08 3:10 PM
Certificate of Service to Order Granting Motion of Reorganized Debtor BL Santa Fe, LLC to Approve Settlement Agreement with HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, Richard Holland, and Margaret Holland Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 [D.I. 246; Adv. D.I. 26] Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Taylor, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
order
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019
Tue 02/07 4:54 PM
Order Granting the Motion of Reorganized Debtor BL Santa Fe, LLC to Approve Settlement Agreement with HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, Richard Holland, and Margaret Holland Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Signed on 2/7/2023. (LMC) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Settlement Agreement | ||
26 | 26
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Tue 02/07 4:15 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Motion of Reorganized Debtor BL Santa Fe, LLC to Approve Settlement Agreement with HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, Richard Holland, and Margaret Holland Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Taylor, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion
Mon 01/23 11:31 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 // Motion of Reorganized Debtor BL Santa Fe, LLC to Approve Settlement Agreement with HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, Richard Holland, and Margaret Holland Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/15/2023 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 2/6/2023. (Taylor, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, November 17, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
mediation
Mediator's Certificate of Completion
Thu 11/17 9:13 AM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Fitzgerald, Judith) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 10/05 11:29 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, Margaret Holland, Richard Holland. (DiSabatino, Monique) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
6
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/04 4:39 PM
Scheduling Order (FIRST AMENDED) for Trial on Reorganized Debtor BL Santa Fe, LLC's Amended Verified Complaint and Objection to Claim and HRV Hotel Partners, LLC's Motion to Compel Signed on 10/4/2022. (LMC) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Certification of Counsel(Adv)
Tue 10/04 3:28 PM
Certification of Counsel Submitting Proposed First Amended Scheduling Order for Trial on Reorganized Debtor BL Santa Fe, LLC's Amended Verified Complaint and Objection to Claim and HRV Hotel Partners, LLC's Motion to Compel Filed by HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, Margaret Holland, Richard Holland. (DiSabatino, Monique) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Scheduling Order | ||
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Service
Mon 10/03 11:19 AM
Notice of Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises In a Bankruptcy Case (or Adversary Proceeding) Directed to Century Bank c/o Century Financial Services Corporation Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC (Newman, Stacy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, September 28, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Intent - Notice
Wed 09/28 6:26 PM
Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Bankruptcy Proceeding Case (or Adversary Proceeding) Directed to Alpine Bank Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Newman, Stacy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Alpine Bank Subpoena | ||
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Intent - Notice
Fri 09/23 4:40 PM
Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises In a Bankruptcy Case (or Adversary Proceeding) Directed to Century Bank c/o Century Financial Services Corporation Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Taylor, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Century Bank c/o Century Financial Services Corporation Subpoena | ||
17 | 17
notice
Withdrawal - Notice
Fri 09/23 4:28 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Bankruptcy Case (or Adversary Proceeding) Directed to Century Bank c/o Century Financial Services Corporation Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC (Taylor, Gregory) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Intent - Notice
Fri 09/23 4:01 PM
WITHDRAWN 9/23/2022 SEE DOCKET17 Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Bankruptcy Case (or Adversary Proceeding) Directed to Century Bank c/o Century Financial Services Corporation Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Taylor, Gregory) Modified on 9/26/2022 as to withdrawal (LAM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Century Bank c/o Century Financial Services Corporation Subpoena | ||
Monday, September 12, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Mon 09/12 3:23 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff Filed by HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, Margaret Holland, Richard Holland (Minuti, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, September 09, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Service of Discovery - Notice
Fri 09/09 6:20 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery // Notice of Service of Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant's First Set of Discovery Requests Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC (Newman, Stacy) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Exhibit
Thu 09/08 5:23 PM
Exhibit(s) // Notice of Corrected Exhibit E to Verified Amended Complaint and Objection to Claim Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Newman, Stacy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit E [Corrected] | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, August 24, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Service
Wed 08/24 5:11 PM
Notice of Service of Reorganized Debtor BL Santa Fe, LLCs Initial Disclosure Statement Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Newman, Stacy) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Initial Disclosures
Wed 08/24 4:40 PM
Initial Disclosures Notice of Service of Defendants' Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures Filed by HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, Margaret Holland, Richard Holland. (DiSabatino, Monique) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, August 18, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice
Thu 08/18 12:12 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 8/23/2022 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Taylor, Gregory) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Mon 08/15 3:07 PM
Answer to Counterclaim Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC (Newman, Stacy) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/15 11:50 AM
Certificate of Service to Scheduling Order for Trial on Reorganized Debtor BL Santa Fe, LLCs Amended Verified Complaint and Objection to Claim and HRV Hotel Partners, LLCs Motion to Compel [D.I. 229] [Adv. D.I. 7] Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Taylor, Gregory) |
|
7 | 7
5
pgs
order
Order
Mon 08/15 10:05 AM
Scheduling Order for Trial on Reorganized Debtor BL Santa Fe, LLC's Amended Verified Complaint and Objection to Claim and HRV Hotel Partners, LLC's Motion to Compel Signed on 8/15/2022. (LMC) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order
Fri 08/12 2:17 PM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Taylor, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, July 25, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
answer|cmp
Answer to Amended Complaint|Counterclaim
Mon 07/25 9:20 AM
Answer to Amended Complaint , Counterclaim by HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, Margaret Holland, Richard Holland against BL Santa Fe, LLC Filed by HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, Margaret Holland, Richard Holland Mediation due date: 11/22/2022.(Minuti, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proof of Claim | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference
Fri 06/24 3:15 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendants HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, Margaret Holland, Richard Holland. Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2022 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Newman, Stacy) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, June 21, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 06/21 6:25 PM
Verified Amended Complaint to Add Count Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC AP Summons Served due date: 9/19/2022. (Newman, Stacy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F | ||
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 06/10 9:29 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 22-50375 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10761317, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Thursday, June 09, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
RETIRED - Complaint
Thu 06/09 9:15 PM
Adversary case 22-50375 Complaint //Verified Complaint and Objection to Claim by BL Santa Fe, LLC against HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, Richard Holland, Margaret Holland. Fee Amount $350 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)). AP Summons Served due date: 9/7/2022. (Newman, Stacy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F |