Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-07895
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 07, 2022 4:12 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
PATRICK HITCHCOCK
Represented By
JASON BENJAMIN WOLF
Parafinczuk & Wolf - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Friday, June 17, 2022
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 06/17 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM-ARED by PATRICK HITCHCOCK (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 06/13 10:31 AM
JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 06/10 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF DESIGNATED FORUM by PATRICK HITCHCOCK (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/10 11:47 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/10 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT AND TRIAL JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7176371.), filed by PATRICK HITCHCOCK. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]