California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Kenly Kiya Kato
Case #: 5:22-cv-00970
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2022
Terminated:Jun 16, 2023
Case in other court:San Bernardino County Superior Court, CIVSB2207614
Last checked: Thursday Dec 08, 2022 12:44 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Represented By
Mitchell A Wrosch
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Alis Marie Moon
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Paloma P Peracchio
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak And Stewart PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hector J. Mejia
Represented By
Kiley Lynn Grombacher
Bradley Grombacher LLP
contact info
Sahag Majarian, II
Law Office Of Sahag Majarian Ii
contact info
Garen Majarian
Majarian Law Group, Apc
contact info
Marcus Bradley
Bradley Grombacher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, July 03, 2023
34 34 misc Receipt Wed 07/05 4:33 PM
Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from San Bernardino Superior Court, Case No. CIVSB2207614, acknowledged on 6/28/2023. (gk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
33 33 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Tue 06/20 9:30 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Clerk, San Bernardino Superior Court, San Bernardino Justice Center. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Clerk, San Bernardino Superior Court, San Bernardino Justice Center. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
32 32 2 pgs order Order Remand Case to State Court Tue 06/20 9:28 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO REMAND REMOVED ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation30 is approved. The case is hereby remanded to San Bernardino County Superior Court, Case Number CIVSB2207614. ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6 ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
31 31 3 pgs stip Order Wed 06/14 4:56 PM
STIPULATION for Order Granting Stipulation to Remand Removed Action filed by PLAINTIFF Hector J. Mejia.(Bradley, Marcus)
Related: [-]
30 30 stip Remand Case to State Court Wed 06/14 4:50 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by PLAINTIFF Hector J. Mejia.(Bradley, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
29 29 misc Status Report Fri 06/02 3:16 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Peracchio, Paloma)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
28 28 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 05/19 5:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER [In Chambers] ORDER RE STATUS OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Because far more than 30 days have now elapsed and no such stipulation has been filed, the parties are ORDERED to file a Status Report on or before June 2, 2023, informing the Court of the status of settlement. See minute order for details. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
27 27 misc Status Report Fri 03/31 9:06 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Report Re Settlement and Remand filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Peracchio, Paloma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
26 26 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 03/21 11:57 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The parties are directed to file a Status Report informing the court of the status of the Joint Stipulation to Remand this Case to State Court (see Dkt. Nos. 24, 25) on or before March 31, 2023. SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
25 25 misc Status Report Thu 02/09 4:36 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Peracchio, Paloma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
24 24 2 pgs order Order Thu 12/29 4:46 PM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION RE CASE STATUS FOLLOWING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation23 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties shall file a joint stipulation to remand the case to state court, or otherwise informing the Court of the status of the settlement and stipulation to remand no later than 2/10/2023. (gk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
23 23 3 pgs stip Order Tue 12/27 2:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order the Parties shall file a joint stipulation to remand the case to state court, or otherwise informing the Court of the status of the settlement and stipulation to remand no later than February 10, 2023 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Peracchio, Paloma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 12/06 7:39 PM
ORDER RE JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The parties filed a Notice of Settlement on 11/12/202221 . The Parties have reached a joint settlement with the Parties in Powell v. Washington., et al., ("Powell") Case No. 3:20-cv-02412-JLS-MSB (Southern District of California). Plaintiffs' counsel in Powell is currently preparing the long-form settlement agreement. Accordingly, the parties shall meet and confer and file a Stipulation within 20 days regarding how the parties wish that the Court proceed in light of this Notice. Additionally, the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 12/9/2022 at 10:00 AM is VACATED. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/23 2:43 PM
Notice NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. Joint Notice of Settlement (Wrosch, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
20 20 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 09/29 10:55 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 09/28 11:57 AM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Moon, Alis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
18 18 4 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Thu 09/15 1:36 PM
ORDER RE:JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon the parties' third Stipulation17 , the Court finds the parties have failed to establish good cause for an additional 30-day continuance. Nevertheless, the Court shall grant a short continuance. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to file its initial response to Plaintiff's Complaint is CONTINUED, up to and including, 9/28/2022. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
17 17 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Mon 09/12 5:08 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 11, 2022 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Wrosch, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 12, 2022
16 16 1 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 08/15 7:00 AM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY THIRTY DAYS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon the parties' Joint Stipulation15 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Walmart Inc.'s deadline to file its initial response to Plaintiff's Complaint is continued up to and including 9/13/2022. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Wed 08/10 11:41 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 13, 2022 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Wrosch, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 23, 2022
14 14 1 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Fri 06/24 8:28 AM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY SIXTY DAYS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation11 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Walmart Inc.'s deadline to file its initial response to Plaintiff's Complaint is CONTINUED, up to and including, 8/16/2022. (gk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
13 13 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 06/22 8:38 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
12 12 order Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34) Tue 06/21 2:12 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:17-cv-01415-AB (KKx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:22-cv-00970-AB (KKx). Signed by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (aco)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Fri 06/17 12:46 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 16, 2022 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Walmart Inc..(Wrosch, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
10 10 notice Related Case(s) Wed 06/15 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. Related Case(s): James Evans v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Case No. 2:17-cv-07641-AB-KK, and Jessica Hernandez v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Case No. 5:21-cv-00166-FLA-KK (Wrosch, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 06/13 9:15 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 transfer Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form Mon 06/13 9:14 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-00970 FMO (KKx). (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
7 7 notice Related Case(s) Fri 06/10 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Wrosch, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 06/10 1:27 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. (Wrosch, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 06/10 1:24 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., (Wrosch, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Fri 06/10 1:20 PM
DECLARATION of Laura Kish re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Wrosch, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Fri 06/10 1:17 PM
DECLARATION of Mitchell A. Wrosch re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Wrosch, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 06/10 1:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Wrosch, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 06/10 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino County Superior Court, case number CIVSB2207614 Receipt No: ACACDC-33450935 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attorney Mitchell A Wrosch added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Wrosch, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 21 pgs Summons & Complaint
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 06/13 9:19 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant Does 1 to 10, inclusive, Walmart Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Hector J. Mejia. Filed in State Court on 4/12/2022 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]