New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:22-cv-04881
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2022
Terminated:Sep 23, 2022
Case in other court:SUPREME COURT OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK, 65102-2022
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 07, 2022 3:28 AM EST
Defendant
Citibank, National Association
Plaintiff
Patrick D. Bailey
Represented By
Robert George Wennemer, Jr
Law Offices Of Robert S. Gitmeid & Assoc., PLLC
contact info
Maksim Reznik
Law Offices Of Robert S. Gitmeid & Assoc., PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Terminated: 09/23/2022
Represented By
Boris Brownstein
Clark Hill Plc (nj)
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, September 23, 2022
14 14 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 09/23 4:52 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC: Plaintiff Patricia D. Bailey ("Plaintiff"), by and through her counsel, the Law Offices of Robert S. Gitmeid & Associates, PLLC, and Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC ("Equifax"), by and through its counsel, Clark Hill PLC, hereby stipulate and agree that all matters herein between them have been compromised and resolved, and that Plaintiffs cause against Equifax should be dismissed, with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Application GRANTED. Because the claims against Defendant Citibank, National Association were dismissed previously (docket entry #4), this stipulation terminates the case as to all remaining defendants. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and close this case. Equifax Information Services, LLC terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/23/2022) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/22 10:44 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 13 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Katherine Polk Failla for approval for the following reason(s): the stipulation of dismissal is not pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
13 13 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/21 1:15 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Equifax Information Services, LLC pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Patrick D. Bailey. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Wennemer, Robert)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Wed 09/21 12:32 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Robert Wennemer. RE-FILE Document No. 12 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed by all parties who have appeared. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
12 12 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/20 11:50 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Equifax Information Services, LLC pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Patrick D. Bailey. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Wennemer, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 08/08 1:27 PM
ORDER granting7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference in this matter is hereby ADJOURNED to October 26, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 7. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/26/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/8/2022) (kv)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/08 12:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Brownstein, Boris)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/08 12:35 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Brownstein, Boris)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/08 12:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Brownstein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Brownstein, Boris)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
7 7 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 08/05 6:06 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference currently scheduled for August 10, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Robert Wennemer dated August 5, 2022. Document filed by Patrick D. Bailey..(Wennemer, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/05 4:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert George Wennemer, Jr on behalf of Patrick D. Bailey..(Wennemer, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
5 5 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 06/24 2:47 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/10/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on August 10, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/24/2022) (rro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Tue 06/14 11:08 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Katherine Polk Failla for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (nd)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 06/13 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Citibank, National Association. Document filed by Patrick D. Bailey. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). . Related [+]
Related: [-] znik, Maksim
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/13 10:23 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maksim Reznik on behalf of Patrick D. Bailey. Related [+]
Related: [-] znik, Maksim
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 06/13 11:27 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 06/13 11:27 AM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 06/13 11:28 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 06/13 5:11 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Redesignation Mon 06/13 5:12 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so redesignated. (vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/10 2:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brownstein, Boris)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 06/10 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 651502-2022. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26268425).Document filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC..(Brownstein, Boris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint