New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:22-cv-03717
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2022
Re-opened:Feb 03, 2023
Terminated:Jan 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 07, 2022 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
SAEID HUSSAIN RAHIMI
Plaintiff
DILIP RAHULAN
Represented By
MARGARET A PALMERI
Dreifuss, Bonacci & Parker, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 08, 2024
30 30 misc Status Report Mon 07/08 1:38 PM
STATUS REPORT by DILIP RAHULAN. (DREIFUSS, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
29 29 order Order Tue 06/18 4:59 PM
TEXT ORDER As per today's Telephone Status Conference, the parties shall resume settlement negotiations as well as their meet and confer session on selecting an arbitrator. The parties shall submit a joint status letter on or before 7/8/24. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 06/18/2024. (Allen, Jessica)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 06/20 11:16 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/18/2024. (Court Reporter: None) (jbb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
28 28 order Order Mon 06/17 10:18 AM
TEXT ORDER: In response to Plaintiff's counsel's letter of 5/23/24, (ECF No.27 ), a Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for tomorrow, 6/18/24 at 4:30 p.m. before the Undersigned. The Court will circulate the Conference Call information in advance. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/17/24. (jbb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 06/17 10:29 AM
Set Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/18/2024 at 4:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jbb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
27 27 misc Letter Thu 05/23 1:51 PM
Letter from David C. Dreifuss. (DREIFUSS, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 01/22 3:06 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
26 26 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Arbitration Thu 10/19 3:00 PM
CONSENT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Arbitration.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/18/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
25 25 adr Consent to Arbitration (aty) Thu 10/12 5:34 PM
CONSENT to Arbitration by DILIP RAHULAN(PALMERI, MARGARET)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
24 24 order Order Thu 10/05 10:07 AM
TEXT ORDER The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint status letter of 9/15/23, (ECF No. 23), confirming their agreement to arbitrate this matter in lieu of litigating this case before the Court and to submit a proposed consent order to that effect. To date, the parties have not submitted the consent order. They are directed to do so on or before 10/12/23. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 10/5/23. (Allen, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
23 23 misc Letter Fri 09/15 8:17 PM
Letter from Defendant, to the Court RE: pending motions and arbitration. (VARCADIPANE, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
22 22 order Order Thu 09/07 11:24 AM
TEXT ORDER: As per today's Telephonic Case Management Conference, the parties shall meet and confer on whether they agree to proceed to Arbitration and withdraw their pending respective motions. On or before 9/15/23, the parties shall submit a joint letter addressing same. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/7/23. (jbb)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 09/07 11:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 9/7/2023. (Court Reporter: None) (jbb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
21 21 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Wed 09/06 4:02 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SAEID HUSSAIN RAHIMI re16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ,19 MOTION for Appointment of an Arbitrator MOTION to Stay (VARCADIPANE, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
20 20 order Order Thu 08/31 10:49 AM
TEXT ORDER: In response to the parties' respective Motions, (ECF Nos. 16, 18 & 19), the Court will conduct a Telephonic Case Management Conference on 9/7/23 at 9:30 a.m. The Court will circulate the Conference Call information in advance. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 8/31/23. (jbb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2023
qc QC - Duplicate Filings Thu 08/24 12:02 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The18 Cross Motion and19 Cross Motion submitted by PAUL MANDAL on 8/22/2023 appear to be duplicates. The Clerk's Office has terminated the18 Cross Motion. Please be advised that the19 Cross Motion shall serve as the operative filing. This message is for informational purposes. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dam)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer Thu 08/24 12:03 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The17 Brief in Opposition submitted by PAUL MANDAL on 8/22/2023 contains an improper electronic signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/ . This message is for informational purposes. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/24 12:05 AM
Set Deadlines as to19 CROSS MOTION for Appointment of an Arbitrator and for a Stay. Motion set for 9/5/2023 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
19 19 motion Compel Tue 08/22 3:39 PM
Proposed MOTION to Compel Notice of Cross Motion for Appointment of an Arbitrator and for a Stay by DILIP RAHULAN.(MANDAL, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum in Opposition,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Dilip Rahulan,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B-Deed of Partnership,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C-Arbitration and Conciliation Act
18 18 motion Stay Tue 08/22 3:12 PM
First MOTION to Stay by DILIP RAHULAN.(MANDAL, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum in Opposition,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Dilip Rahulan,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C
17 17 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Tue 08/22 3:06 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by DILIP RAHULAN re16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (MANDAL, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Notice of Cross Motion,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B-Deed of Partnership,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C-Arbitration and Conciliation Act,
Att: 6 Declaration Declaration of Dilip Rahulan
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/01 8:58 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Motion set for 9/5/2023 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
16 16 motion Dismiss Fri 07/28 5:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by SAEID HUSSAIN RAHIMI. Responses due by 8/25/2023.(VARCADIPANE, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Varcadipane,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration of of Saeid Rahimi,
Att: 4 Brief Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
15 15 order Stipulation and Order Thu 07/27 9:13 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE REPLY; that Defendant(s) time to answer, move or otherwise reply is extended to July 28, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 7/26/2023. (ld, ) (Main Document 15 replaced on 7/27/2023) (ld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
14 14 misc Letter Tue 07/25 10:16 AM
Letter from Defendant enclosing 2nd Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Reply. (VARCADIPANE, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Fri 06/23 2:59 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE REPLY; Defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise reply is extended to July 24, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 6/23/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
12 12 misc Letter Thu 06/22 2:55 PM
Letter from Defendant enclosing Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Reply. (VARCADIPANE, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/19 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL MANDAL on behalf of DILIP RAHULAN (MANDAL, PAUL)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/19 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID C. DREIFUSS on behalf of DILIP RAHULAN (DREIFUSS, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
9 9 service Certificate of Service Fri 06/02 11:16 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DILIP RAHULAN re1 Complaint, International Service (PALMERI, MARGARET)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
8 8 misc Letter Wed 05/03 1:02 PM
Letter from Plaintiff regarding status of service. (PALMERI, MARGARET)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
7 7 order Order Mon 02/06 11:39 AM
TEXT ORDER : The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter (D.E. No.6 ) requesting that the Court reopen the case and reinstate his Complaint (D.E. No.1 ) because international service of process is still pending. Because Defendant is located in Ontario, Canada, service on Defendant is not subject to the ninety-day requirement set forth in Rule 4(m). See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m); Idingo LLC v. Cohen, No. 16-6525 2017 WL 59204, at *3 (D.N.J. Jan. 5, 2017) ("Rather, service on a defendant in a foreign country is more appropriately subject to a flexible due diligence standard.'"). Plaintiff has provided good cause for his delayed response to the Courts call for dismissal (D.E. No.4 ). Accordingly, the case is reopened, and the Complaint (D.E. No.1 ) is reinstated. Plaintiff shall provide an update concerning the status of service within 90 days of the date of this order if an affidavit of service or acceptance has not been filed before then. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 2/6/2023. (ek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
6 6 misc Letter Tue 01/31 4:16 PM
Letter from Plaintiff to Reinstate Complaint due to international service. (PALMERI, MARGARET)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (4m, 41.1) Fri 01/27 2:19 PM
Order for Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 1/27/2023. (ld, )
Related: [-]
minutes Docket Call Fri 01/27 1:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: At call for Notice of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m) returnable on 1/26/2023. The case will be dismissed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). (ek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Call for Dismissal Thu 01/19 4:40 PM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Motion set for 1/26/2023 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 06/14 9:39 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to SAEID HUSSAIN RAHIMI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 06/10 5:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DILIP RAHULAN. (PALMERI, MARGARET)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/10 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13477965), filed by Dilip Rahulan.(PALMERI, MARGARET)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Statement 7.1 Statement
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Fri 06/10 3:54 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 06/10 3:56 PM
Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)
Related: [-]