Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:22-cv-01263
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1338 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2022
Terminated:Jul 11, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 07, 2022 2:58 AM CST
Defendant
Google LLC
Represented By
Kristin Collins Cope
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Andrew Bledsoe
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Luann L Simmons
O'Melveny & Myers
contact info
Frances E Mackay
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Mark Liang
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Darin W Snyder
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Amy K Liang
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Landsberg Orora
Represented By
Lisa H Meyerhoff
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Stephanie Johnson Manning
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pyrite VR Ltd
Represented By
Aaron Wilkerson
Aaron Wilkerson, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Structural Graphics LLC
Represented By
Brandon Taylor Cook
Gunn Lee & Cave PC
contact info
Nicholas Adam Guinn
Gunn Lee & Cave PC
contact info
Plaintiff
DDC Technology LLC
Represented By
Steven E Aldous
Forshey & Prostok LLP
contact info
Gabriel I Opatken
Noble Ip LLC
contact info
Timothy J. Haller
Haller Law PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
HMD TECH SARL
Terminated: 10/06/2022
Defendant
Emerge Technologies Inc
Terminated: 10/24/2022
Represented By
Jordan Christine Strauss
Munck Wilson Mandala LLP
contact info
Amy Elizabeth LaValle
Munck Wilson Mandala, LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 19 2022
Memorandum Opinion and Order: Before the Court is Defendant Landsberg Orora's ("Landsberg")'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 68). Landsberg moves the Court to dismiss Plaintiff DDC Technology ("DDC")'s Original Complaint (Doc. 1) for lack of personal jurisdiction, improper venue, and failure to state a claim. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b). Because the Court finds that it lacks personal jurisdiction over Landsberg, the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 68) is GRANTED, and DDC's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 12/19/2022) (ndt)
GPO Mar 14 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 94 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division Motion To Transfer Venue To The Nothern District of California Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and to Sever Its Case is Granted. The case as to Defendant Google is SEVERED and TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. DDCs claims against Defendant OPS remain before this Court. The Clerk of Court shall effectuate the transfer according to the usual procedure. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 3/14/2023) (svc)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
152 152 misc Stipulation Wed 08/09 9:40 AM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL of Defendant Orora Packaging Solutions With Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by DDC Technology LLC. (Haller, Timothy)
Related: [-]