Parent v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-01842 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 10, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 07, 2022 4:14 AM EST |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Parent
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Only, of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28 Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(London, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 6/10/2022), Parent v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-1842-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: South Carolina (sshe, ) Modified on 6/10/2022 to edit association "as of" date (sshe, ). | |
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10536410.), filed by Frederick Parent. Service due by 9/8/2022(sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 06/10 4:42 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 6/10/2022), Parent v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-1842-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: South Carolina (sshe, ) Modified on 6/10/2022 to edit association "as of" date (sshe, ) |