California Southern District Court
Judge:M James Lorenz
Referred: Mitchell D Dembin
Case #: 3:22-cv-00859
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332lr Diversity - Labor
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2022
Terminated:Jul 20, 2022
Case in other court:Superior Court of the State of California, 37-02022-00014913-CU-OE-CTL
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 07, 2022 12:56 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1-100
Represented By
Graham M. Cridland
Ericksen Arbuthnot
contact info
Corey Edward Krueger
Messner Reeves, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Liberty Healthcare Corporation
Represented By
Graham M. Cridland
Ericksen Arbuthnot
contact info
Corey Edward Krueger
Messner Reeves, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Liberty Residential Services, INC.
Represented By
Graham M. Cridland
Ericksen Arbuthnot
contact info
Corey Edward Krueger
Messner Reeves, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Natali Amaya
Represented By
Margaux K. Gundzik
contact info
Tara Zabehi
Lawyers For Justice, PC
contact info
Travis Joseph Maher
contact info
Edwin Aiwazian
contact info

GPO Jul 20 2022
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Remand. The Court REMANDS this action to San Diego Superior Court. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/20/2022. (fth)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Wed 07/20 8:50 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Remand. The Court REMANDS this action to San Diego Superior Court. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/20/2022. (fth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/19 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Joseph Maher on behalf of Natali Amaya (Maher, Travis)Attorney Travis Joseph Maher added to party Natali Amaya(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
order Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings Tue 07/19 10:25 AM
Order Vacating Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference : In light of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Remand9 10 , the Court VACATES the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for August 3, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 7/19/2022.(no document attached) (smd)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
10 10 respm Non Opposition to Motion Mon 07/18 7:02 PM
NON Opposition re9 MOTION to Remand filed by Liberty Healthcare Corporation.(Krueger, Corey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Tanner,
Att: 2 Proof of Service POS
Friday, July 08, 2022
9 9 motion Remand Fri 07/08 3:24 PM
MOTION to Remand by Natali Amaya.(Gundzik, Margaux)Attorney Margaux K. Gundzik added to party Natali Amaya(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
8 8 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 06/29 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Corey Edward Krueger (Krueger, Corey)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
order Order of Judge Transfer Mon 06/27 10:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22CV0859L.(no document attached) (alns)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
order Order of Judge Transfer Fri 06/24 8:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas J. Whelan for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22cv859 W-MDD.(no document attached) (ddf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/15 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Zabehi on behalf of Natali Amaya (Zabehi, Tara)Attorney Tara Zabehi added to party Natali Amaya(pty:pla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
4 4 4 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Tue 06/14 11:44 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference And Case Management Video Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/14/2022.(ddf)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
3 3 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 06/10 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Liberty Healthcare Corporation, Liberty Residential Services, INC.. Identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Healthcare Corporation for Liberty Healthcare Corporation, Liberty Residential Services, INC..(alns)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Fri 06/10 4:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Liberty Healthcare Corporation, Liberty Residential Services, INC.. (alns)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 06/10 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16905195.), filed by Liberty Healthcare Corporation, Liberty Residential Services, INC.. The new case number is 3:22-cv-859-BEN-MDD. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(alns)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Proof of Service,
Att: 5 Proof of Service,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit