Missouri Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:22-cr-00328
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jun 11, 2022 2:52 AM CDT
Defendant
Rodney Humphrey (1)
Represented By
Andrew Cortopassi
Federal Public Defender - St Louis
contact info
St. Louis Fed Public Defender
Federal Public Defender - St Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nauman Wadalawala
United States Attorneys Office - St. Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/11/2022 3:13 AM CDT
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
Warrant Issued as to Indictment in case as to Rodney Humphrey. (DLB)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court on June 8, 2022 to Judge John M. Bodenhausen by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby as to Rodney Humphrey (1) count(s) 1-8, 9. (DLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 5 pgs REDACTED INDICTMENT returned in open court on June 8, 2022 to Judge John M. Bodenhausen by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby as to Rodney Humphrey (1): Former count 1-8 is now count 1r-8r. Former count 9 is now count 9r.. (DLB)
Related: [-]