Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:22-cr-00144
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jun 11, 2022 2:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Kiet Hoang Nguyen (1)
Represented By
Noemi A Collie
Noemi A Collie
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ernest Gonzalez
U S Attorney'S Office - Plano
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/11/2022 3:13 AM CDT
Thursday, June 02, 2022
Arrest of Kiet Nguyen (mem) [4:22-mj-00326-CAN]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Kiet Nguyen. (mem) [4:22-mj-00326-CAN]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Kiet Nguyen: Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 6/3/2022 at 11:15 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (mem) [4:22-mj-00326-CAN]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Kiet Nguyen (1). (mem) (mem, ). [4:22-mj-00326-CAN]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/2/2022) Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint
2 2 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Kiet Nguyen (mem) [4:22-mj-00326-CAN]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak: Initial Appearance as to Kiet Nguyen held on 6/2/2022. Defendant appeared without counsel. Attorney Andrew Stover appeared for AUSA. Defendant remanded to custody of United States Marshal. (time in court 11:26 - 11:31) (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) (mem) [4:22-mj-00326-CAN]
Related: [-]
5 5 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kiet Nguyen (mem) [4:22-mj-00326-CAN]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Kiet Nguyen: Preliminary and Detention Hearing set for 6/6/2022 at 10:30 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (mem) [4:22-mj-00326-CAN]
Related: [-]
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak: Status Conference as to Kiet Nguyen held on 6/3/2022. noted. Defendant appears without counsel. Preliminary and detention hearing reset for Monday, June 6, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. (time in court 9:37 - 9:39) (mem) [4:22-mj-00326-CAN]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 06, 2022
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak:Prelim/Detention Hearing called, not held, as to Kiet Nguyen on 6/6/2022 at 10:12 am. Deft appeared with retained counsel, Noemi Collie, who requested continuance of the hearing. ( Preliminary/Detention Hearing RESET for 6/10/2022 10:00 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. Deft remanded to USM at 10:14 am (Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (E. Gonzalez for Govt) (dm, ) [4:22-mj-00326-CAN] (Entered: 06/06/2022)
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Kiet Nguyen. Attorney Noemi A Collie for Kiet Nguyen added. (dm, ) [4:22-mj-00326-CAN]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Noemi A Collie appearing for Kiet Nguyen (Collie, Noemi) [4:22-mj-00326-CAN]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
10 10 INDICTMENT as to Kiet Hoang Nguyen (1) count(s) 1, 2. (mcg)
Related: [-]
11 11 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Kiet Hoang Nguyen. (mcg)
Related: [-]