Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:22-bk-00992

Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michael G Williamson
Case #: 8:22-ap-00108
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2022
Terminated:Sep 27, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Automotive Credit Corporation (RMJ)
26261 Evergreen Road, Suite 300
Southfield, MI 48076
Represented By
Automotive Credit Corporation (RMJ)
contact info
Plaintiff
Angela Welch
12191 W. Linebaugh Ave. #401
Tampa, FL 33626
Represented By
Thomas A Lash
Lash Wilcox & Grace Pl
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, December 05, 2022
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) (Automation Use Only - Do Not Select) Mon 12/05 5:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by JM. Receipt Number 164087. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
4 4 order Virtual Order Administratively Closing Adversary Proceeding (TEXT ONLY) Tue 09/27 3:07 PM
Order Administratively Closing Adversary Proceeding. On July 28, 2022, the Court entered an order approving the parties' compromise or settlement agreement in the main bankruptcy case, Doc. No. 25. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this adversary proceeding is administratively closed. This order is without prejudice to any party's moving to reopen the adversary proceeding for the purpose of seeking relief in connection with matters or disputes arising from or related to the compromise or settlement agreement. SO ORDERED by Judge Michael G. Williamson (text-only order). Related Bankruptcy Case Number: 8:22-bk-00992-MGW. This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached. . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Margaret)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/27 3:09 PM
Adversary Case 8:22-ap-108 Closed. (Margaret)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
court Compromise Cross-Reference Thu 07/28 4:12 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:22-bk-00992-MGW, Doc. No. 25 . (Laura G.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
court Compromise Cross-Reference Tue 07/05 11:52 AM
Motion to Approve Compromise filed in Case No. 8:22-bk-00992-MGW, Doc No. 18 . (Lidia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed Wed 06/15 2:07 PM
Service Executed on Automotive Credit Corporation of Summons, Complaint, Local Rule 7001-1. Filed by Kenneth C Grace on behalf of Plaintiff Angela Welch. (Grace, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, June 13, 2022
2 2 court ADI - Summons Issued (auto) Mon 06/13 4:31 PM
Summons issued on Automotive Credit Corporation (RMJ) along with Local Rule 7001-1 - Adversary Proceedings - Procedures. Answer Due 07/13/2022. If one or more defendants are the United States or an officer or agency thereof, add an additional five days to the Answer Due date. A copy of this summons must be included when filing proof of service of this summons. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2022
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint - Original Fri 06/10 1:13 PM
Complaint by Angela Welch against Automotive Credit Corporation (RMJ). Filing Fee Deferred. Nature of Suit: [14 Related [+]]. (Lash, Thomas)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet