Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34054

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:22-ap-03062
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:May 21, 2021
Terminated:Aug 02, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Represented By
Gregory V. Demo
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones L.L.P.
contact info
John A. Morris
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones, LLP
contact info
Hayley R. Winograd
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Zachery Z. Annable
Hayward PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey Nathan Pomerantz
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Melissa S. Hayward
Hayward PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PCMG Trading Partners XXIII LP
Represented By
Mazin Ahmad Sbaiti
Sbaiti & Company PLLC
contact info
Kevin N. Colquitt
Sbaiti & Company PLLC
contact info
Jonathan E. Bridges
Sbaiti & Company PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
court Close adversary case Tue 08/02 8:22 AM
Adversary case 3:22-ap-3062 closed (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
27 27 notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Mon 08/01 12:18 PM
Amended Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff PCMG Trading Partners XXIII LP. (Sbaiti, Mazin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 31, 2022
26 26 notice Notice of dismissal or stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding Sun 07/31 11:15 PM
Notice of stipulated dismissal in an adversary proceeding filed by Plaintiff PCMG Trading Partners XXIII LP. (Sbaiti, Mazin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
25 25 misc Certificate of service Fri 06/24 5:38 PM
Certificate of service re: Notice of Hearing on Highland Capital Management, L.P.s Amended Motion to Dismiss Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 23 Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P. (RE: related document(s)20 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P.). Hearing to be held on 8/3/2022 at 02:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/jerniga for20 , filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Thursday, June 23, 2022
24 24 misc Certificate of service Thu 06/23 5:57 PM
Certificate of service re: 1) Highland Capital Management, L.P.s Amended Motion to Dismiss; 2) Highland Capital Management, L.P.s Memorandum of Law in Support of its Amended Motion to Dismiss ; and 3) Appendix in Support of Highland Capital Management, L.P.s Amended Motion to Dismiss Filed by Claims Agent Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC Related [+]. (Kass, Albert)
Related: [-] 20 Amended Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding (related document(s):11 ) filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Proposed Order) filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P.,21 Brief in support filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P. (RE: related document(s)20 Amended Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding (related document(s):11 )). filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P.,22 Support/supplemental document (Appendix in Support of Highland Capital Management, L.P.'s Amended Motion to Dismiss) filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P. (RE: related document(s)20 Amended Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding (related document(s):11 )). filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Friday, June 17, 2022
23 23 notice Notice of hearing Fri 06/17 2:46 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 8/3/2022 at 02:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/jerniga for20 , (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-] 20 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P.
Thursday, June 16, 2022
22 22 misc Support/supplemental document Thu 06/16 4:56 PM
Support/supplemental document (Appendix in Support of Highland Capital Management, L.P.'s Amended Motion to Dismiss) filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P. Related [+]. (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-] 20 Amended Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding (related document(s):11 )
21 21 misc Brief Thu 06/16 4:54 PM
Brief in support filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P. Related [+]. (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-] 20 Amended Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding (related document(s):11 )
20 20 motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Thu 06/16 4:52 PM
Amended Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding Related [+] filed by Defendant Highland Capital Management, L.P. (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Exhibit A--Proposed Order
Friday, June 10, 2022
19 19 court Document Fri 06/10 5:33 PM
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Reconsideration. Accordingly, the Court lifts the stay, and refers this case to Judge Stacey G.C. Jernigan of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Texas, to be adjudicated as a matter related to the Chapter 11 Bankruptcy of HCM., Chapter 11 Case No. 10-34054 (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 5/19/2022) (frw) Modified file date on 5/23/2022 (frw). (Main Document 19 replaced on 5/23/2022) (twd) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #19 ON 5/19/2022 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Document Fri 06/10 5:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Highland Capital Management LP re 17 Reply (Annable, Zachery) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #18 ON 11/12/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
17 17 court Document Fri 06/10 5:29 PM
REPLY filed by Highland Capital Management LP re: 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion to Stay (Highland Capital Management, L.P.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Stay Order) (Annable, Zachery) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #17 ON 11/05/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Document Fri 06/10 5:28 PM
RESPONSE filed by PCMG Trading Partners XXIII LP re: 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion to Stay (Highland Capital Management, L.P.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Stay Order) (Sbaiti, Mazin) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #16 ON 10/27/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Document Fri 06/10 5:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa S Hayward on behalf of Highland Capital Management LP. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hayward, Melissa) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #15 ON 10/14/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Document Fri 06/10 5:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Highland Capital Management LP re: 8 MOTION for Reconsideration, 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 10 Appendix in Support, 11 MOTION to Dismiss (Highland Capital Management, L.P.'s Motion to Dismiss), 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 13 Appendix in Support. (Annable, Zachery) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (mjr). [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #14 ON 10/11/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
13 13 court Document Fri 06/10 5:23 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Highland Capital Management LP re 11 MOTION to Dismiss (Highland Capital Management, L.P.'s Motion to Dismiss) ( (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5) (Annable, Zachery) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #13 ON 10/05/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
12 12 court Document Fri 06/10 5:21 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Highland Capital Management LP re 11 MOTION to Dismiss (Highland Capital Management, L.P.'s Motion to Dismiss) (Annable, Zachery) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #12 ON 10/05/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Fri 06/10 5:19 PM
MOTION to Dismiss (Highland Capital Management, L.P.'s Motion to Dismiss) filed by Highland Capital Management LP (Annable, Zachery)[ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #11 ON 10/05/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION](Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
10 10 court Document Fri 06/10 5:15 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Highland Capital Management LP re 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion to Stay (Highland Capital Management, L.P.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Stay Order) (Annable, Zachery) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #10 ON 10/05/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
Att: 12 Exhibit 12
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13
Att: 14 Exhibit 14
Att: 15 Exhibit 15
Att: 16 Exhibit 16
Att: 17 Exhibit 17
Att: 18 Exhibit 18
Att: 19 Exhibit 19
Att: 20 Exhibit 20
Att: 21 Exhibit 21
Att: 22 Exhibit 22
Att: 23 Exhibit 23
Att: 24 Exhibit 24
Att: 25 Exhibit 25
Att: 26 Exhibit 26
Att: 27 Exhibit 27
Att: 28 Exhibit 28
Att: 29 Exhibit 29
9 9 court Document Fri 06/10 5:04 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Highland Capital Management LP re 8 MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion to Stay (Highland Capital Management, L.P.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Stay Order) (Annable, Zachery) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #9 ON 10/05/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Generic motion Fri 06/10 5:02 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re 7 Order on Motion to Stay (Highland Capital Management, L.P.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Stay Order) filed by Highland Capital Management LP Attorney Zachery Z. Annable added to party Highland Capital Management LP(pty:dft) (Annable, Zachery) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #8 ON 10/05/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 court Document Fri 06/10 4:58 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 6 Motion to Stay ( 6 Motion to Stay filed by PCMG Trading Partners XXIII LP terminated.) (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/7/2021) (chmb) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #7 ON 09/07/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Generic motion Fri 06/10 4:56 PM
Motion to Stay filed by PCMG Trading Partners XXIII LP . (Sbaiti, Mazin) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #6 ON 08/26/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Document Fri 06/10 4:53 PM
AMENDED Cover Sheet by PCMG Trading Partners XXIII LP. (Sbaiti, Mazin) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #5 ON 06/23/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Document Fri 06/10 4:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Highland Capital Management LP. (ygl) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #4 ON 05/24/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Document Fri 06/10 4:50 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #3 ON 05/21/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Document Fri 06/10 4:49 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Complaint by Plaintiff PCMG Trading Partners XXIII, LP. (Sbaiti, Mazin) [ORIGINALLY FILED IN 21-CV-1169 AS #2 ON 05/24/2021 IN U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, DALLAS DIVISION] (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 06/10 4:42 PM
Adversary case 22-03062 ORDER REFERRING CASE 3:21-CV-1169-N from U.S District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division to U.S. Bankruptcy Court for Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division and Complaint by PCMG Trading Partners XXIII LP against Highland Capital Management, L.P. . Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Okafor, Marcey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Original Complaint
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Docket Sheet from 21-CV-1169